California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott C Clarkson
Case #: 8:24-bk-12035
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Sep 18, 2024

Debtor
Premier Pavers, Inc.
417 S Associated Rd PMB 161
Brea, CA 92821-5802
Represented By
Brian J Soo-Hoo
Bankruptcy Law Professionals
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Jeffrey I Golden (TR)
Golden Goodrich LLP 3070 Bristol Street, Suite 640
Costa Mesa, CA 92626
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 08/16/2024 12:03 AM PDT
Thursday, August 15, 2024
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 08/15 3:31 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:8:24-bk-12035] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A57248339. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 28 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Thu 08/15 3:20 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Premier Pavers, Inc. (Soo-Hoo, Brian)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corp Resolution Auth Filing Thu 08/15 3:22 PM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor Premier Pavers, Inc.. (Soo-Hoo, Brian)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Thu 08/15 3:35 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Golden (TR), Jeffrey I with 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/18/2024 at 08:00 AM via Zoom - Golden: Meeting ID 227 931 0235, Passcode 0647511609, Phone 1 657 222 4074. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]