Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Eli J Richardson
Referred: Barbara D Holmes
Case #: 3:24-cv-00990
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause29:0701 Americans With Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 11, 2025 2:30 AM CST
Defendant
C.B. Ragland Company
Plaintiff
Janna Marie Gordon
1650 E Broadway
Gallatin, TN 37066
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Connie Austin
Terminated: 01/14/2025
Defendant
Kristen Cravens
Terminated: 01/14/2025
Defendant
Michael W. Hayes
Terminated: 01/14/2025
Defendant
Mildred Kiddy
Terminated: 01/14/2025
Defendant
Bill McKnight
Terminated: 01/14/2025
Defendant
Chris Stranix
Terminated: 01/14/2025
Defendant
Buffy Wilson
Terminated: 01/14/2025

GPO Jan 14 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OF THE COURT: The IFP application 2 is GRANTED. The Clerk is INSTRUCTED to send Plaintiff a service packet for Defendant C.B. Ragland Company. Upon return of the completed service packet, PROCESS SHALL ISSUE. The individual Defendants--surnamed Austin, Wilson, Stranix, McKnight, Kiddy, Cravens, and Hayes--are DISMISSED from this action. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. §§ 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 1/14/2025. (xc: Order and 1 service packet forwarded to Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)

Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 04/24 11:33 AM
REPLY to Response to re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by C.B. Ragland Company. (Leyes, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/18 4:47 PM
ADDENDUM re18 Response in Opposition to Motion by Janna Marie Gordon. (kc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 04/17 12:45 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Janna Marie Gordon. (kc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
misc Annotation - Bar Status Wed 03/26 8:51 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Courtney L. Leyes, Emeline Brown Hebert admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
17 17 misc Business Entity Disclosure Statement Tue 03/25 2:46 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by C.B. Ragland Company. (Leyes, Courtney)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/25 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Emeline Brown Hebert on behalf of C.B. Ragland Company (Hebert, Emeline)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/25 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney L. Leyes on behalf of C.B. Ragland Company (Leyes, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/24 5:00 PM
ORDER: The deadline for Plaintiff to file a response to the motion to dismiss12 is April 18, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 3/24/2025. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
13 13 12 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Tue 03/18 4:24 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by C.B. Ragland Company .(Leyes, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Buffy J. Wilson,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Michael W. Hayes,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Declaration of William A. McKnight
12 12 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 03/18 4:22 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by C.B. Ragland Company. (Leyes, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/04 10:11 AM
SUMMONS returned executed C.B. Ragland Company served on 2/25/2025. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (kc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
10 10 service Summons Issued Thu 01/30 9:42 AM
Summons issued as to C.B. Ragland Company. Service packet placed in USM box at intake. (kc)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order Mon 01/27 4:17 PM
ORDER: As Plaintiff was already advised, she is responsible for returning a completed service packet for Defendant by no later than February 14, 2025. Failure to timely return a completed service packet may result in the dismissal of this lawsuit. The parties are advised that, once Defendant is served with process, they will be required to make an early attempt to resolve the case through settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 1/27/2025. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ab)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 01/23 11:37 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes added per Order8 . (kc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
8 8 5 pgs order Memorandum Opinion of the Court ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 01/14 8:20 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OF THE COURT: The IFP application2 is GRANTED. The Clerk is INSTRUCTED to send Plaintiff a service packet for Defendant C.B. Ragland Company. Upon return of the completed service packet, PROCESS SHALL ISSUE. The individual Defendants--surnamed Austin, Wilson, Stranix, McKnight, Kiddy, Cravens, and Hayes--are DISMISSED from this action. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. §§ 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 1/14/2025. (xc: Order and 1 service packet forwarded to Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate Mon 09/16 8:49 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service filed by Janna Marie Gordon re6 Supplement filed by Janna Marie Gordon. (kc)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
6 6 misc Supplement Fri 08/30 3:09 PM
SUPPLEMENT filed by Janna Marie Gordon re1 Complaint. (kc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
5 5 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Thu 08/15 2:43 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Thu 08/15 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Thu 08/15 2:42 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 08/15 2:40 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Janna Marie Gordon. (kc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/15 2:39 PM
COMPLAINT against Connie Austin, C.B. Ragland Company, Kristen Cravens, Michael W. Hayes, Mildred Kiddy, Bill McKnight, Chris Stranix, Buffy Wilson, filed by Janna Marie Gordon.(kc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Docket Thu 08/15 2:45 PM
Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (kc)
Related: [-]