Connecticut District Court
Judge:Victor A Bolden
Referred: Robert M Spector
Case #: 3:24-cv-01324
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2024
Terminated:Dec 11, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 11, 2025 3:17 AM EST
Defendant
FreshPoint Connecticut LLC
Represented By
Paula N. Anthony
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Emily Anne Zaklukiewicz
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Atianna Arder
Represented By
Michael John Reilly
Cicchiello & Cicchiello, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
25 25 order Order Wed 12/11 2:48 PM
ORDER. Based on the report of the case's settlement, rather than continue to keep this case open, the Court will administratively close it. The parties have until January 10, 2025 to file a stipulation of dismissal, or move to reopen the case. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to close this case. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/11/24. (Nelson, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
24 24 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 12/10 1:25 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge S. Dave Vatti: Settlement Conference held on 12/10/2024. Total Time: 1 hour and 20 minutes. Case settled. (Court Reporter: Zoom. On record portion 4 minutes.) (Ellis, B)
Related: [-]
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Fri 12/13 2:37 PM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Murphy, T)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
23 23 utility Calendar Entry Tue 10/15 10:42 AM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. A Settlement Conference via Zoom is set for 12/10/2024 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge S. Dave Vatti. The Court will distribute the Zoom information to the parties via email . (Ellis, B)
Related: [-]
22 22 2 pgs order Order Tue 10/15 10:36 AM
ORDER. A Settlement Conference is set for 12/10/2024 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge S. Dave Vatti. Please see the attached Settlement Conference Order for detailed instructions and deadlines. Signed by Judge S. Dave Vatti on 10/15/2024. (Ellis, B)
Related: [-]
21 21 minutes Status Conference Tue 10/15 10:31 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge S. Dave Vatti: Status Conference held on 10/15/2024. Total Time: 5 minutes. (Ellis, B)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
20 20 utility Calendar Entry Wed 10/09 3:57 PM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. A pre-settlement telephonic status conference has been set for 10/15/2024 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge S. Dave Vatti. The purpose of the call is to discuss scheduling and any information exchange/discovery necessary to make the conference most meaningful. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court will require parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next ninety days and have their own calendars available to aid in scheduling. If either counsel/party develops a firm, unavoidable conflict on 10/15/2024 at 9:30 a.m., s/he should not file a motion for continuance but rather should call Chambers (203) 579-5593 as soon as possible with opposing counsel on the line to work out an alternate day and time for the pre-settlement telephonic status conference. Parties should dial 866-434-5269 , to connect to the conference and enter access code 2006808 . (Ellis, B)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
19 19 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 10/08 12:57 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Dave Vatti for Settlement. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/8/2024.(Murphy, T)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Scheduling Order Tue 10/08 12:01 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court adopts the following schedule for pre-trial deadlines based on the parties' Rule 26(f) Report, the Court's preferences with respect to scheduling, and the Court's current calendar: - Initial Disclosures due by November 1, 2024 . - Damages analysis due by December 6, 2024 . - Joinder of parties due by December 6, 2024 . - Amended pleadings due by December 6, 2024 . - Designation of expert witnesses due by February 7, 2025 (Plaintiff). - Designation of expert witnesses due by April 4, 2025 (Defendant). - Depositions of expert witnesses shall be completed by May 30, 2025 (Plaintiff). - Depositions of expert witnesses shall be completed by June 6, 2025 (Defendant). - Depositions of fact witnesses shall be completed by June 6, 2025 . - All discovery shall close by June 6, 2025 . - Dispositive motions due by July 18, 2025 . - Joint trial memorandum is due by October 17, 2025 , or thirty (30) days after the Court rules on any dispositive motions. - Trial ready date is January 5, 2026 or thirty (30) days after the joint trial memorandum is filed. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/8/24. (Nelson, J)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order Tue 10/08 11:39 AM
ORDER. The Court grants the parties' request for referral to a magistrate judge. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to refer the case to a magistrate judge for settlement discussions. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/8/24. (Nelson, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
16 16 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 10/07 10:37 AM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Zaklukiewicz, Emily)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Mon 09/23 5:00 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses by FreshPoint Connecticut LLC.(Zaklukiewicz, Emily)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 08/23 1:19 PM
ORDER granting13 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 22, 2024 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/23/2024. (Rafla-Yuan, D)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time Wed 08/21 9:33 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time until September 22, 2024 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by FreshPoint Connecticut LLC. (Zaklukiewicz, Emily)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
12 12 order Electronic Service Documents Fri 08/16 2:21 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of11 Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols,2 Notice (Other) filed by Freshpoint, Inc.,10 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,3 Notice (Other) filed by Freshpoint, Inc.,6 Notice of Appearance filed by FreshPoint Connecticut LLC,8 Electronic Filing Order,4 Disclosure Statement filed by Freshpoint, Inc., Add and Terminate Judges,1 Notice of Removal, filed by Freshpoint, Inc.,7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 5 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,9 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 8/16/2024.(Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order on Removed Cases
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/16 9:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paula N. Anthony on behalf of FreshPoint Connecticut LLC (Anthony, Paula)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
11 11 intord Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols Fri 08/16 2:19 PM
Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Clerk on 8/15/2024.(Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Discovery Attachment
10 10 misc Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake) Fri 08/16 2:18 PM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Fri 08/16 2:17 PM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/15/2024.(Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Electronic Filing Order Fri 08/16 2:17 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/15/2024.(Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Fri 08/16 2:15 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/15/2024 Discovery due by 2/14/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 3/21/2025 Signed by Clerk on 8/15/2024.(Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Fri 08/16 9:25 AM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 8/15/24.(Hushin, Z.)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement Thu 08/15 8:28 PM
Disclosure Statement by FreshPoint Connecticut LLC identifying Corporate Parent Freshpoint, Inc., Corporate Parent Sysco Corporation for FreshPoint Connecticut LLC. (Zaklukiewicz, Emily)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Thu 08/15 8:26 PM
NOTICE by FreshPoint Connecticut LLC Defendant's Statement Regarding Removed Case (Zaklukiewicz, Emily)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Thu 08/15 8:15 PM
NOTICE by FreshPoint Connecticut LLC of No Pending Motions (Zaklukiewicz, Emily)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 08/15 8:13 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FreshPoint Connecticut LLC from New London Superior Court, CT, case number 16A-2024-00660. Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACTDC-7871310, filed by FreshPoint Connecticut LLC.(Zaklukiewicz, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 08/16 2:13 PM
Judge Victor A. Bolden and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Freberg, B)
Related: [-]