Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 7:24-cr-00012
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2024
Last checked: Friday Aug 16, 2024 2:24 AM CDT
Defendant
Dominique Equincy Hall (2)
Represented By
Anthony Hamilton Green
Anthony Green Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Kiesha Tanga Wyatt (14)
Represented By
Loren Green
Green Law Texas
contact info
Defendant
Jimmie Scott Williams (20)
Represented By
Randall H Nunn
Law Office Of Randall H Nunn
contact info
Defendant
Madeline Josephine Stephens (11)
Represented By
Bethany Shannon Stephens
Law Office Of Bethany S Stephens
contact info
Defendant
Dwight Albert Simpson (19)
Represented By
Mark R Danielson
Law Office Of Mark R Danielson
contact info
Defendant
Sarah Leann Parker (9)
Represented By
Greg O Merkle
Law Office Of Greg Merkle
contact info
Defendant
Samuel Conta Manuel (13)
Represented By
David Miles Brissette
The Law Offices Of Gill & Brissette
contact info
Defendant
Kenzie June Lozano (17)
Represented By
Emily Louise LaChance
Schneider Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Elisha Earl Johnson (12)
Represented By
Derek D Brown
Law Office Of Derek Brown
contact info
Defendant
Jaryd Blake Howard (8)
Represented By
Todd Dalton Greenwood
Todd Greenwood Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Stanley Wayne Britt (21)
Represented By
Robert G Estrada
Law Office Of Robert G Estrada
contact info
Defendant
Dywane Cecil Graham (1)
Represented By
Harry E White
Nickols White Solomon
contact info
Defendant
William Lee Freeman (18)
Represented By
John Eric Nickols
Nickols & White PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Brandy Lynn Flowers (7)
Represented By
Nick Davis
Law Office Of Nick G Davis PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Jewel Wayne Fletcher, Sr (5)
Represented By
Matthew Joseph Smid
contact info
Defendant
Nicholas Bryan Darcus (6)
Represented By
Henry James Clark, Jr
Law Office Of Henry J Clark Jr
contact info
Raul A Canez
Law Office Of Raul A Canez
contact info
Defendant
Shedrick Cortez Cyrus (15)
Represented By
Christopher Elias Solis
Keith And Lorfing
contact info
Defendant
Robert Lee Collins (10)
Represented By
James Glenn Graham
Law Office Of James G Graham PC
contact info
Vincent Eugene Wisely
Vincent Wisely, Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Jack Bishop Cline (3)
Represented By
Kara Letisha Carreras
Carreras Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Robert Thomas Bustamante (16)
Represented By
J Warren St John
Law Office Of J Warren St John
contact info
Defendant
Dmetrius Lakeith Brooks (4)
Represented By
Dustin Eugene Nimz
Law Office Of Dustin E. Nimz PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Laura Montes-DOJ
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/24/2025 12:20 AM CST
Thursday, May 02, 2024
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until the defendant has been arrested/appeared.) as to Dywane Cecil Graham (1), Dmetrius Lakeith Brooks (2), Dominique Equincy Hall (3), Nicholas Bryan Darcus (4), Brandy Lynn Flowers (5), Jaryd Blake Howard (6), Jewel Wayne Fletcher, Sr (7), Sarah Leann Parker (8), Robert Lee Collins (9), Madeline Josephine Stephens (10), Elisha Earl Johnson (11), Samuel Conta Manuel (12), Kiesha Tanga Wyatt (13), Shedrick Cortez Cyrus (14), Robert Thomas Bustamante (15), Kenzie June Lozano (16), William Lee Freeman (17), Jack Bishop Cline (18), Dwight Albert Simpson (19), Jimmie Scott Williams (20), Stanley Wayne Britt (21). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until the defendant has been arrested/appeared.) as to Dywane Cecil Graham (1), Dmetrius Lakeith Brooks (2), Dominique Equincy Hall (3), Nicholas Bryan Darcus (4), Brandy Lynn Flowers (5), Jaryd Blake Howard (6), Jewel Wayne Fletcher, Sr (7), Sarah Leann Parker (8), Robert Lee Collins (9), Madeline Josephine Stephens (10), Elisha Earl Johnson (11), Samuel Conta Manuel (12), Kiesha Tanga Wyatt (13), Shedrick Cortez Cyrus (14), Robert Thomas Bustamante (15), Kenzie June Lozano (16), William Lee Freeman (17), Jack Bishop Cline (18), Dwight Albert Simpson (19), Jimmie Scott Williams (20), Stanley Wayne Britt (21). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
Arrest of Dywane Cecil Graham, Dmetrius Lakeith Brooks, Dominique Equincy Hall, Nicholas Bryan Darcus, Brandy Lynn Flowers, Jewel Wayne Fletcher, Sr, Sarah Leann Parker, Robert Lee Collins, Madeline Josephine Stephens, Elisha Earl Johnson, Samuel Conta Manuel, Kiesha Tanga Wyatt, Shedrick Cortez Cyrus, Robert Thomas Bustamante, Kenzie June Lozano, William Lee Freeman, Jack Bishop Cline, Dwight Albert Simpson, Jimmie Scott Williams, Stanley Wayne Britt (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Dywane Cecil Graham, Dmetrius Lakeith Brooks, Dominique Equincy Hall, Nicholas Bryan Darcus, Brandy Lynn Flowers, Jewel Wayne Fletcher, Sr, Sarah Leann Parker, Robert Lee Collins, Madeline Josephine Stephens, Elisha Earl Johnson, Samuel Conta Manuel, Kiesha Tanga Wyatt, Shedrick Cortez Cyrus, Robert Thomas Bustamante, Kenzie June Lozano, William Lee Freeman, Jack Bishop Cline, Dwight Albert Simpson, Jimmie Scott Williams, Stanley Wayne Britt (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Jaryd Blake Howard (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
11 11 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney John Eric Nickols for William Lee Freeman appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
12 12 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Raul A Canez for Nicholas Bryan Darcus appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
13 13 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Derek D Brown for Elisha Earl Johnson appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
14 14 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Bethany Shannon Stephens for Madeline Josephine Stephens appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
15 15 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney James Glenn Graham for Robert Lee Collins appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
16 16 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Emily Louise LaChance for Kenzie June Lozano appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
17 17 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Dustin Eugene Nimz for Dmetrius Lakeith Brooks appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
18 18 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Greg O Merkle for Sarah Leann Parker appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
19 19 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Todd Dalton Greenwood for Jaryd Blake Howard appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
20 20 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Randall H Nunn for Jimmie Scott Williams appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
21 21 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Christopher Elias Solis for Shedrick Cortez Cyrus appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
22 22 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Loren Green for Kiesha Tanga Wyatt appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
23 23 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Anthony Hamilton Green for Dominique Equincy Hall appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
24 24 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Harry E White for Dywane Cecil Graham appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
25 25 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Nick Davis for Brandy Lynn Flowers appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
26 26 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney David Miles Brissette for Samuel Conta Manuel appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
27 27 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Kara Letisha Carreras for Jack Bishop Cline appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
28 28 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney J Warren St John for Robert Thomas Bustamante appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
29 29 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Matthew Joseph Smid for Jewel Wayne Fletcher, Sr appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
30 30 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jack Bishop Cline (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
31 31 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Robert Thomas Bustamante (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
32 32 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jewel Wayne Fletcher, Sr (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
33 33 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Shedrick Cortez Cyrus (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
34 34 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jimmie Scott Williams (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
35 35 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Kiesha Tanga Wyatt (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
36 36 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Dominique Equincy Hall (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
37 37 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Dywane Cecil Graham (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
38 38 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Brandy Lynn Flowers (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
39 39 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jaryd Blake Howard (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
41 41 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Kenzie June Lozano (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
42 42 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Dmetrius Lakeith Brooks (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
43 43 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Robert Lee Collins (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
45 45 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Elisha Earl Johnson (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
46 46 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Nicholas Bryan Darcus (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
47 47 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by William Lee Freeman (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
48 48 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Samuel Conta Manuel (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
49 49 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr: Initial Appearance as to Jewel Wayne Fletcher, Sr, Samuel Conta Manuel, Robert Thomas Bustamante, Jack Bishop Cline held on 5/17/2024. Date of Arrest: 5/16/2024; Defts executed financial affidavit; O/appointing attys entered;The judge issued the oral order required by Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)(1). Written order to follow; Gov't summarized charges as to all defts; o/setting detention and preliminary hearing entered; O/temporary detention pending hearings entered; Defts remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Laura Montes; Defense - Matt Smid (not present), Miles Brissette (not present), Warren St John (not present), Kara Carreras (not present). (No exhibits) Time in Court - :10. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Garza.) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
49 49 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr: Initial Appearance as to Jewel Wayne Fletcher, Sr, Samuel Conta Manuel, Robert Thomas Bustamante, Jack Bishop Cline held on 5/17/2024. Date of Arrest: 5/16/2024; Defts executed financial affidavit; O/appointing attys entered;The judge issued the oral order required by Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)(1). Written order to follow; Gov't summarized charges as to all defts; o/setting detention and preliminary hearing entered; O/temporary detention pending hearings entered; Defts remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Laura Montes; Defense - Matt Smid (not present), Miles Brissette (not present), Warren St John (not present), Kara Carreras (not present). (No exhibits) Time in Court - :10. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Garza.) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
50 50 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr: Initial Appearance as to Dywane Cecil Graham, Dominique Equincy Hall, Brandy Lynn Flowers, Kiesha Tanga Wyatt, Shedrick Cortez Cyrus, Jimmie Scott Williams held on 5/17/2024. Date of Arrest: 5/16/2024; Defts executed financial affidavit; O/appointing attys entered;The judge issued the oral order required by Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)(1). Written order to follow; Defts Wyatt, Cyrus, Williams waive PC and detention; court finds PC and entered o/detention pending trial as to defts as to Wyatt, Cyrus and Williams o/setting detention and preliminary hearing entered as to all other defts; O/temporary detention pending hearings entered; Defts remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Laura Montes; Defense - Harry White, Anthony Green, Nick Davis, Loren Green, Christopher Solis, Randall Nunn. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :10. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Garza.) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
50 50 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr: Initial Appearance as to Dywane Cecil Graham, Dominique Equincy Hall, Brandy Lynn Flowers, Kiesha Tanga Wyatt, Shedrick Cortez Cyrus, Jimmie Scott Williams held on 5/17/2024. Date of Arrest: 5/16/2024; Defts executed financial affidavit; O/appointing attys entered;The judge issued the oral order required by Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)(1). Written order to follow; Defts Wyatt, Cyrus, Williams waive PC and detention; court finds PC and entered o/detention pending trial as to defts as to Wyatt, Cyrus and Williams o/setting detention and preliminary hearing entered as to all other defts; O/temporary detention pending hearings entered; Defts remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Laura Montes; Defense - Harry White, Anthony Green, Nick Davis, Loren Green, Christopher Solis, Randall Nunn. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :10. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Garza.) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
51 51 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr: Initial Appearance as to Dmetrius Lakeith Brooks, Nicholas Bryan Darcus, Robert Lee Collins, Madeline Josephine Stephens, Elisha Earl Johnson, Kenzie June Lozano, William Lee Freeman held on 5/17/2024. Date of Arrest: 5/16/2024; Deft executed financial affidavit; O/appointing attys entered;The judge issued the oral order required by Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)(1). Written order to follow; Deft Brooks and Collins waive PC, o/setting detention hearing entered as to Brooks and Collins and court finds PC; Deft Lozano and Freeman executed waiver of PC and detention; Court finds PC and enters o/detention as to deft Lozano and Freeman; o/setting detention and preliminary hearing entered as to all remain defts; O/temporary detention pending hearings entered; Defts remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Laura Montes; Defense - Dustin Nimz, Raul Canez, Bethany Stephens, Derek Brown, James Graham, Emily LaChance, Eric Nickols. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :10. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Garza.) (mcrd) M [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
52 52 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr: Initial Appearance as to Jaryd Blake Howard, Sarah Leann Parker held on 5/17/2024. Date of Arrest: 5/16/2024 ; Deft executed financial affidavit; O/appointing attys entered;The judge issued the oral order required by Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)(1). Written order to follow;Gov't did not move for detention; Defts waive PC, court finds PC; o/setting conditions of release entered as to both defts; Deft Howard executed PR bond; o/released after processing; Deft Parker o/to remain in custody pending confirmed placement by pretrial in drug treatment; Deft Parker remanded to custody until further order of the court. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Laura Montes; Defense - Todd Greenwood, Greg Merkle. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :10. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Garza.) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
53 53 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Kenzie June Lozano, WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Kenzie June Lozano (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
54 54 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Jimmie Scott Williams, WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Jimmie Scott Williams (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
55 55 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Shedrick Cortez Cyrus, WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Shedrick Cortez Cyrus (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
56 56 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Kiesha Tanga Wyatt, WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Kiesha Tanga Wyatt (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
57 57 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by William Lee Freeman, WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by William Lee Freeman (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
58 58 ELECTRONIC ORDER As to Dywane Cecil Graham, Dmetrius Lakeith Brooks, Dominique Equincy Hall, Nicholas Bryan Darcus, Brandy Lynn Flowers, Jaryd Blake Howard, Jewel Wayne Fletcher, Sr, Sarah Leann Parker, Robert Lee Collins, Madeline Josephine Stephens, Elisha Earl Johnson, Samuel Conta Manuel, Kiesha Tanga Wyatt, Shedrick Cortez Cyrus, Robert Thomas Bustamante, Kenzie June Lozano, William Lee Freeman, Jack Bishop Cline, Jimmie Scott Williams: This written order is entered pursuant to Rule 5(f)(1) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, and is entered by the court on the first scheduled court date when both the prosecutor and defense counsel are present. By this order -- issued to the prosecution and defense counsel -- the court confirms the disclosure obligations of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and the possible consequences of violating such order under applicable law. Failure to do so may result in consequences such as the dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of evidence or witnesses, adverse jury instructions, contempt proceedings, and/or sanctions by the court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
58 58 ELECTRONIC ORDER As to Dywane Cecil Graham, Dmetrius Lakeith Brooks, Dominique Equincy Hall, Nicholas Bryan Darcus, Brandy Lynn Flowers, Jaryd Blake Howard, Jewel Wayne Fletcher, Sr, Sarah Leann Parker, Robert Lee Collins, Madeline Josephine Stephens, Elisha Earl Johnson, Samuel Conta Manuel, Kiesha Tanga Wyatt, Shedrick Cortez Cyrus, Robert Thomas Bustamante, Kenzie June Lozano, William Lee Freeman, Jack Bishop Cline, Jimmie Scott Williams: This written order is entered pursuant to Rule 5(f)(1) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, and is entered by the court on the first scheduled court date when both the prosecutor and defense counsel are present. By this order -- issued to the prosecution and defense counsel -- the court confirms the disclosure obligations of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and the possible consequences of violating such order under applicable law. Failure to do so may result in consequences such as the dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of evidence or witnesses, adverse jury instructions, contempt proceedings, and/or sanctions by the court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
59 59 MOTION for Pretrial Detention, MOTION to Continue () filed by USA as to Dywane Cecil Graham, Dmetrius Lakeith Brooks, Dominique Equincy Hall, Nicholas Bryan Darcus, Brandy Lynn Flowers, Jewel Wayne Fletcher, Sr, Robert Lee Collins, Madeline Josephine Stephens, Elisha Earl Johnson, Samuel Conta Manuel, Kiesha Tanga Wyatt, Shedrick Cortez Cyrus, Robert Thomas Bustamante, Kenzie June Lozano, William Lee Freeman, Jack Bishop Cline, Jimmie Scott Williams (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
59 59 MOTION for Pretrial Detention, MOTION to Continue () filed by USA as to Dywane Cecil Graham, Dmetrius Lakeith Brooks, Dominique Equincy Hall, Nicholas Bryan Darcus, Brandy Lynn Flowers, Jewel Wayne Fletcher, Sr, Robert Lee Collins, Madeline Josephine Stephens, Elisha Earl Johnson, Samuel Conta Manuel, Kiesha Tanga Wyatt, Shedrick Cortez Cyrus, Robert Thomas Bustamante, Kenzie June Lozano, William Lee Freeman, Jack Bishop Cline, Jimmie Scott Williams (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
60 60 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Jaryd Blake Howard (6) PR. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
61 61 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Sarah Leann Parker. The United States Marshal is ordered to keep the defendant in custody until notified by the clerk or judge that the defendant has posted bond and/or complied with all other conditions for release. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
62 62 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting59 Motion for Detention as to Jimmie Scott Williams (20). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
63 63 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting59 Motion for Detention as to Shedrick Cortez Cyrus (14). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
64 64 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting59 Motion for Detention as to Kiesha Tanga Wyatt (13). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
65 65 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting59 Motion for Detention as to Kenzie June Lozano (16). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
66 66 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting59 Motion for Detention as to William Lee Freeman (17). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
67 67 ELECTRONIC ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Dmetrius Lakeith Brooks. Defendant is ordered detained pending a Detention Hearing set for 5/23/2024 01:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 222, 1000 Lamar Street, Wichita Falls, TX 76301-3431 before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray Jr. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
68 68 ELECTRONIC ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Dywane Cecil Graham, Nicholas Bryan Darcus, Madeline Josephine Stephens, Elisha Earl Johnson. Defendants are ordered detained pending a Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 5/23/2024 01:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 222, 1000 Lamar Street, Wichita Falls, TX 76301-3431 before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray Jr. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
68 68 ELECTRONIC ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Dywane Cecil Graham, Nicholas Bryan Darcus, Madeline Josephine Stephens, Elisha Earl Johnson. Defendants are ordered detained pending a Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 5/23/2024 01:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 222, 1000 Lamar Street, Wichita Falls, TX 76301-3431 before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray Jr. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
69 69 ELECTRONIC ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Robert Lee Collins. Defendant is ordered detained pending a Detention Hearing set for 5/23/2024 02:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 222, 1000 Lamar Street, Wichita Falls, TX 76301-3431 before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray Jr. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
70 70 ELECTRONIC ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Brandy Lynn Flowers, Jewel Wayne Fletcher, Sr, Jack Bishop Cline. Defendants are ordered detained pending a Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 5/23/2024 02:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 222, 1000 Lamar Street, Wichita Falls, TX 76301-3431 before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray Jr. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
70 70 ELECTRONIC ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Brandy Lynn Flowers, Jewel Wayne Fletcher, Sr, Jack Bishop Cline. Defendants are ordered detained pending a Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 5/23/2024 02:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 222, 1000 Lamar Street, Wichita Falls, TX 76301-3431 before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray Jr. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
71 71 ELECTRONIC ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Dominique Equincy Hall, Samuel Conta Manuel, Robert Thomas Bustamante. Defendants are ordered detained pending a Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 5/23/2024 03:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 222, 1000 Lamar Street, Wichita Falls, TX 76301-3431 before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray Jr. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
71 71 ELECTRONIC ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Dominique Equincy Hall, Samuel Conta Manuel, Robert Thomas Bustamante. Defendants are ordered detained pending a Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 5/23/2024 03:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 222, 1000 Lamar Street, Wichita Falls, TX 76301-3431 before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray Jr. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/17/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 19, 2024
10 10 Acceptance of Court-Appointed Counsel and Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights by Nicholas Bryan Darcus. (Canez, Raul) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
72 72 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Robert Thomas Bustamante (St John, J) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
83 83 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/16/2024 as to Sarah Leann Parker. (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
84 84 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/16/2024 as to Elisha Earl Johnson. (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
85 85 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/16/2024 as to Dominique Equincy Hall. (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
86 86 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/16/2024 as to Dywane Cecil Graham. (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
87 87 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/16/2024 as to Brandy Lynn Flowers. (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
88 88 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/16/2024 as to Shedrick Cortez Cyrus. (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
89 89 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/16/2024 as to Robert Lee Collins. (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
90 90 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/16/2024 as to Jack Bishop Cline. (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
91 91 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/16/2024 as to Robert Thomas Bustamante. (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
92 92 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/16/2024 as to Dmetrius Lakeith Brooks. (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
93 93 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/16/2024 as to Jaryd Blake Howard. (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
94 94 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/16/2024 as to Jimmie Scott Williams. (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
95 95 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/16/2024 as to Kiesha Tanga Wyatt. (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
96 96 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/16/2024 as to Nicholas Bryan Darcus. (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
97 97 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/16/2024 as to Madeline Josephine Stephens. (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
73 73 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christopher Elias Solis (Clerk to Set Designation as: CJA Appointment) appearing for Shedrick Cortez Cyrus (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (If sealed documents that you are authorized to see were previously filed by U.S. Pretrial Services or U.S. Probation, you will require assistance to gain access to them and any related filings. Please call the clerk at 214.753.2240 during business hours to request access.) (Solis, Christopher) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
74 74 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Brandy Lynn Flowers (Montes-DOJ, Laura) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
75 75 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Jaryd Blake Howard (Montes-DOJ, Laura) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
76 76 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Kiesha Tanga Wyatt (Montes-DOJ, Laura) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
77 77 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Shedrick Cortez Cyrus (Montes-DOJ, Laura) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
78 78 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Kenzie June Lozano (Montes-DOJ, Laura) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
79 79 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to William Lee Freeman (Montes-DOJ, Laura) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
80 80 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Jimmie Scott Williams (Montes-DOJ, Laura) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
81 81 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Sarah Leann Parker (Montes-DOJ, Laura) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
99 99 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Brandy Lynn Flowers, WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Brandy Lynn Flowers (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
100 100 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Robert Thomas Bustamante, WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Robert Thomas Bustamante (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
101 101 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Samuel Conta Manuel, WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Samuel Conta Manuel (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
102 102 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Jack Bishop Cline, WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Jack Bishop Cline (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
103 103 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Jewel Wayne Fletcher, Sr, WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Jewel Wayne Fletcher, Sr (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
104 104 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting59 Motion to Continue as to Jewel Wayne Fletcher Sr (7). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/22/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
105 105 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting59 Motion to Continue as to Jack Bishop Cline (18). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/22/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
106 106 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting59 Motion to Continue as to Samuel Conta Manuel (12). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/22/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
107 107 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting59 Motion for Detention as to Robert Thomas Bustamante (15). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/22/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
108 108 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting59 Motion for Detention as to Brandy Lynn Flowers (5). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/22/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
129 129 Summons Issued as to Stanley Wayne Britt (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
98 98 ORDER as to Sarah Leann Parker: The Court orders that the defendant now be released from the custody of the U.S. Marshal. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/23/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
109 109 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/16/2024 as to Stanley Wayne Britt. (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
110 110 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/16/2024 as to Dwight Albert Simpson. (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
111 111 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr: Initial Appearance as to Dwight Albert Simpson, Stanley Wayne Britt held on 5/23/2024. Date of Arrest: 5/16/2024 ; Deft executed financial affidavit; O/appointing attys entered;The judge issued the oral order required by Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)(1). Written order to follow; Deft Simpson waive PC and detention,court finds PC and enters o/detention pending trial; Deft Simpson remanded to custody. Gov't did not seek detention as to deft Britt;o/setting conditions of release entered, PR bond executed; Britt waive PC and court finds PC; Deft Britt o/released after processing. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Laura Montes; Defense - Bob Estrada, Mark Danielson. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :06. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Garza.) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
112 112 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Mark R Danielson for Dwight Albert Simpson appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/23/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
113 113 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Robert G Estrada for Stanley Wayne Britt. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/23/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
114 114 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Dwight Albert Simpson (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
115 115 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Stanley Wayne Britt (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
116 116 ELECTRONIC ORDER As to Dwight Albert Simpson, Stanley Wayne Britt: This written order is entered pursuant to Rule 5(f)(1) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, and is entered by the court on the first scheduled court date when both the prosecutor and defense counsel are present. By this order -- issued to the prosecution and defense counsel -- the court confirms the disclosure obligations of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and the possible consequences of violating such order under applicable law. Failure to do so may result in consequences such as the dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of evidence or witnesses, adverse jury instructions, contempt proceedings, and/or sanctions by the court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/23/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
117 117 MOTION to Continue, MOTION for Pretrial Detention () filed by USA as to Dwight Albert Simpson (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
118 118 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting117 Motion for Detention as to Dwight Albert Simpson (19). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/23/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
119 119 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Stanley Wayne Britt (21) PR. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/23/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
120 120 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr: Detention and Preliminary Hearing as to Dywane Cecil Graham, Dmetrius Lakeith Brooks, Nicholas Bryan Darcus, Madeline Josephine Stephens, Elisha Earl Johnson held on 5/23/2024; Deft Graham waive PC; Deft Darcus waive detention; FBI TFO Beau Jackson sworn and testified; Deft Brooks witnesses Bobbi Martin, Jessica Jones and Crystal Amerson, sworn and testified; Deft Graham witnesses Makayla Graham, Alfonso Holmes sworn and testified; Court finds PC as to all defts; o/detention entered as to deft Brooks and Darcus and remanded to custody; o/setting conditions of release entered as to deft Graham, Stephens and Johnson; PR bonds executed and defts o/released after processing. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Laura Montes; Defense - Dustin Nimz, Harry White, Raul Canez, Bethany Stephens, Derek Brown. (No exhibits) Time in Court - 4:25. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Garza.) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
120 120 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr: Detention and Preliminary Hearing as to Dywane Cecil Graham, Dmetrius Lakeith Brooks, Nicholas Bryan Darcus, Madeline Josephine Stephens, Elisha Earl Johnson held on 5/23/2024; Deft Graham waive PC; Deft Darcus waive detention; FBI TFO Beau Jackson sworn and testified; Deft Brooks witnesses Bobbi Martin, Jessica Jones and Crystal Amerson, sworn and testified; Deft Graham witnesses Makayla Graham, Alfonso Holmes sworn and testified; Court finds PC as to all defts; o/detention entered as to deft Brooks and Darcus and remanded to custody; o/setting conditions of release entered as to deft Graham, Stephens and Johnson; PR bonds executed and defts o/released after processing. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Laura Montes; Defense - Dustin Nimz, Harry White, Raul Canez, Bethany Stephens, Derek Brown. (No exhibits) Time in Court - 4:25. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Garza.) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
121 121 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting59 Motion for Detention as to Dmetrius Lakeith Brooks (2). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/23/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
122 122 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting59 Motion for Detention as to Nicholas Bryan Darcus (4). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/23/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
123 123 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Dywane Cecil Graham (1) PR. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/23/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
124 124 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Madeline Josephine Stephens (10) PR. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/23/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
125 125 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Elisha Earl Johnson (11) PR. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/23/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
126 126 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr: Detention and Preliminary Hearing as to Dominique Equincy Hall held on 5/23/2024; Gov't witness FBI TFO Beau Jackson sworn and testified; court finds PC; o/detention pending trial; Deft remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Laura Montes; Defense - Anthony Green. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :34. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Garza.) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
127 127 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting59 Motion for Detention as to Dominique Equincy Hall (3). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/23/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
128 128 ELECTRONIC ORDER as to Robert Lee Collins: Detention and Preliminary Hearing RESET for 5/29/2024 11:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 508, 501 W. 10th St., Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray Jr. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/23/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
134 134 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr: Detention and Preliminary Hearing as to Robert Lee Collins held on 5/29/2024; Deft waive PC, court finds PC; Govt and deft argued detention; Court grants gov't motion for detention; o/detention pending trial entered; Deft remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Laura Montes; Defense - James Graham. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :08. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
135 135 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting59 Motion for Detention as to Robert Lee Collins (9). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/29/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
136 136 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Dmetrius Lakeith Brooks (Montes-DOJ, Laura) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
137 137 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Dywane Cecil Graham (Montes-DOJ, Laura) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
138 138 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Dominique Equincy Hall (Montes-DOJ, Laura) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
139 139 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Nicholas Bryan Darcus (Montes-DOJ, Laura) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
140 140 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Robert Lee Collins (Montes-DOJ, Laura) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
141 141 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Madeline Josephine Stephens (Montes-DOJ, Laura) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
142 142 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Elisha Earl Johnson (Montes-DOJ, Laura) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
143 143 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Robert Thomas Bustamante (Montes-DOJ, Laura) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
144 144 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Dwight Albert Simpson (Montes-DOJ, Laura) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
145 145 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Samuel Conta Manuel (Montes-DOJ, Laura) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
146 146 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Jewel Wayne Fletcher, Sr (Montes-DOJ, Laura) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
147 147 MOTION for Reconsideration re56 Waiver of Detention Hearing, Waiver of Preliminary Hearing filed by Kiesha Tanga Wyatt filed by Kiesha Tanga Wyatt (Green, Loren)[7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
148 148 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Jack Bishop Cline (Montes-DOJ, Laura) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
149 149 ELECTRONIC ORDER as to Kiesha Tanga Wyatt: Detention Hearing re:147 MOTION for Reconsideration set for 6/6/2024 11:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 508, 501 W. 10th St., Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray Jr. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 6/3/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
150 150 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/29/2024 as to Sarah Leann Parker. (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
151 151 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/31/2024 as to Madeline Josephine Stephens. (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
152 152 GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO REVOKE DEFENDANT'S CONDITIONS OF RELEASE filed by USA as to Sarah Leann Parker. (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
153 153 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr: Hearing on Violations of Pretrial Release as to Sarah Leann Parker held on 6/3/2024 re152 MOTION to Revoke Defendant's Conditions of Release filed by USA; Witness FBI TFO Beau Jackson, sworn and testified; Court finds that defendant violated conditions of pretrial release; Court grants gov't motion to revoke; Deft o/remanded to custody and o/to return to Wichita County Jail pending further proceedings. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Laura Montes; Defense - Greg Merkle. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :15. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Munoz.) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
154 154 ORDER granting152 GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO REVOKE DEFENDANT'S CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to Sarah Leann Parker (8). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 6/3/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
155 155 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting, 74 , 75 , 76 , 77 , 78 , 79 , 80 , 81 , 136 ,137 , 138 , 139 , 140 , 141 , 142 , 143 , 144 , 145 , 146 , 147 , Joint Motions to Continue Time to Indict as to Dywane Cecil Graham (1), Dmetrius Lakeith Brooks (2), Dominique Equincy Hall (3), Nicholas Bryan Darcus (4), Brandy Lynn Flowers (5), Jaryd Blake Howard (6), Jewel Wayne Fletcher Sr (7), Sarah Leann Parker (8), Robert Lee Collins (9), Madeline Josephine Stephens (10), Elisha Earl Johnson (11), Samuel Conta Manuel (12)Kiesha Tanga Wyatt (13), Shedrick Cortez Cyrus (14), Robert Thomas Bustamante (15) Kenzie June Lozano (16), William Lee Freeman (17), Dwight Albert Simpson (19), Jimmie Scott Williams (20)for the reasons stated in the joint motion. Per the motion, this additional time is necessary for the parties to exchange information about the defendant and the case and for the government to disclose sufficient discovery to the defense to permit a thorough review and evaluation of the case against the defendant. This extension does not alter the parties' discovery obligations, but the timely exchange of discovery is essential. The government is ORDERED to make discovery available to the defense as quickly as possible so that both parties can exchange information and for the defense to have sufficient time to thoroughly review and evaluate the case. It is further ORDERED that, for the reasons stated above and because the ends of justice served by granting of such continuance outweigh the best interests of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial, the time to indict is continued to August 15, 2024. See 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) and (h)(7)(B)(iv). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 6/4/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
155 155 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting, 74 , 75 , 76 , 77 , 78 , 79 , 80 , 81 ,136 , 137 , 138 , 139 , 140 , 141 , 142 , 143 , 144 , 145 , 146 , 147 , Joint Motions to Continue Time to Indict as to Dywane Cecil Graham (1), Dmetrius Lakeith Brooks (2), Dominique Equincy Hall (3), Nicholas Bryan Darcus (4), Brandy Lynn Flowers (5), Jaryd Blake Howard (6), Jewel Wayne Fletcher Sr (7), Sarah Leann Parker (8), Robert Lee Collins (9), Madeline Josephine Stephens (10), Elisha Earl Johnson (11), Samuel Conta Manuel (12)Kiesha Tanga Wyatt (13), Shedrick Cortez Cyrus (14), Robert Thomas Bustamante (15) Kenzie June Lozano (16), William Lee Freeman (17), Dwight Albert Simpson (19), Jimmie Scott Williams (20)for the reasons stated in the joint motion. Per the motion, this additional time is necessary for the parties to exchange information about the defendant and the case and for the government to disclose sufficient discovery to the defense to permit a thorough review and evaluation of the case against the defendant. This extension does not alter the parties' discovery obligations, but the timely exchange of discovery is essential. The government is ORDERED to make discovery available to the defense as quickly as possible so that both parties can exchange information and for the defense to have sufficient time to thoroughly review and evaluate the case. It is further ORDERED that, for the reasons stated above and because the ends of justice served by granting of such continuance outweigh the best interests of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial, the time to indict is continued to August 15, 2024. See 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) and (h)(7)(B)(iv). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 6/4/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
156 156 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting148 Joint Motion to Continue Time to Indict as to Jack Bishop Cline (18) for the reasons stated in the joint motion. Per the motion, this additional time is necessary for the parties to exchange information about the defendant and the case and for the government to disclose sufficient discovery to the defense to permit a thorough review and evaluation of the case against the defendant. This extension does not alter the parties' discovery obligations, but the timely exchange of discovery is essential. The government is ORDERED to make discovery available to the defense as quickly as possible so that both parties can exchange information and for the defense to have sufficient time to thoroughly review and evaluate the case. It is further ORDERED that, for the reasons stated above and because the ends of justice served by granting of such continuance outweigh the best interests of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial, the time to indict is continued to August 15, 2024. See 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) and (h)(7)(B)(iv). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 6/4/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
157 157 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Stanley Wayne Britt (Montes-DOJ, Laura) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
158 158 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting157 Joint Motion to Continue Time to Indict as to Stanley Wayne Britt (21) for the reasons stated in the joint motion. Per the motion, this additional time is necessary for the parties to exchange information about the defendant and the case and for the government to disclose sufficient discovery to the defense to permit a thorough review and evaluation of the case against the defendant. This extension does not alter the parties' discovery obligations, but the timely exchange of discovery is essential. The government is ORDERED to make discovery available to the defense as quickly as possible so that both parties can exchange information and for the defense to have sufficient time to thoroughly review and evaluate the case. It is further ORDERED that, for the reasons stated above and because the ends of justice served by granting of such continuance outweigh the best interests of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial, the time to indict is continued to August 15, 2024. See 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) and (h)(7)(B)(iv). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 6/6/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
159 159 GOVERNMENT'S MOTION to REVOKE DEFENDANT'S CONDITIONS OF RELEASEfiled by USA as to Madeline Josephine Stephens. (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
160 160 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr: Hearing on Violations of Pretrial Release as to Madeline Josephine Stephens held on 6/6/2024 re159 MOTION to Revoke Pretrial Release filed by USA ; Deft waive hearing on motion; Court revoked defendant's pretrial release; o/revoking pretrial release entered; Court o/defendant be transported back to Wichita County Jail pending further proceedings; Deft remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Laura Montes; Defense - Bethany Stephens. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :06. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Honstein.) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
161 161 ORDER granting159 GOVERNMENT'S MOTION to REVOKE DEFENDANT'S CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to Madeline Josephine Stephens (10) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 6/6/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
162 162 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr: Detention Hearing as to Kiesha Tanga Wyatt held on 6/6/2024 re147 MOTION for Reconsideration; Gov't witness Bradley Sanchez, sworn and testified; Deft o/to remain detained pending further proceedings; Court advised deft counsel to notify the court if deft is able to secure a bed space in inpatient treatment; Deft remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Laura Montes; Defense - Loren Green. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :22. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Munoz.) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
163 163 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Nicholas Bryan Darcus by Raul Canez filed by Dmetrius Lakeith Brooks as to Nicholas Bryan DarcusAttorney Raul A Canez added to party Dmetrius Lakeith Brooks(pty:dft) (Canez, Raul) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
164 164 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting163 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Raul A Canez withdrawn from case as to Nicholas Bryan Darcus (4). Order appointing an attorney from the courts Criminal Justice Act Panel of Attorneys to follow. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 6/11/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
165 165 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Henry James Clark, Jr for Nicholas Bryan Darcus appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 6/11/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
168 168 PS 8 Request for Modification of Conditions of Pretrial Release as to Stanley Wayne Britt. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 6/18/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
169 169 MOTION to Appoint New Counsel filed by Nicholas Bryan Darcus. (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
171 171 Copy of correspondence sent to counsel as to Samuel Conta Manuel (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
170 170 ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot169 Motion to Appoint New Counsel as to Nicholas Bryan Darcus (4). Order appointing new counsel previously entered. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 7/2/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
172 172 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by James G. Graham filed by Robert Lee Collins (Graham, James) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
173 173 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting172 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. James Glenn Graham withdrawn from case as to Robert Lee Collins (9). Order appointing an attorney from the Criminal Justice Act panel to follow. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 7/24/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
174 174 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Vincent Eugene Wisely for Robert Lee Collins appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 7/24/2024) (mcrd) [7:24-mj-00007-BP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
157 157 INDICTMENT with Forfeiture Notice as to Dywane Cecil Graham (1) count 1, Dominique Equincy Hall (2) count 1, Jack Bishop Cline (3) count 1. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (mmw)
Related: [-]
159 159 ELECTRONIC ORDER as to Dywane Cecil Graham, Dominique Equincy Hall, Jack Bishop Cline: Arraignment set for 8/30/2024 10:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 222, 1000 Lamar Street, Wichita Falls, TX 76301-3431 before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray Jr. Attorneys and Defendant to be in the courtroom 15 minutes prior to the hearing start time. Waivers of arraignment are encouraged. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 8/14/2024) (mcrd)
Related: [-]