Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:22-bk-11373

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott C Clarkson
Case #: 8:24-ap-01109
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
American Electric Supply, Inc., a California corporation
Represented By
American Electric Supply, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Karen Sue Naylor, solely in her capacity as the chapter 7 trustee for the bankruptcy estate of Integrated Energy Systems CA, Inc.
Represented By
Nathan F Smith
Malcolm - Cisneros
contact info
Trustee
Karen S Naylor (TR)
Karen Sue Naylor, Trustee 4910 Birch Street, Suite 120
Newport Beach, CA 92660
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
6 6 court Hearing Held (Other) Tue 11/05 8:05 PM
Hearing Held On Status Conference Related [+] To Avoid Preferential Transfers Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Section 547; And (2) To Recover And Preserve Preferential Transfers Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Sections 550 And 551 filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor) - STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING OFF CALENDAR PER NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF AN ADVERSARY PROCEEDING THAT DOES NOT INVOLVE CLAIMS UNDER 11 U.S.C. SECTION 727 FILED 8 28-2024 - (DOCKET NO.5 ) - (NB8)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint 1
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
5 5 notice Notice Wed 08/28 3:14 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor Related [+]. (Smith, Nathan)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 8:24-ap-01109. Complaint by Karen Sue Naylor against American Electric Supply, Inc., a California corporation. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor
Monday, August 19, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 08/19 9:55 AM
Summons Service Executed on American Electric Supply, Inc. 8/19/2024 (Smith, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
3 3 court Another Summons Issued Fri 08/16 1:33 PM
Another Summons Issued on American Electric Supply, Inc. Date Issued 8/16/2024, Answer Due 9/16/2024 Related [+] Status Conference hearing to be held on 11/5/2024 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 5C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Scott C Clarkson (NB8)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor
Thursday, August 15, 2024
2 2 notice Notice Thu 08/15 3:42 PM
Notice of Compliance Filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor. (Smith, Nathan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/15 3:39 PM
Adversary case 8:24-ap-01109. Complaint by Karen Sue Naylor against American Electric Supply, Inc., a California corporation. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Smith, Nathan)
Related: [-]