Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-01363
Case Filed:Aug 13, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2024 12:19 AM MST
Defendant
Maria Guadalupe Rodriguez (1)
Represented By
Kathy L Henry
Kathy Henry & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Chong-Ho Chung
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/15/2024 8:07 AM MST
Thursday, July 18, 2024
Arrest of Maria Guadalupe Rodriguez on 7/18/2024. (MRH) [2:24-mj-06233-ASB]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Maria Guadalupe Rodriguez. (MRH) [2:24-mj-06233-ASB]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
3 3 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine: Initial Appearance as to Maria Guadalupe Rodriguez held on 7/22/2024. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. IT IS ORDERED appointing CJA Kathy L Henry for Defendant. Preliminary Hearing waived. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. The Government is not seeking detention. Defendant ordered released with conditions. The Conditions of Release are reviewed with the Defendant on the record. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA Amanda Tesarek for AUSA Chong-Ho Chung for the Government, CJA Attorney Loyd Tate for CJA Kathy Henry for Defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Related [+] Hearing held 3:46 PM to 3:56 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST) [2:24-mj-06233-ASB]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
4 4 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Maria Guadalupe Rodriguez. (SST) [2:24-mj-06233-ASB]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine. (SST) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [2:24-mj-06233-ASB]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Maria Guadalupe Rodriguez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 7/22/2024. (SST) [2:24-mj-06233-ASB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
7 7 INFORMATION - Felony/Class A Misdemeanor as to Maria Guadalupe Rodriguez, Counts 1, 2; Forfeiture Allegations. (RMW)
Related: [-]
8 8 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Maria Guadalupe Rodriguez. (RMW)
Related: [-]
9 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE IN A MISDEMEANOR CASE by Maria Guadalupe Rodriguez. (RMW)
Related: [-]
10 10 DOJ CONFLICT MEMO. No probable conflict re Judge Krissa M Lanham. Filed by USA as to Maria Guadalupe Rodriguez. (RMW)
Related: [-]
12 12 The parties having contacted the court, IT IS ORDERED, as to Maria Guadalupe Rodriguez, Change of Plea Hearing set for 8/28/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 304, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus.(SMW)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]