Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-13040

Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mike K Nakagawa
Case #: 2:24-ap-01084
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
400 MARYLAND AVE SW
WASHINGTON, DC 20202
Represented By
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
contact info
Plaintiff
CODY BILL HARDEN
3104 GRASSWREN DRIVE
NORTH LAS VEGAS, NV 89084
Represented By
SETH D BALLSTAEDT
Ballstaedt Law Firm, Llc Dba Fair Fee Legal Services
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
10 10 court Minute Entry Continued (ADV) Thu 04/24 12:07 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 04/24/2025 10:00 am. Continued. Related [+] Appearances: SETH D BALLSTAEDT, SUMMER ALLEGRA JOHNSON Status Hearing to be held on 07/31/2025 at 10:00 AM at MKN Zoom Teleconference Line. (cas)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by CODY BILL HARDEN
Thursday, December 12, 2024
9 9 court Minute Entry Continued (ADV) Thu 12/12 3:00 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 12/12/2024 10:00 am. Continued. Related [+] Appearances: SETH D BALLSTAEDT, SUMMER ALLEGRA JOHNSON Status Hearing to be held on 04/24/2025 at 10:00 AM at MKN Zoom Teleconference Line. (cas)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by CODY BILL HARDEN
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 12/11 7:48 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by SUMMER ALLEGRA JOHNSON on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (JOHNSON, SUMMER)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
utility Remark (Adv) Wed 11/13 12:49 PM
Refund of $350.00, Receipt #A21949961, dated 08/18/2024 Related [+] (kmm)
Related: [-] 7 Order for Refund.
Friday, November 01, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order for Refund Fri 11/01 2:59 PM
Order for Refund. Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] (s)6
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
6 6 motion Motion for Refund of Filing Fee Wed 10/09 4:15 PM
Motion For Refund Filing Fee Filed by SETH D BALLSTAEDT on behalf of CODY BILL HARDEN Related [+] (BALLSTAEDT, SETH)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff CODY BILL HARDEN, 4 Auto-docket of online payment.
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Marked Docket Report
Monday, September 16, 2024
5 5 adv_misc Certificate of Service (ADV) Mon 09/16 1:28 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by SETH D BALLSTAEDT on behalf of CODY BILL HARDEN Related [+] (BALLSTAEDT, SETH)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff CODY BILL HARDEN,3 Summons Issued.
Sunday, August 18, 2024
4 4 crditcrd Auto-docket of online payment Sun 08/18 12:44 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint([LINK 24-01084 mkn] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number A21949961, fee amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Friday, August 16, 2024
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 08/16 10:04 AM
Summons Issued on UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (ccc)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference) Fri 08/16 10:04 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 12/12/2024 at 10:00 AM at Remote. Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff CODY BILL HARDEN.
Thursday, August 15, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/15 3:35 PM
Adversary case 24-01084 Complaint Filed by CODY BILL HARDEN vs. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION Fee Amount $350. (63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)(BALLSTAEDT, SETH)
Related: [-]