District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:James E Boasberg
Case #: 1:24-cv-02366
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 11, 2025 3:18 AM EST
Defendant
AB PAC
Represented By
William B. Stafford
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Lindsay McAleer
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Elena Alejandra Rodriguez Armenta
Elias Law Group LLP
contact info
Movant
Melehy & Associates LLC
Represented By
Omar Vincent Melehy
Melehy & Associates LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
SUSAN HASCALL
Represented By
Omar Vincent Melehy
Melehy & Associates LLC
contact info
Suvita Melehy
Melehy & Associates LLC
contact info
Alexandre Maxime Peter Todorov
Melehy And Associates, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, April 18, 2025
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 04/18 3:52 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 5/29/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6- In Person before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. (lcag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
20 20 order .Order Thu 04/17 3:31 PM
MEDIATION STANDING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 4/17/25. (lcag)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 04/17 9:20 AM
ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Harvey for mediation. On any filing related to mediation, the parties shall place the initials of Judge James E. Boasberg and the initials of Magistrate Judge Harvey following the case number in the caption. On any other filings in this case, the parties shall only place the initials of Judge James E. Boasberg after the case number; and 2) Mediation shall occur from April 17, 2025, through June 16, 2025. Signed by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/17/2025. (lcjeb1)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Mediation Order on Motion to Stay Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 04/17 9:16 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) The18 Joint Motion is GRANTED; 2) All deadlines are STAYED until further Order of the Court; 3) The case shall be referred by separate Order to Magistrate Judge Harvey for mediation through June 16, 2025; and 4) The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by that date. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/17/2025. (lcjeb1)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Thu 04/17 1:49 PM
CASE DIRECTLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey for Mediation. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
18 18 motion Mediation Tue 04/15 5:13 PM
Joint MOTION for Mediation and to Stay Deadlines by SUSAN HASCALL. (Joseph Goodson, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/31 4:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Joseph Goodson on behalf of SUSAN HASCALL (Joseph Goodson, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Thu 02/27 9:40 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AB PAC. Attorney Elena Alejandra Rodriguez Armenta terminated. (Rodriguez Armenta, Elena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/26 5:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tina Meng Morrison on behalf of AB PAC (Meng Morrison, Tina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 01/23 10:29 AM
MINUTE ORDER GRANTING14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The appearances of Attorneys Alexandre Maxime Peter Todorov, Omar Vincent Melehy, and Suvita Melehy are terminated. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/23/2025. (lcjeb1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
14 14 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 01/08 3:33 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Susan Hascall by Melehy & Associates LLC.(Melehy, Omar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service LCvR 83.6(c) Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, October 10, 2024
13 13 order .Order Thu 10/10 11:15 AM
ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) Initial disclosures shall be exchanged by November 22, 2024; 2) Motions to amend the pleadings or for joinder of additional parties shall be filed by December 9, 2024; 3) Discovery shall close on May 21, 2025; and 4) A post-discovery status hearing is scheduled for May 22, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. via Zoom. Signed by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/10/2024. (lcjeb1)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/10 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandre Maxime Peter Todorov on behalf of SUSAN HASCALL (Todorov, Alexandre)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 10/10 11:11 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 10/10/2024. Post Discovery Status Conference set for 5/22/2025 at 10:00 AM by Telephonic/VTC before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. Scheduling Order forthcoming via Chambers. (Court Reporter: Tammy Nestor.) (zcll)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 10/10 11:28 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Initial Disclosure due by 11/22/2024. Amended Pleadings due by 12/9/2024. Discovery due by 5/21/2025.(znbn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
11 11 misc Meet and Confer Statement Wed 10/02 2:58 PM
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT.(Melehy, Suvita)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order
Friday, September 20, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/20 10:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay McAleer on behalf of AB PAC (McAleer, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/20 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Stafford on behalf of AB PAC (Stafford, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/19 12:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Suvita Melehy on behalf of SUSAN HASCALL (Melehy, Suvita)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/17 4:22 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lindsay McAleer, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11165665. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AB PAC.(Rodriguez Armenta, Elena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Lindsay McAleer
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/17 4:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- William B. Stafford, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11165580. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AB PAC.(Rodriguez Armenta, Elena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of William B. Stafford
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/17 4:50 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William B. Stafford is GRANTED. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions] . So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/17/2024. (lcjeb1)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/17 4:52 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lindsay McAleer is GRANTED. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions] . So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/17/2024. (lcjeb1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
5 5 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Tue 09/10 4:21 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AB PAC (Rodriguez Armenta, Elena)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/10 4:18 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by AB PAC.(Rodriguez Armenta, Elena)
Related: [-]
order .Order Tue 09/10 6:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER: A telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference is set for October 10, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint report pursuant to FRCP 26(f) and Local Rule 16.3. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/10/2024. (lcjeb1)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 09/11 4:29 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/10/2024 at 10:00 AM in Telephonic/VTC before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (znbn)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
3 3 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Fri 08/30 4:37 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. AB PAC (d/b/a "American Bridge") served on 8/20/2024, answer due 9/10/2024 (Melehy, Omar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 08/15 2:10 PM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to AB PAC (d/b/a "American Bridge").(zmtm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 08/15 10:59 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11093929) filed by SUSAN HASCALL.(Melehy, Omar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 08/15 2:06 PM
Case Assigned to Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmtm)
Related: [-]