Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Mark Pittman
Case #: 4:24-cv-00786
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2024
Terminated:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 12, 2025 3:15 AM CST
Defendant
Elliot Omanson
Represented By
Brian W Zimmerman
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Defendant
OwlFi RIA LLC
Represented By
Brian W Zimmerman
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Defendant
Adam Zentner
Represented By
John Armen Safarli
Macdonald Devin Madden Kenefick & Harris, P.C.
contact info
David M Macdonald
Macdonald Devin Madden Kenefick Harris, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Zentner Law, P.A.
8056 Hall Street
Lenexa, KS 66219
Represented By
John Armen Safarli
Macdonald Devin Madden Kenefick & Harris, P.C.
contact info
David M Macdonald
Macdonald Devin Madden Kenefick Harris, P.C.
contact info
Mediator
ADR Provider
Represented By
John W Brookman
Brookman PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Chantal Dauenhauer
Represented By
David A Shields
Shields Legal Group PC
contact info
Jay Alan Ferguson
Shields Legal Group
contact info
Plaintiff
Ricky Dauenhauer
Represented By
David A Shields
Shields Legal Group PC
contact info
Jay Alan Ferguson
Shields Legal Group
contact info
Plaintiff
N.A.E. Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By
David A Shields
Shields Legal Group PC
contact info
Jay Alan Ferguson
Shields Legal Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 32 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
44 44 order Judgment Wed 04/30 9:51 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT: This final judgment is issued pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58(a). In accordance with the Court's43 Order on this same day, this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 4/30/2025) (jnp)
Related: [-]
43 43 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure Wed 04/30 9:49 AM
ORDER: Acting upon the Parties' representations that this case has been settled, the Court ORDERS that this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 4/30/2025) (jnp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
42 42 respm Response/Objection Tue 04/29 8:02 PM
RESPONSE filed by Elliot Omanson, OwlFi RIA LLC re:41 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer, (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
41 41 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer Wed 04/23 2:52 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The parties shall show cause, in writing, no later than April 30, 2025, as to why they have not complied with the Court's directive regarding the filing of the mediation report. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 4/23/2025) (hcc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
40 40 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Wed 03/12 2:32 PM
ORDER granting32 : Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Application for Attorneys' Fees (Application). ECF No.32 . Having considered the Application, relevant docket filings, and applicable law, the Court will grant in part and deny in part. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 3/12/2025) (wxc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
39 39 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 03/10 9:50 AM
ORDER : Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Agreed38 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Only as to Defendants Adam Zentner and Zentner Law, P.A. The Court concludes that the Motion should be and is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants Adam Zentner and Zentner Law, P.A. only are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 3/10/2025) (mmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
38 38 motion Dismiss Fri 03/07 6:15 PM
Agreed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Only as to Defendants Adam Zentner and Zentner Law, P.A. filed by Adam Zentner, Zentner Law PA (Safarli, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
37 37 respm Reply Fri 03/07 3:53 PM
REPLY filed by Chantal Dauenhauer, Ricky Dauenhauer, NAE Enterprises Inc re:36 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, (Shields, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s)
Thursday, March 06, 2025
36 36 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Thu 03/06 11:38 AM
ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiffs'32 Application for Attorneys' Fees ("Application"). The Court ORDERS that Plaintiffs file a reply not to exceed seven pages on or before March 11, 2025. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 3/6/2025) (jnp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
35 35 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Wed 03/05 11:10 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Elliot Omanson, OwlFi RIA LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
34 34 respm Response/Objection Wed 03/05 2:01 PM
OBJECTION filed by Elliot Omanson, OwlFi RIA LLC re:32 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
33 33 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/05 1:57 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Elliot Omanson, OwlFi RIA LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
32 32 motion Attorney Fees Wed 02/26 10:59 AM
MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Chantal Dauenhauer, Ricky Dauenhauer, NAE Enterprises Inc (Shields, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration(s)
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
31 31 order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Wed 02/12 1:27 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot18 Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/12/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
30 30 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Set Aside Default Wed 02/12 11:53 AM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS the OwlFi Defendants' Motion to Set Aside Default (ECF No.22 ) and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to set aside the default previously entered (ECF No.13 ). The Court further ORDERS the OwlFi Defendants to pay reasonable attorney's fees to Plaintiffs for pursuit of default judgment and defending the Motion addressed in this Order. Plaintiffs shall submit their application for attorney's fees within 14 days of this order and the OwlFi Defendants shall submit any objection to Plaintiffs application within 7 days thereafter. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/12/2025) (jnp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
29 29 respm Reply Tue 02/11 2:12 PM
REPLY filed by Elliot Omanson, OwlFi RIA LLC re:22 MOTION to Set Aside Default ,24 Supplemental MOTION to Set Aside Default (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
28 28 respm Appendix in Support Tue 02/04 3:14 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Chantal Dauenhauer, Ricky Dauenhauer, N.A.E. Enterprises, Inc. re27 Response/Objection (Shields, David)
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Response/Objection Tue 02/04 3:10 PM
RESPONSE filed by Chantal Dauenhauer, Ricky Dauenhauer, N.A.E. Enterprises, Inc. re:22 MOTION to Set Aside Default ,24 Supplemental MOTION to Set Aside Default (Shields, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
26 26 misc Affidavit Wed 01/29 3:13 PM
AFFIDAVIT David M. Macdonald by Adam Zentner, Zentner Law, P.A.. (Macdonald, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1
25 25 misc Affidavit Wed 01/29 3:10 PM
AFFIDAVIT of John A. Safarli by Adam Zentner, Zentner Law, P.A.. (Safarli, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
24 24 motion Set Aside Default Tue 01/28 3:13 PM
Supplemental MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Elliot Omanson, OwlFi RIA LLC (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A
23 23 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Tue 01/28 1:53 PM
ORDER: the Court ORDERS that Plaintiffs file a response to Defendants Motion on or before February 4, 2025. It is further ORDERED that any reply to Plaintiffs' response be filed on or before February 11, 2025. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 1/28/2025) (wxc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
22 22 motion Set Aside Default Tue 01/21 1:02 PM
MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Elliot Omanson, OwlFi RIA LLCAttorney Brian W Zimmerman added to party Elliot Omanson(pty:dft), Attorney Brian W Zimmerman added to party OwlFi RIA LLC(pty:dft) (Zimmerman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
21 21 service Affidavit of Service Wed 01/15 12:49 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion for Default Judgment, Appendix served on Elliot Omanson on 01/08/2025. (Shields, David)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Affidavit of Service Wed 01/15 12:47 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion for Default Judgment, Appendix served on OwlFI RIA, LLC on 01/08/2025. (Shields, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
19 19 respm Appendix in Support Fri 12/20 4:09 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Ricky Dauenhauer, Chantal Dauenhauer, N.A.E. Enterprises, Inc. re18 MOTION for Default Judgment against Elliot Omanson, OwlFi RIA LLC (Shields, David)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Default Judgment Fri 12/20 4:08 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Elliot Omanson, OwlFi RIA LLC filed by N.A.E. Enterprises, Inc., Chantal Dauenhauer, Ricky Dauenhauer with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Shields, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
17 17 order Scheduling Order Order For ADR Tue 10/22 3:01 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning September 29, 2025. Counsel and the Parties must be ready for trial on two days' notice at any time during those four weeks. Joinder of Parties due by 12/21/2024. Amended Pleadings due by 12/21/2024. Deadline for mediation is on or before 4/2/2025. Discovery due by 5/2/2025. Motions due by 6/1/2025. Pretrial Order due by 9/4/2025. The court appoints John W Brookman as mediator.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 10/22/2024) (jnp)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
16 16 misc Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order Mon 10/21 12:13 PM
Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order [Joint Report} by Chantal Dauenhauer, Ricky Dauenhauer, N.A.E. Enterprises, Inc.. (Ferguson, Jay)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
15 15 5 pgs order Order for Scheduling Order Proposal Mon 09/30 2:25 PM
ORDER: Lead counsel for each party or designee attorney with appropriate authority and any unrepresented party must confer in an in-person, face-to-face conference as soon as practicable. As a result of the Scheduling Conference, counsel must prepare and submit a Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order by October 21, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 9/30/2024) (jnp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/26 4:59 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Adam Zentner, Zentner Law, P.A.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Safarli, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
13 13 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 09/19 3:20 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Elliot Omanson, OwlFi RIA LLC (jnp)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Thu 09/19 12:22 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Default filed by Chantal Dauenhauer, Ricky Dauenhauer, N.A.E. Enterprises, Inc.. (Shields, David)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Thu 09/19 12:16 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Default filed by Chantal Dauenhauer, Ricky Dauenhauer, N.A.E. Enterprises, Inc.. (Shields, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exh 1-Declaration,
Att: 2 Exh 1A-ROS OwlFi RIA,
Att: 3 Exh 1B-ROS E. Omanson,
Att: 4 Exh 1C-SCRA
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Tue 09/17 6:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Elliot Omanson ; served on 8/26/2024; OwlFi RIA LLC ; served on 8/23/2024; Adam Zentner ; served on 8/23/2024; Zentner Law, P.A. ; served on 8/23/2024. (Shields, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 09/10 10:57 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting8 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or to Otherwise Respond to Pltf Original Complaint. Defendants' answer is now due 9/27/2024. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 9/10/2024) (WRA)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 09/06 11:58 AM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or to Otherwise Respond to Pltf Original Complaint filed by Adam Zentner, Zentner Law, P.A. (Macdonald, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 09/06 11:10 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Adam Zentner, Zentner Law, P.A.. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Macdonald, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 09/06 11:00 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Armen Safarli on behalf of Adam Zentner, Zentner Law, P.A.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Safarli, John)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 09/06 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M Macdonald on behalf of Adam Zentner, Zentner Law, P.A.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Macdonald, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 08/19 8:46 AM
Summons Issued as to Elliot Omanson, OwlFi RIA, LLC, Adam Zentner, Zentner Law, P.A. (jnp)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
3 3 qcref Pittman Mon 08/19 8:38 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (jnp)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 08/16 1:29 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chantal Dauenhauer, Ricky Dauenhauer, N.A.E. Enterprises, Inc. dba NAE Contracting. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Shields, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 25 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 08/16 1:21 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Ricky Dauenhauer, N.A.E. Enterprises, Inc. dba NAE Contracting, Chantal Dauenhauer. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14846231) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Shields, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit(s) 12