Utah District Court
Judge:Jill N Parrish
Referred: Dustin B Pead
Case #: 2:24-cv-00586
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2024
Terminated:Nov 12, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 11, 2025 1:31 AM MST
Defendant
NU2U Skincare LLC
Plaintiff
NSE Products, Inc.
Represented By
Eric G. Maxfield
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
H. Matthew Horlacher
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nu Skin Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By
Eric G. Maxfield
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
H. Matthew Horlacher
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
8 8 misc Report Regarding Patent and Trademark Tue 11/12 2:21 PM
Report on the Final Decision of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (dle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 11/12 12:30 PM
Civil Case Terminated in light of7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. Case closed.. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to case. (dle)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Atty) Mon 11/11 3:16 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs NSE Products, Inc., Nu Skin Enterprises, Inc. (Maxfield, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Acknowledgment Thu 10/10 3:21 PM
NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order4 filed by Plaintiffs NSE Products, Inc., Nu Skin Enterprises, Inc. (Maxfield, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
4 4 order Civil Standing Order Thu 10/03 12:14 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/3/2024. (lwh)
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 10/03 3:11 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/3/2024. (lwh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
3 3 misc Report Regarding Patent and Trademark Thu 08/15 4:24 PM
Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (sg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint
2 2 notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Thu 08/15 4:19 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Plaintiffs NSE Products, Inc., Nu Skin Enterprises, Inc.. (Notice generated by Clerk's Office) Form due by 9/5/2024. (sg)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint (Atty) Thu 08/15 4:00 PM
COMPLAINT against NU2U Skincare LLC (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5155391) filed by Nu Skin Enterprises, Inc., NSE Products, Inc.. (Horlacher, H.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 08/15 4:19 PM
Judge Jill N. Parrish added. Case number will now read 2:24-cv-00586-JNP. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (sg)
Related: [-]