Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-03427
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2024 3:09 AM CDT
Defendant
Heriberto Santiago-Vazquez (1)
Represented By
Matthew DeKoatz
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Shuhao Wang
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/15/2024 10:36 AM CDT
Thursday, August 08, 2024
Arrest of Heriberto Santiago-Vazquez (ll)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Heriberto Santiago-Vazquez by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (ll)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda as to Heriberto Santiago-Vazquez. (ll)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Heriberto Santiago-Vazquez. (ll)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING Matthew DeKoatz as Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (ll)
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert F. Castaneda:Initial Appearance in Person as to Heriberto Santiago-Vazquez held on 8/12/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required (T. McEneny) as to Heriberto Santiago-Vazquez (Court Reporter ERO.) (ll)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER SETTING HEARING as to Heriberto Santiago-Vazquez, (Detention Hearing set for 8/15/2024 03:30 PM in El Paso before Judge Robert F. Castaneda, Preliminary Hearing set for 8/15/2024 03:30 PM in El Paso before Judge Robert F. Castaneda), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Heriberto Santiago-Vazquez. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (ll)
Related: [-]