Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 0:24-cr-60147
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2024
Last checked: Friday Aug 16, 2024 3:17 AM EDT
Defendant
Kurt Francisco Pavia (1)
Represented By
Noticing FPD-FTL
contact info
Timothy Day
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Corey O'Neal
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/02/2024 11:42 PM EDT
Thursday, July 25, 2024
Set Hearing as to Kurt Francisco Pavia: Initial Appearance set for 7/25/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. (smy) [0:24-mj-06352-AOV]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Kurt Francisco Pavia (1). (rbe) [0:24-mj-06352-AOV]
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle: Initial Appearance as to Kurt Francisco Pavia held on 7/25/2024. Date of Location Custody (Arrest or Surrender): 7/24/2024.. Arraignment set for 8/8/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Detention Hearing set for 7/30/2024 10:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 8/8/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Attorney added: Noticing FPD-FTL for Kurt Francisco Pavia (Digital 11:17:24 rights/11:21:26) It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence- that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and ORDERS the United States to do so. The government has a duty to disclose any evidence that goes to negating the defendants guilt, the credibility of a witness, or that would reduce a potential sentence. The defendant is entitled to this information without a request. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 7/25/2024. (smy) [0:24-mj-06352-AOV]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORAL MOTION for Pretrial Detention Hearing by USA as to Kurt Francisco Pavia. (smy) [0:24-mj-06352-AOV]
Related: [-]
4 4 PAPERLESS ORDER granting 3 Motion for Pretrial Detention Hearing. as to Kurt Francisco Pavia (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 7/25/2024. (smy) [0:24-mj-06352-AOV]
Related: [-]
5 5 Notice of Assignment of Assistant Federal Public Defender as to Kurt Francisco Pavia. Attorney Timothy Day added. Attorney Noticing FPD-FTL terminated.. Attorney Timothy Day added to party Kurt Francisco Pavia(pty:dft). (Day, Timothy) [0:24-mj-06352-AOV]
Related: [-]
6 6 Invocation of Right to Silence and Counsel by Kurt Francisco Pavia (Day, Timothy) [0:24-mj-06352-AOV]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
7 7 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle: Detention Hearing as to Kurt Francisco Pavia Not Held on 7/30/2024. Arraignment set for 8/9/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 8/9/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Status Conference Re: Bond/Detention Matters set for 8/9/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. (Digital 10:31:25-10:35:27) Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 7/30/2024. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06352-AOV]
Related: [-]
8 8 JOINT ORAL MOTION to Continue Pretrial Detention Hearing/ Arraignment/ Preliminary Hearing as to Kurt Francisco Pavia. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06352-AOV]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER granting 8 JOINT ORAL MOTION to Continue Pretrial Detention Hearing/ Arraignment/ Preliminary Hearing as to Kurt Francisco Pavia (1). Moreover, for the reasons stated in the Motion, the undersigned finds that the ends of justice served by granting the Motion outweigh the interest of the public and the Defendant in a speedy trial. Accordingly, the Court finds that the period between July 30, 2024 through and including August 9, 2024, shall be deemed excludable in accordance with the provisions of the Speedy Trial Act, 18 U.S.C. § 3161, et seq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 7/30/2024. See DE 7 for full details. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06352-AOV]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
10 10 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch: Status Conference Re: Detention Hearing/Preliminary Examination/Arraignment as to Kurt Francisco Pavia held on 8/9/2024. Arraignment set for 9/6/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Detention Hearing set for 8/13/2024 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 9/6/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. (Digital 11:02:14) Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 8/9/2024. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06352-AOV]
Related: [-]
11 11 JOINT ORAL MOTION to Continue Preliminary Examination/Arraignment as to Kurt Francisco Pavia. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06352-AOV]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER granting 11 JOINT ORAL MOTION to Continue Preliminary Examination/Arraignment as to Kurt Francisco Pavia (1). For the reasons stated by counsel for the Defendant and finding that the ends of justice served by granting the ore tenus motion for continuance of Preliminary Examination/Arraignment outweigh the best interests of the public & the Defendant in a Speedy Trial, the Court finds that the period of time from today, through and including _9/6/2024____, shall be deemed excludable in accordance with the provisions of the Speedy Trial Act, l8 USC 3161 et seq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 8/9/2024. See DE 10 for full details. (rbe) Modified on 8/9/2024 (rbe). [0:24-mj-06352-AOV]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
13 13 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch: Detention Hearing as to Kurt Francisco Pavia held on 8/13/2024. Witness Agent Mark Vallone testified. Bond recommendation/set: Kurt Francisco Pavia (1) Pretrial Detention. Court finds Government met burden of proof, as to danger to the community. Court detains defendant, no bond. Order to follow. Arraignment set for 9/6/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 9/6/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. (Digital 9:09:05) Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 8/13/2024. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06352-AOV]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORAL MOTION for Pretrial Detention by USA as to Kurt Francisco Pavia. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06352-AOV]
Related: [-]
15 15 DETENTION HEARING EXHIBITS- Defendant's Exhibit A, B, and C as to Kurt Francisco Pavia re:13 Detention Hearing. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06352-AOV]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
16 16 CLERK'S Notice of Policy re Electronic Submission of Exhibit(s) sent to Defendant Re D.E.15 Exhibits Exhibit Numbers: Defendant's Paper Exhibits Local Rule 5.3 provides that within ten (10) days of the conclusion of a hearing or trial, a party must file in CM/ECF an electronic version of most exhibits offered or introduced into evidence. Before electronically filing, the filer must redact any sensitive, confidential, or private information in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, Fed. R. Crim. P. 49.1, and CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, Section 6, or seek an order from the Court either to seal the exhibit or to exempt the exhibit from electronic filing under subsection (b)(3)(C) of the rule. Failure to electronically file exhibits and the Certificate of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence within ten (10) days may result in the imposition of sanctions. The Local Rule, the Certificate of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence, and the Quick Reference Guide to Electronically Filing Trial Exhibits can be found on the Courts website: http://www.flsd.uscourts.gov as to Kurt Francisco Pavia. (drz) [0:24-mj-06352-AOV]
Related: [-]
17 17 CLERK'S Notice of Receipt of Defendant's Exhibit(s) received from Defendant Re D.E.15 Exhibits Exhibit Numbers: Defendant's Paper Exhibits as to Kurt Francisco Pavia. (drz) [0:24-mj-06352-AOV]
Related: [-]
18 18 CLERK'S Notice Directing Defendant's Counsel to Retrieve Exhibit(s) sent to Defendant Re D.E.15 Exhibits Exhibit Numbers: Defendan'ts Paper Exhibits as to Kurt Francisco Pavia. Attorney(s)/Party(s) Defendant shall retrieve original exhibits within five days. For retrieval information, please contact the Clerks Office - Records Section of the U.S. Federal Building and Courthouse, 299 East Broward Boulevard #108, Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301, (954) 769-5400. (drz) [0:24-mj-06352-AOV]
Related: [-]
19 19 RELEASE OF EXHIBITS as to Kurt Francisco Pavia. Released to: Anna Tijerino. (ebz) [0:24-mj-06352-AOV]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
20 20 INDICTMENT as to Kurt Francisco Pavia (1) count(s) 1, 2 and Forfeiture Allegations. (rbe) (rbe).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (8/15/2024) Restricted Unredacted Indictment