New Jersey District Court
Judge:Brian R Martinotti
Referred: Michael A Hammer
Case #: 2:24-cv-08493
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2024
Terminated:Nov 06, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 11, 2025 3:37 AM EST
Defendant
IGENOMIX USA, INC.
Defendant
BRYNN LEVY, Ph. D
Notice Only
arbnwk
Plaintiff
HEATHER BEESON-MAZZONE
Represented By
JILL HEATHER TEITEL
Law Office Of Jill H. Teitel, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER MAZZONE
Represented By
JILL HEATHER TEITEL
Law Office Of Jill H. Teitel, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
9 9 order Stipulation and Order Order of Dismissal Wed 11/06 1:28 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE as to this action and any counterclaims with prejudice and without costs to any party against any other. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 11/6/2024. (dam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
8 8 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Tue 11/05 10:13 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal and Order by HEATHER BEESON-MAZZONE, CHRISTOPHER MAZZONE. (TEITEL, JILL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 09/19 1:15 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHRISTOPHER MAZZONE, HEATHER BEESON-MAZZONE. BRYNN LEVY, PhD waiver sent on 9/9/2024, answer due 11/8/2024. (TEITEL, JILL)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 09/19 1:14 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHRISTOPHER MAZZONE, HEATHER BEESON-MAZZONE. IGENOMIX USA, INC. waiver sent on 9/9/2024, answer due 11/8/2024. (TEITEL, JILL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
5 5 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Tue 09/10 4:13 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by HEATHER BEESON-MAZZONE, CHRISTOPHER MAZZONE. (TEITEL, JILL)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 08, 2024
4 4 12 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Sun 09/08 10:50 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT correcting corporate defendant name against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by HEATHER BEESON-MAZZONE.(TEITEL, JILL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
3 3 order Text Order Tue 09/03 9:35 AM
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE by September 10, 2024, by filing a letter not more than 3 pages, why the case should not be dismissed for lack of subject jurisdiction. As to federal question jurisdiction, it is not clear that any cause of action is being asserted under the Lanham Act. As to diversity jurisdiction, the citizenship of the LLC defendant is not properly pled. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint resolving these issues by September 10, 2024, if appropriate. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 09/03/2024. (lr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 08/16 11:22 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to IGENOMIX USA LLC, BRYNN LEVY, PhD. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 08/16 11:23 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (dam)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Fillable PDF Fri 08/16 11:24 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The1 -1 - Summons filed by Jill Teitel on 8/15/2024 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (dam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 08/15 5:43 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15593391) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Heather Beeson-Mazzone.(TEITEL, JILL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 08/16 10:42 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Arbitration Fri 08/16 10:42 AM
CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, )
Related: [-]