California Northern District Court
Judge:Robert M Illman
Referred: Pslc Agb
Case #: 1:24-cv-05172
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 01/10 4:42 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against L. Deters, J. Frisk, J. Hendrix, J. Robertson, J. Silva, J. Smith filed by Carlos Gutierrez.(kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
8 8 misc Letter Fri 01/10 4:37 PM
Letter from Carlos Gutierrez.(kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, November 18, 2024
7 7 5 pgs order Order Mon 11/18 1:17 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Robert M. Illman on 11/18/2024. (rmilc2, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis CDCR Mon 11/18 1:12 PM
Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (rmilc2, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
5 5 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 09/10 4:29 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Carlos Gutierrez. (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
4 4 misc Prison Trust Fund Account Statement Mon 08/19 9:38 AM
Prison Trust Fund Account Statement2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
3 3 oth_evt Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 08/15 1:18 PM
Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP CDCR Thu 08/15 1:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carlos Gutierrez, CDCR # V68045. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/15 1:13 PM
COMPLAINT against J. Robertson, J. Smith, L. Deters, J. Silva, J. Frisk, J. Hendrix filed by Carlos Gutierrez. Consent/Declination due by 9/13/2024. (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]