California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Ronald A Clifford III
Case #: 9:24-bk-10937
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Oct 10, 2024

Debtor
LAGS Recovery Centers, Inc
2352 Bentley Ave
Santa Maria, CA 93458-1404
Represented By
Michael B Clayton
Michael B. Clayton And Associates
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Jeremy W. Faith (TR)
16030 Ventura Blvd., Suite 470
Encino, CA 91436
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (ND)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 08/16/2024 12:06 PM PDT
Friday, August 16, 2024
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Fri 08/16 9:41 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:9:24-bk-10937] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A57251459. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
misc Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) Fri 08/16 10:27 AM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) Related [+] Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 8/30/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 8/30/2024. (KR9)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor LAGS Recovery Centers, Inc
1 1 52 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Fri 08/16 9:33 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by LAGS Recovery Centers, Inc Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 09/16/2024 (Clayton, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 08/16 9:39 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Debtor LAGS Recovery Centers, Inc. (Clayton, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Fri 08/16 10:04 AM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Faith (TR), Jeremy W. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/10/2024 at 09:00 AM via Zoom - Faith: Meeting ID 973 812 7924, Passcode 8746194099, Phone 1 747 281 2473. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (manual - ccdn) (BNC) Fri 08/16 10:27 AM
Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) Related [+] (KR9)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor LAGS Recovery Centers, Inc
5 5 court Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required Fri 08/16 10:28 AM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Debtor(s) mailing address was entered in the system instead of the street address. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. Related [+] (KR9)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor LAGS Recovery Centers, Inc
6 6 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Fri 08/16 10:29 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document. Incomplete Petition was Filed as Complete (See Docket # 4 RE Deficiency Notice Issued). Related [+] (KR9)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor LAGS Recovery Centers, Inc
7 7 misc Corp Resolution Auth Filing Fri 08/16 11:42 AM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor LAGS Recovery Centers, Inc Related [+]. (Clayton, Michael)
Related: [-] Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn)