Texas Western District Court
Case #: 6:24-cr-00168
Case Filed:Aug 13, 2024
Last checked: Friday Aug 16, 2024 2:44 AM CDT
Defendant
Patrick Trevor White (1)
Represented By
Kurt Gene May
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Duty Pub. Defender-Waco
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Gregory S. Gloff
Assistant United States Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/16/2024 4:30 AM CDT
Thursday, July 11, 2024
Arrest of Patrick Trevor White (lad) [6:24-mj-00144-DTG]
Related: [-]
CASE UNSEALED as to Patrick Trevor White (lad) [6:24-mj-00144-DTG]
Related: [-]
1 1 GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO SEAL (lad) [6:24-mj-00144-DTG]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (lad) [6:24-mj-00144-DTG]
Related: [-]
3 3 SEALED COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland as to Patrick Trevor White (1). (lad) [6:24-mj-00144-DTG]
Related: [-]
4 4 Bench Warrant Issued by Judge Derek T. Gilliland as to Patrick Trevor White. (lad) [6:24-mj-00144-DTG]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
Oral MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Patrick Trevor White. (lad) [6:24-mj-00144-DTG]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Derek T. Gilliland:Initial Appearance as to Patrick Trevor White held on 7/12/2024. Duty Pub. Defender-Waco is appointed as counsel. Preliminary/Detention Hearing is set for 7/16/2024. Government orally moves for detention, Temporary Detention is ordered until Detention Hearing. Oral DPPA Advice Issued pursuant to Rule 5(f). (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR.) (lad) [6:24-mj-00144-DTG]
Related: [-]
6 6 Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Patrick Trevor White. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (lad) [6:24-mj-00144-DTG]
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Patrick Trevor White (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (lad) (Main Document 7 replaced on 7/12/2024) (lad). [6:24-mj-00144-DTG]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Duty Pub. Defender-Waco for Patrick Trevor White. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (lad) [6:24-mj-00144-DTG]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: Bond set to no bond as to Patrick Trevor White. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (lad) [6:24-mj-00144-DTG]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Patrick Trevor White for 7/16/2024 10:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (lad) [6:24-mj-00144-DTG]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER RESETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Patrick Trevor White for 7/16/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Reset as to time only. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (lad) [6:24-mj-00144-DTG]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
Attorney Duty Pub. Defender-Waco terminated as to Patrick Trevor White. (lad) [6:24-mj-00144-DTG]
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kurt Gene May appearing for Patrick Trevor White . Attorney Kurt Gene May added to party Patrick Trevor White(pty:dft) (May, Kurt) [6:24-mj-00144-DTG]
Related: [-]
13 13 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing by Patrick Trevor White (May, Kurt) [6:24-mj-00144-DTG]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER CANCELLING PRELIMINARY HEARING as to Patrick Trevor White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad) [6:24-mj-00144-DTG]
Related: [-]
15 15 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 7/11/24 as to Patrick Trevor White. (lad) [6:24-mj-00144-DTG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
16 16 ORDER CANCELLING DETENTION HEARING as to Patrick Trevor White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad) [6:24-mj-00144-DTG]
Related: [-]
17 17 Unsecured Bond Filed as to Patrick Trevor White in amount of $ 25,000. (lad) [6:24-mj-00144-DTG]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Patrick Trevor White (1) Unsecured bond filed. Motions terminated: MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond filed by USA.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad) [6:24-mj-00144-DTG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
19 19 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Patrick Trevor White (1) count(s) 1. (bot1)
Related: [-] dacted Version
21 21 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Patrick Trevor White (bot1)
Related: [-]