Virginia Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-00327
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2024
Last checked: Friday Aug 16, 2024 3:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Khalil Elijah Williams (1)
Represented By
Douglas Adrien Steinberg
Douglas A.Steinberg
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Christopher Michael Carter
Doj-Usao
contact info
Kristin S. Starr
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/16/2024 4:55 AM EDT
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
Arrest of Khalil Elijah Williams (lgue, )
Related: [-]
CJA 20 as to Khalil Elijah Williams :Appointment of Attorney Douglas Adrien Steinberg for Khalil Elijah Williams. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 8/14/2024. (lgue, )
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Khalil Elijah Williams (1). (lgue, )
Related: [-]
2 2 AFFIDAVIT by USA as to Khalil Elijah Williams1 Complaint (lgue, )
Related: [-]
4 4 Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet (lgue, )
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis:Initial Appearance as to Khalil Elijah Williams held on 8/14/2024. US appeared through: Ryan Bredemeier. Deft appeared without counsel. Duty CJA counsel: Doug Steinberg present. Deft informed of rights, charges, and penalties. Court to appoint Mr. Steinberg as CJA counsel. Counsel for the parties and the defendant were orally advised of the disclosure obligations set forth in Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Gov't requests detention - GRANTED pending PH/DH. Deft remanded. Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 8/16/2024 at 03:30 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (Tape #FTR.)(lgue, )
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Khalil Elijah Williams (lgue, )
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on its own initiative. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020), the Court ORDERS the United States to adhere to the disclosure obligations set forth in Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Brady v. Maryland instructs that the suppression by the prosecution of evidence favorable to an accused violates due process where the evidence is material either to guilt or to punishment, irrespective of the good faith or bad faith of the prosecution. 373 U.S. at 87. Failure to adhere to this requirement may result in serious consequences, up to and including vacating a conviction or disciplinary action against the prosecution. Having given counsel the oral admonition required by the Due Process Protections Act, this Order serves as the reminder of prosecutorial obligation and duties in accordance with Rule 5(f) and the Eastern District of Virginia Standing Order concerning the same as to Khalil Elijah Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 8/14/2024. (lgue, )
Related: [-]
9 9 Temporary Detention Order as to Khalil Elijah Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 8/14/2024. (lgue, )
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Christopher Michael Carter appearing for USA. (Carter, Christopher) (Main Document 10 replaced on 8/15/2024) (dzir).
Related: [-]