Washington Western District Court
Judge:Tana Lin
Case #: 2:24-cv-01263
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Trademark
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 11, 2025 12:34 AM PST
Counter Claimant
The Alvis Family Trust
Represented By
Paul J Bruene
Baker & Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Jeffrey Hugo Adams
Baker & Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Douglas Anderson Grady
Baker Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Counter Claimant
Internet Technology Group Inc
Represented By
Paul J Bruene
Baker & Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Jeffrey Hugo Adams
Baker & Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Douglas Anderson Grady
Baker Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Counter Claimant
Chi Alvis
Represented By
Paul J Bruene
Baker & Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Jeffrey Hugo Adams
Baker & Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Douglas Anderson Grady
Baker Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Counter Claimant
Charles Alvis
Represented By
Paul J Bruene
Baker & Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Jeffrey Hugo Adams
Baker & Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Douglas Anderson Grady
Baker Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Counter Defendant
Innovative Research Technology Inc
Represented By
Justin Patrick Walsh
Gleam Law PLLC
contact info
James P Ware
Gleam Law
contact info
Defendant
Chi Alvis
Represented By
Paul J Bruene
Baker & Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Jeffrey Hugo Adams
Baker & Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Douglas Anderson Grady
Baker Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Defendant
Internet Technology Group Inc
Represented By
Paul J Bruene
Baker & Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Jeffrey Hugo Adams
Baker & Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Douglas Anderson Grady
Baker Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Defendant
Affiliate John Does 1-20
Defendant
Affiliate John Doe Companies 1-20
Defendant
The Alvis Family Trust
Represented By
Paul J Bruene
Baker & Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Jeffrey Hugo Adams
Baker & Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Douglas Anderson Grady
Baker Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Defendant
Charles Alvis
Represented By
Paul J Bruene
Baker & Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Jeffrey Hugo Adams
Baker & Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Douglas Anderson Grady
Baker Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Plaintiff
Innovative Research Technology Inc
Represented By
Justin Patrick Walsh
Gleam Law PLLC
contact info
James P Ware
Gleam Law
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Michael Heisler
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Charles Alvis
Represented By
Paul J Bruene
Baker & Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Jeffrey Hugo Adams
Baker & Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Douglas Anderson Grady
Baker Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Chi Alvis
Represented By
Paul J Bruene
Baker & Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Jeffrey Hugo Adams
Baker & Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Douglas Anderson Grady
Baker Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Internet Technology Group Inc
Represented By
Paul J Bruene
Baker & Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Jeffrey Hugo Adams
Baker & Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Douglas Anderson Grady
Baker Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
The Alvis Family Trust
Represented By
Paul J Bruene
Baker & Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Jeffrey Hugo Adams
Baker & Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info
Douglas Anderson Grady
Baker Hostetler Llp (sea)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
39 39 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Party ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 05/02 8:11 AM
ORDER granting Defendant Heisler's30 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant ITG's third-party counterclaim against Third-Party Defendant Heisler is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. If Defendant ITG opts to refile its claims against Third-Party Defendant Heisler, it SHALL do so no later than 6/2/2025. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
38 38 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 03/14 5:24 AM
REPLY, filed by ThirdParty Defendant Michael Heisler, TO RESPONSE to30 MOTION to Dismiss Party Heisler (McIntosh, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
37 37 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Thu 03/13 4:04 PM
ORDER granting36 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Court having reviewed the pleadings, hereby allows withdrawal of attorneys of record, Justin P. Walsh, James P. Ware, and Mike Solomon of Gleam Law, PLLC, effective immediately. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (MJV)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 03/13 2:00 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney JUSTIN WALSH, JAMES WARE, MICHAEL SOLOMON , filed by All Plaintiffs. Noting Date 3/13/2025, (Walsh, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Thu 03/13 1:43 PM
Attorneys Blair Michael Russ and Joseph W. McIntosh for parties Michael Heisler and Innovative Research Technology Inc; per35 Notice of Appearance. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
35 35 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/11 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joseph W. McIntosh on behalf of Plaintiff Innovative Research Technology Inc. (McIntosh, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
34 34 order TL Order Setting Trial Date & Related Dates (FORM) Mon 03/10 2:02 PM
ORDER RESETTING JURY TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Tana Lin. This matter comes before the Court, sua sponte. To accommodate conflicts in the Court's trial schedule, the Court hereby RESETS the trial date and ORDERS the following amended pretrial schedule: 5-7 Day Jury Trial is reset for 8/10/2026 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Tana Lin. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 1/12/2026, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 2/11/2026, Discovery Motions due by 2/11/2026, Discovery completed by 3/13/2026, Dispositive motions due by 4/10/2026, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 5/11/2026, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 6/10/2026, Motions in Limine due by 7/6/2026, Pretrial Order due by 7/20/2026, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 7/24/2026, Pretrial Conference reset for 7/31/2026 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Tana Lin. (KMP)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
33 33 respm Response to Motion Mon 03/03 7:04 PM
RESPONSE, by ThirdParty Plaintiff Internet Technology Group Inc, to30 MOTION to Dismiss Party Heisler . (Bruene, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
32 32 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Noting Date Thu 02/20 3:30 PM
MINUTE ORDER (text only) made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: Pursuant to the stipulated motion for extension of time filed by the Parties (DKt. No.31 ), the Court EXTENDS the deadline for Defendant to respond to Third-Party Defendant Michael Heisler's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No.30 ) to March 3, 2025, and Heisler SHALL file his reply by March 17, 2025. The motion to dismiss SHALL be re-noted to March 17, 2025. (KMP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
31 31 motion Extension of Time-Other Wed 02/19 5:55 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss , filed by Defendants Internet Technology Group Inc, Charles Alvis, Chi Alvis, The Alvis Family Trust, Third Party Plaintiffs Charles Alvis, Internet Technology Group Inc, Chi Alvis, The Alvis Family Trust, Counter Claimants Charles Alvis, Internet Technology Group Inc, Chi Alvis, The Alvis Family Trust. Noting Date 2/19/2025, (Bruene, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, February 03, 2025
30 30 motion Dismiss Party Mon 02/03 1:31 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Party Heisler , filed by ThirdParty Defendant Michael Heisler. Noting Date 3/3/2025, (Walsh, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Heisler Dismissal
utility Terminate Motions (Public) Notice of Docket Text Modification Mon 02/03 12:24 PM
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re29 MOTION to Dismiss Party Michael Heisler . Entry stricken, filer we re-file motion with corrected/ readable image. (CDA)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
29 29 motion Dismiss Party Fri 01/31 4:09 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Party Michael Heisler , filed by ThirdParty Defendant Michael Heisler. Noting Date 2/28/2025, (Walsh, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Dismissing Heisler
Monday, January 13, 2025
28 28 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 01/13 4:49 PM
ANSWER to22 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Innovative Research Technology Inc.(Walsh, Justin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
27 27 misc Affidavit Thu 01/09 2:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Due Diligence re1 Complaint, Summons filed by Defendants Internet Technology Group Inc, Charles Alvis, Chi Alvis, The Alvis Family Trust, Third Party Plaintiffs Charles Alvis, Internet Technology Group Inc, Chi Alvis, The Alvis Family Trust, Counter Claimants Charles Alvis, Internet Technology Group Inc, Chi Alvis, The Alvis Family Trust (Grady, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/27 8:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey Hugo Adams on behalf of Defendants Internet Technology Group Inc, Charles Alvis, Chi Alvis, The Alvis Family Trust, Third Party Plaintiffs Charles Alvis, Internet Technology Group Inc, Chi Alvis, The Alvis Family Trust, Counter Claimants Charles Alvis, Internet Technology Group Inc, Chi Alvis, The Alvis Family Trust. (Adams, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
25 25 service Summons Issued Thu 12/26 4:33 PM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Michael Heisler. (MJV)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Praecipe for a Summons Thu 12/26 11:02 AM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re22 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, Michael Eugene Heisler by ThirdParty Plaintiff Internet Technology Group Inc (Grady, Douglas)
Related: [-]
notice Notice re Lack of Proper Signature Thu 12/26 4:25 PM
NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The22 Answer was improperly signed by Jeffrey Hugo Adams . As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with LCR 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with[LINK:ECF Filing Procedures] . Please file a notice of appearance to receive notices. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
23 23 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Tue 12/24 9:25 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Affiliate John Doe Companies 1-20, Affiliate John Does 1-20, Internet Technology Group Inc, Charles Alvis, Chi Alvis, The Alvis Family Trust. (Grady, Douglas)
Related: [-]
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Third Party Complaint Counterclaim Tue 12/24 9:03 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Michael Heisler with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff All Plaintiffs by Charles Alvis, Internet Technology Group Inc, Chi Alvis, The Alvis Family Trust.(Grady, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
21 21 order TL Order Setting Trial Date & Related Dates (FORM) Wed 12/18 4:57 PM
ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Tana Lin. 5-7 Day Jury Trial is set for 6/15/2026 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Tana Lin. Joinder of Parties due by 1/15/2025, Amended Pleadings due by 2/12/2025, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 11/17/2025, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 12/17/2025, Discovery Motions due by 12/17/2025, Discovery completed by 1/16/2026, Dispositive motions due by 2/13/2026, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 3/17/2026, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 4/16/2026, Motions in Limine due by 5/11/2026, Pretrial Order due by 5/26/2026, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 5/29/2026, Pretrial Conference set for 6/5/2026 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Tana Lin. (KMP)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
20 20 notice Notice-Other Mon 12/09 3:37 PM
NOTICE Stipulated Notice to Extend Deadline to Answer or otherwise Respond ; filed by Defendants Charles Alvis, Chi Alvis, The Alvis Family Trust. (Grady, Douglas)
Related: [-]
utility Notice to Filer Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 12/09 4:09 PM
Notice of Re-Setting Deadline(s) re Parties'20 Notice/Stipulation. Pursuant to section III(A) of Judge Lin's Standing Order, Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 12/23/2024. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
19 19 misc Joint Status Report Tue 11/05 4:25 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 5-7. Filed by Plaintiff Innovative Research Technology Inc, Defendants Internet Technology Group Inc, Charles Alvis, Chi Alvis, The Alvis Family Trust.(Walsh, Justin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
utility Notice to Filer Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 10/10 11:16 AM
Notice of Re-Setting Deadline(s) re Parties'17 Notice/Stipulation. Pursuant to section III(A) of Judge Lin's Standing Order, the FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/22/2024. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
18 18 service Waiver of Service Wed 10/09 3:14 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Charles Alvis mailed on 10/8/2024; Chi Alvis mailed on 10/8/2024; Internet Technology Group Inc mailed on 10/8/2024; The Alvis Family Trust mailed on 10/8/2024 (Walsh, Justin)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice-Other Wed 10/09 12:01 PM
NOTICE to extend CR 26(f) conference deadline to 10/22/2024 ; filed by All Plaintiffs. (Walsh, Justin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
16 16 order TL Joint Status Report Order (Form) Tue 09/10 11:57 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Tana Lin. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/8/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/22/2024, Joint Status Report due by 11/5/2024. (KMP)
Related: [-]
15 15 order TL Minute Order re Chambers Procedures Tue 09/10 11:56 AM
MINUTE ORDER (text only) made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: The Court has posted Chambers Procedures at[LINK:https://www.wawd.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-procedures] . All counsel and unrepresented ("pro se") parties are DIRECTED to review them, if they have not already done so. Failure to follow the requirements set forth in the Chambers Procedures may result in the imposition of sanctions. (KMP)
Related: [-]
14 14 order TL Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Tue 09/10 11:55 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455 AND CANON 3 OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Tana Lin. (KMP)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 09/06 4:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge Tana Lin for all further proceedings. Hon. S. Kate Vaughan no longer assigned to case. (SNP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
12 12 misc Consent Letter & Form Thu 09/05 8:41 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 9/12/2024. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (SNP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/04 4:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Paul J Bruene on behalf of Defendants Charles Alvis, Chi Alvis, Internet Technology Group Inc, The Alvis Family Trust. (Bruene, Paul)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/04 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Douglas Anderson Grady on behalf of Defendants Charles Alvis, Chi Alvis, Internet Technology Group Inc, The Alvis Family Trust. (Grady, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
9 9 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 08/22 4:06 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET; filed by Plaintiff Innovative Research Technology Inc. (Walsh, Justin)
Related: [-]
8 8 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Thu 08/22 3:45 PM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Complaint,. ***Action Required*** Civil Cover Sheet Omitted. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA)
Related: [-]
7 7 utility Report Regarding Patent/Trademark/Copyright Thu 08/22 2:29 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (CR)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 08/22 8:53 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Charles Alvis, Chi Alvis, Internet Technology Group Inc, The Alvis Family Trust. (MW)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Thu 08/22 8:50 AM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Complaint,. ***Action Required*** Copyright/Patent/Trademark Forms Omitted. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (MW)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 08/22 8:37 AM
Hon. S. Kate Vaughan added. (MW)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Thu 08/22 8:39 AM
Attorney James P Ware added for Innovative Research Technology Inc; per3 Notice of Attorney Association. (MW)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
4 4 misc Praecipe for a Summons Mon 08/19 3:46 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Alvis Family Trust by Plaintiff Innovative Research Technology, Inc.(Walsh, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Alvis Family Trust
3 3 notice Notice of Attorney Association Mon 08/19 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Justin Patrick Walsh on behalf of Plaintiff Innovative Research Technology, Inc.. (Walsh, Justin)
Related: [-]
2 2 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Mon 08/19 3:18 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Walsh, Justin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 08/15 5:28 PM
COMPLAINT For Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND Related [+] Attorney Justin Patrick Walsh added to party Innovative Research Technology, Inc.(pty:pla) filed by Innovative Research Technology, Inc..(Walsh, Justin)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8588903
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Summons Internet Technology Group, Inc.,
Att: 4 Summons Charles ALVIS and Chi ALVIS,
Att: 5 Summons Alvis Family Trust