Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Charles Esque Fleming
Case #: 1:24-cv-01398
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2024
Terminated:Dec 16, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 11, 2025 3:26 AM EST
Defendant
Michelle Silverstein
300 Capital Hill Circle
Chagrin Falls, OH 44022
Represented By
David L. Drechsler
Mcdonald Hopkins - Cleveland
contact info
Franklin C. Malemud
Reminger Co. - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
Kim Joseph
Represented By
David L. Drechsler
Mcdonald Hopkins - Cleveland
contact info
Franklin C. Malemud
Reminger Co. - Cleveland
contact info
Plaintiff
Alec Reed Deckman
9765 Haven Port Lane
Ooltewah, TN 37363
Represented By
Michael P. Harvey
Law Office Of Michael P. Harvey
contact info
Plaintiff
Allison Marie Deckman
9765 Haven Port Lane
Ooltewah, TN 37363
Represented By
Michael P. Harvey
Law Office Of Michael P. Harvey
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Cole Deckman
9765 Haven Port Lane
Ooltewah, TN 37363
Represented By
Michael P. Harvey
Law Office Of Michael P. Harvey
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael P. Harvey
Represented By
Michael P. Harvey
Law Office Of Michael P. Harvey
contact info
Plaintiff
Trustee Brian E. McGrath
Represented By
Michael P. Harvey
Law Office Of Michael P. Harvey
contact info

GPO Dec 16 2024
Memorandum Opinion and Order: The Court GRANTS Defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction under F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1). (ECF No. 21). The Court lacks jurisdiction over this case, so the case is dismissed. Because the case is closed, the pending motion to quash (ECF No. 19) and motion to enforce subpoenas (ECF No. 26) are DENIED as MOOT. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 12/16/2024. (S,SR)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
32 32 resp Reply Wed 02/12 9:48 AM
Reply in support of29 Motion for sanctions filed by Kim Joseph, Michelle Silverstein. (Drechsler, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
31 31 resp Opposition Thu 02/06 4:17 PM
Opposition to29 Motion for sanctions Against Michael P. Harvey, Esq. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
30 30 oth_doc Proposed Order Fri 01/31 2:22 PM
Proposed Order filed by Kim Joseph, Michelle Silverstein. Related document(s)29 . (Drechsler, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
29 29 motion Sanctions Thu 01/30 4:05 PM
Motion for sanctions filed by Kim Joseph, Michelle Silverstein.(Drechsler, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - 4/18/24 Judgment Entry,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Complaint filed 12/30/2024,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Application for Authority to Administer Estate filed 4/19/24,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Journal Entry filed 12/8/2020,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Journal Entry filed 5/11/2021,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Journal Entry filed 11/21/2023,
Att: 8 Proposed Order
Monday, December 16, 2024
28 28 order Judgment Mon 12/16 1:28 PM
Judgment: For the reasons set forth in the contemporaneously filed27 Memorandum Opinion and Order, Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED. (ECF No.21 ). Accordingly, this case is closed. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 12/16/2024. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
27 27 6 pgs order Memorandum Opinion and Order Mon 12/16 1:23 PM
Memorandum Opinion and Order: The Court GRANTS Defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction under F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1). (ECF No.21 ). The Court lacks jurisdiction over this case, so the case is dismissed. Because the case is closed, the pending motion to quash (ECF No.19 ) and motion to enforce subpoenas (ECF No.26 ) are DENIED as MOOT. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 12/16/2024. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
26 26 motion Enforce Thu 12/05 6:15 PM
Motion to enforce Subpoenas and Request for Contempt Pursuant to Federal Civil Rule 45(g) filed by Michael P. Harvey, Alec Reed Deckman, Matthew Cole Deckman, Allison Marie Deckman, Brian E. McGrath. Related document(s)10 ,22 ,23 ,19 ,15 .(Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Email Communications with Regions,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Correspondence with Attorney Hartman,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Subpoenas,
Att: 4 Exhibit D-Emails btwn Attorney Pemerton and Regions
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
25 25 resp Reply Wed 12/04 4:06 PM
Reply in support of21 Motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Kim Joseph, Michelle Silverstein.(Drechsler, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Application for Authority to Administer Estate,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Appellant's Brief,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Motion to Dismiss
Thursday, November 21, 2024
24 24 resp Opposition Thu 11/21 3:08 PM
Opposition to21 Motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs.(Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Letters of Authority,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Report of Dr. Denis Kennedy,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Admissions to Decedent's Incompetence
Thursday, October 31, 2024
23 23 resp Reply Thu 10/31 10:47 AM
Reply in support of19 Motion to quash Plaintiffs' Subpoenas , Motion for sanctions filed by Kim Joseph, Michelle Silverstein.(Drechsler, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Email Communications,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Correspondence to Plaintiffs' Counsel,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Email Communications,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Application to Probate Will,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Application for Admission to Probate, Lost, Spoliated or Destroyed Will
Monday, October 28, 2024
order Order Mon 10/28 8:34 AM
Order: [non-document] The Court is in receipt of Defendants' motion to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1). (ECF No.21 ). Defendants' pending motion to quash and motion for sanctions (ECF No.19 ) are held in abeyance until the Court rules on the motion to dismiss. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 10/28/2024. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
22 22 resp Opposition Thu 10/24 3:28 PM
Opposition to19 Motion to quash Plaintiffs' Subpoenas , Motion for sanctions filed by All Plaintiffs.(Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Letters of Authority
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
21 21 motion Dismiss Wed 10/23 9:09 AM
Motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Kim Joseph, Michelle Silverstein.(Drechsler, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Judgment Entry,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Notice of Appeal,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Docket
Thursday, October 17, 2024
20 20 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Thu 10/17 12:45 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Report of Defendants Pursuant to Rule 26(f) - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Kim Joseph, Michelle Silverstein.(Drechsler, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Email Communications
19 19 motion Quash Thu 10/17 9:30 AM
Motion to quash Plaintiffs' Subpoenas and for Sanctions filed by Kim Joseph, Michelle Silverstein.(Drechsler, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Email Communications,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Judgment Entry,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Notice of Appeal
order Order Thu 10/17 2:02 PM
Order: [non-document] Before the Court is Defendants'19 Motion to quash Plaintiffs' Subpoenas and for Sanctions . Plaintiffs shall file a response by October 24, 2024. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 10/17/2024. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
18 18 service Subpoena Returned Executed Wed 10/16 1:41 PM
Subpoena Returned Executed; served upon Mrs. Redle on behalf of Custodian of Records c/o Stephen M. Redle by hand delivery via Process Server on 10/07/2024 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs(Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Duces Tecum
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
17 17 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Tue 10/15 4:26 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting of Plaintiffs - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 13, 2024
16 16 notice Initial Disclosures (atty event) Sun 10/13 6:01 PM
Initial Disclosures filed by All Plaintiffs. (Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
15 15 service Subpoena Returned Executed Fri 10/11 6:03 PM
Subpoena Returned Executed; served upon Stephanie Gibson, SOP Intake Assoc at Corporate Service Company for Regions Bank by hand-delivery via Process Server on 10/08/2024 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs(Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Duces Tecum
Monday, October 07, 2024
14 14 service Subpoena Returned Executed Mon 10/07 5:32 PM
Subpoena Returned Executed; served upon Daylen Platt, SOP Intake Assoc at CT Corporation for Progressive by hand-delivery via Process Server on 10/04/2024 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs(Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Duces Tecum
Friday, October 04, 2024
13 13 service Subpoena Returned Executed Fri 10/04 6:34 PM
Subpoena Returned Executed; served upon Stephanie Gibson, SOP Intake Assoc at Corporation Service Co. for Western Reserve Medical Group, LLC by hand-delivery via Process Server on 10/03/2024 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs(Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Duces Tecum
12 12 service Subpoena Returned Executed Fri 10/04 6:30 PM
Subpoena Returned Executed; served upon Stephanie Gibson, SOP Intake Assoc at Corporation Service Co for Scottsbridge Trading Company by hand-delivery via Process Server on 10/03/2024 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs(Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Duces Tecum
11 11 service Subpoena Returned Executed Fri 10/04 6:22 PM
Subpoena Returned Executed; served upon Daylen Platt, SOP Intake Assoc at National Registered Agents, Inc. for Ernst & Young by hand-delivery via Process Server on 10/04/2024 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs(Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Duces Tecum
Thursday, October 03, 2024
10 10 service Subpoena Returned Executed Thu 10/03 4:32 PM
Subpoena Returned Executed; served upon Becky Utterback for Kathryn M. Williams, Esq. by Process Server on 10/01/24 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs(Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Duces Tecum
9 9 service Subpoena Returned Executed Thu 10/03 4:29 PM
Subpoena Returned Executed; served upon Lois Gregory of Meaden & Moore by Process Server on 10/01/24 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs(Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Duces Tecum
8 8 service Subpoena Returned Executed Thu 10/03 4:26 PM
Subpoena Returned Executed; served upon Denise Wilkens of JP Morgan by Process Server on 10/01/24 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs(Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Duces Tecum
7 7 service Subpoena Returned Executed Thu 10/03 4:23 PM
Subpoena Returned Executed; served upon Tracey Foyle of Absolute Pharmacy, Inc. by Process Server on 10/01/2024 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs(Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Duces Tecum
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
6 6 notice Notice (atty event) Tue 09/24 6:44 PM
Notice of Filing filed by All Plaintiffs.(Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Letter on ESI
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 09/24 3:35 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Michelle Silverstein waiver sent on 9/9/2024, answer due 11/8/2024 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 09/24 3:34 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Kim Joseph waiver sent on 9/9/2024, answer due 11/8/2024 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
3 3 oth_doc Praecipe Fri 09/06 3:16 PM
Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by All Plaintiffs.(Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint
Friday, August 16, 2024
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Fri 08/16 8:38 AM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Kim Joseph, Michelle Silverstein. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
utility Add and Terminate Judge Fri 08/16 8:31 AM
Judge Charles Esque Fleming assigned to case. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Fri 08/16 8:32 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
1 1 53 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 08/15 4:38 PM
Complaint with jury demand against Kimberly Joseph, Michelle Silverstein. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12694540.. Filed by Allison Marie Deckman, Estate of William J. Deckman, c/o Michael P. Harvey, ESq., Administrator/W.W.A., Brian E McGrath, FBO Alec and Matthew Deckman, Alec Reed Deckman, Matthew Cole Deckman. (Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Will of William John Deckman,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-Caring Bridge Story,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-Medical Examination Report dtd 4 20-2019
Att: 4 Exhibit 4-POA of Deckman dtd 4 15-2019
Att: 5 Exhibit 5-Genworth Beneficiary Designation Change,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6-Genworth Proof of Loss,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7-Genworth Check $502,202.32,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8-Entry Appointing Fiduciary; Letters of Authority,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 10 Summons for Kim Joseph,
Att: 11 Summons for Michelle Silverstein