Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-01216
Case Filed:Jul 16, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2024 7:45 AM MST
Defendant
Anthony Patrick Cordova (1)
Represented By
Joseph Douglas Tobler
Grand Canyon Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Anthony Duarte (2)
Represented By
Philip A Seplow
Law Office Of Philip A Seplow
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patrick Edward Chapman
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/15/2024 9:11 AM MST
Friday, July 12, 2024
Arrest of Anthony Patrick Cordova, Anthony Duarte on 7/12/2024. (AO) [2:24-mj-03241-MTM]
Related: [-]
1 1 30+ pgs COMPLAINT as to Anthony Patrick Cordova and Anthony Duarte. (AO) [2:24-mj-03241-MTM]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
2 2 *NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joseph D. Tobler appearing for Anthony Patrick Cordova. (Tobler, Joseph) *Docket text modified on 7/15/2024 to reflect correct title of attached document. (MRH) [2:24-mj-03241-MTM]
Related: [-]
5 5 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey: Initial Appearance as to Anthony Patrick Cordova held on 7/15/2024. Defendant has retained counsel. Preliminary Hearing waived. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Detention Hearing requested. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA Raynette Logan on behalf of Patrick Chapman for the Government, retained attorney Joseph Tobler for Defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Detention Hearing set for 7/16/2024 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 304, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey. Related [+] Hearing held 3:22 PM to 3:30 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM) [2:24-mj-03241-MTM]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
6 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey.(KGM)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [2:24-mj-03241-MTM]
Related: [-]
7 7 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey: Initial Appearance as to Anthony Duarte held on 7/15/2024. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. Appointing Philip A Seplow for Defendant with Appointment Type: CJA. Detention Hearing submitted. Defendant ordered released on own recognizance with conditions. Preliminary Hearing waived. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA Raynette Logan on behalf of Patrick Chapman for the Government, CJA Attorney Philip Seplow for Defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Related [+] Hearing held 3:22 PM to 3:30 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM) [2:24-mj-03241-MTM]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
8 8 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Anthony Duarte. (KGM) [2:24-mj-03241-MTM]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Anthony Duarte. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey on 7/15/2024. (KGM) [2:24-mj-03241-MTM]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey.(KGM)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [2:24-mj-03241-MTM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
11 11 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey: Detention Hearing as to Anthony Patrick Cordova held on 7/16/2024. The parties proceed by proffer. Defendant ordered released on own recognizance with conditions. IT IS ORDERED directing Pretrial Services to drug test Defendant. Appearances : AUSA Timothy Courchaine on behalf of Patrick Chapman for the Government, retained attorney Joseph Tobler for Defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Related [+] Hearing held 4:04 PM to 4:35 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM) [2:24-mj-03241-MTM]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
12 12 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Anthony Patrick Cordova. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey on 7/16/2024. (KGM) [2:24-mj-03241-MTM]
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs INDICTMENT Related [+] as to Anthony Patrick Cordova (1) count(s) 1, Anthony Duarte (2) count(s) 1 with Forfeiture Allegations. Arraignment set for 7/24/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 303, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine. (EJA)
Related: [-] dacted for Public Disclosure
15 15 DOJ CONFLICT MEMO. No probable conflict re Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles. No probable conflict re Judge Dominic W Lanza. No probable conflict re Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey. Filed by USA as to Anthony Patrick Cordova, Anthony Duarte. (EJA)
Related: [-]
18 18 SEALED UNREDACTED INDICTMENT as to Anthony Patrick Cordova, Anthony Duarte. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case Summary