Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-44838

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04350
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2024
Terminated:Sep 20, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Emdadur Rahman, Defendant
5160 Lewis Drive
Sterling Heights, MI 48310
Represented By
Emdadur Rahman
contact info
Plaintiff
Fremont Insurance Company, Plaintiff
933 Main St
Fremont, MI 49412
Represented By
Martin W. Hable
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Monday, September 23, 2024
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Mon 09/23 11:18 AM
Certificate of Service of Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Fremont Insurance Company. (Hable, Martin)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
11 11 order Default Judgment Fri 09/20 4:29 PM
Judgment Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 7
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Fri 09/20 10:19 AM
Corrected Certificate of Service of Motion for Default Judgment, Affidavit of Default and Clerk's Default Entry Filed by Plaintiff Fremont Insurance Company Related [+]. (Hable, Martin)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Judgment
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 09/20 4:29 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4350 : Granted by Default Judgment. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 09/20 4:34 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4350 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 09/20 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Clerk's Entry of Default
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Thu 09/19 3:29 PM
Certificate of Service of Motion for Default Judgment, Affidavit of Default and Clerk's Default Entry Filed by Plaintiff Fremont Insurance Company Related [+]. (Hable, Martin)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Judgment
7 7 motion Default Judgment Thu 09/19 3:18 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Fremont Insurance Company (Hable, Martin)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Notice/Affidavit of Default Thu 09/19 3:16 PM
Notice/Affidavit of Default Filed by Plaintiff Fremont Insurance Company. (Hable, Martin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
5 5 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 09/17 4:09 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default of Emdadur Rahman - Default Judgment Motion due by 10/1/2024. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 08/14 2:33 PM
Summons Service Executed on Emdadur Rahman 8/14/2024 (Hable, Martin)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Wed 08/14 1:50 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Plaintiff Fremont Insurance Company. (Hable, Martin)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 08/14 1:36 PM
Summons Issued on Emdadur Rahman Answer Due 09/13/2024 (Hable, Martin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/14 1:36 PM
Adversary case 24-04350 (65 (Dischargeability - other)): Complaint by Fremont Insurance Company against Emdadur Rahman. Fee Amount $350. (Hable, Martin)
Related: [-]