Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00287
Case Filed:Jul 16, 2024
Last checked: Friday Aug 16, 2024 2:47 AM CDT
Defendant
Jonathan Jimenez (3)
Represented By
Suzy Vanegas
Law Office Of Suzy Vanegas
contact info
Defendant
Mervin Charles Lee, II (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender
Federal Public Defender - Dallas
contact info
Juan Gabriel Rodriguez-FPD
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Vincent Edward Wright, Jr (2)
Represented By
Glenn A Brenner
Brenner Law P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph T. Lo Galbo-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/16/2024 4:30 AM CDT
Friday, June 21, 2024
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until the defendant has been arrested/appeared.) as to Vincent Edward Wright, Jr. (1). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00568-BK]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION for Detention and MOTION to Continue filed by USA as to Vincent Edward Wright, Jr. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00568-BK]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Mervin Charles Lee. Federal Public Defender for Mervin Charles Lee appointed. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/21/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00557-BK]
Related: [-]
6 6 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver: Initial Appearance as to Mervin Charles Lee held on 6/21/2024. Date of Arrest: 6/20/2024. The judge issued the oral order required by Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)(1). Written order to follow. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Joseph Lo Galbo; Defense - Marti Morgan. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :05. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (Interpreter NA.) (USPO Webb.) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00557-BK]
Related: [-]
7 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER As to Mervin Charles Lee: by this order -- issued to the prosecution and defense counsel -- the court confirms the disclosure obligation of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and the possible consequences of violating such order under applicable law. This written order is entered pursuant to Rule 5(f)(1) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, and is in addition to the oral order entered by the court on the first scheduled court date when both the prosecutor and defense counsel were present. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/21/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00557-BK]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER granting 4 Motion for Detention as to Mervin Charles Lee (1). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/21/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00557-BK]
Related: [-]
9 9 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver: Initial Appearance as to Jonathan Jiminez held on 6/21/2024. Date of Arrest: 6/20/2024. The judge issued the oral order required by Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)(1). Written order to follow. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Joseph Lo Galbo; Defense - Suzie Vanegas. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :05. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (Interpreter NA.) (USPO Webb.) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00557-BK]
Related: [-]
10 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 4 Motion to Continue as to Jonathan Jiminez (2). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/21/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00557-BK]
Related: [-]
11 11 ***DISREGARD-ENTERED IN ERROR*** ELECTRONIC ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Jonathan Jiminez. Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 6/26/2024 01:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1620, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/21/2024) (mcrd) Modified on 6/21/2024 (mcrd). [3:24-mj-00557-BK]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Jonathan Jiminez. Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 6/26/2024 01:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1620, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/21/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00557-BK]
Related: [-]
13 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER As to Jonathan Jiminez: by this order -- issued to the prosecution and defense counsel -- the court confirms the disclosure obligation of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and the possible consequences of violating such order under applicable law. This written order is entered pursuant to Rule 5(f)(1) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, and is in addition to the oral order entered by the court on the first scheduled court date when both the prosecutor and defense counsel were present. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/21/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00557-BK]
Related: [-]
14 14 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Mervin Charles Lee. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00557-BK]
Related: [-]
15 15 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Mervin Charles Lee. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00557-BK]
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Mervin Charles Lee. On this day, Defendants appeared before Magistrate Judge Renée Harris Toliver and waived in writing the right to a preliminary hearing under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5.1. Upon inquiry, the Court determines Defendant's waiver is knowing and voluntary. Accordingly, the Court finds probable cause to believe that Defendant committed the law violation alleged in the Criminal Complaint. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00557-BK]
Related: [-]
17 17 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Suzy Vanegas for Jonathan Jiminez appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/21/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00557-BK]
Related: [-]
18 18 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jonathan Jiminez. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00557-BK]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
4 4 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver: Initial Appearance as to Vincent Edward Wright, Jr. held on 6/24/2024. Date of Arrest: 6/24/2024. The judge issued the oral order required by Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)(1). Written order to follow. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Marty Basu; Defense - Glenn Brenner. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :03. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00568-BK]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER As to Vincent Edward Wright, Jr. : by this order -- issued to the prosecution and defense counsel -- the court confirms the disclosure obligation of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and the possible consequences of violating such order under applicable law. This written order is entered pursuant to Rule 5(f)(1) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, and is in addition to the oral order entered by the court on the first scheduled court date when both the prosecutor and defense counsel were present. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/24/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00568-BK]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Vincent Edward Wright, Jr.. Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 6/28/2024 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1620, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/24/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00568-BK]
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Glenn A Brenner for Vincent Edward Wright, Jr. appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/24/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00568-BK]
Related: [-]
8 8 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Vincent Edward Wright, Jr. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00568-BK]
Related: [-]
19 19 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Juan Gabriel Rodriguez-FPD (Clerk to Set Designation as: Federal Public Defender Appointment) appearing for Mervin Charles Lee, II (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (If sealed documents that you are authorized to see were previously filed by U.S. Pretrial Services or U.S. Probation, you will require assistance to gain access to them and any related filings. Please call the clerk at 214.753.2240 during business hours to request access.) (Rodriguez-FPD, Juan) [3:24-mj-00557-BK]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
21 21 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver: Detention and Preliminary Hearing as to Jonathan Jimenez held on 6/26/2024. Defendant released on conditions. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Joe Lo Galbo; Defense - Suzy Vanegas. (Defense exhibit 1 admitted- return to party) Time in Court - :37. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Webb.) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00557-BK]
Related: [-]
22 22 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Jonathan Jimenez (2). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/26/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00557-BK]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
10 10 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Vincent Edward Wright Jr (1). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/28/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00568-BK]
Related: [-]
11 11 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver: Detention Hearing as to Vincent Edward Wright, Jr held on 6/28/2024. Defendant released on conditions. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Joe Lo Galbo; Defense - Glenn Brenner. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :37. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Lujan.) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00568-BK]
Related: [-]
12 12 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Vincent Edward Wright, Jr. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00568-BK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
23 23 10 pgs INDICTMENT with Forfeiture Notice as to Mervin Charles Lee, II (1) count(s) 1, 2, Vincent Edward Wright, Jr (2) count(s) 1, 3, 4, Jonathan Jimenez (3) count(s) 5. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (kcr)
Related: [-]