Oregon Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Peter C Mckittrick
Case #: 3:24-bk-32281
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Sep 19, 2024

Debtor
Oregon Door Consultants LLC
28831 SW Costa Cir W
Wilsonville, OR 97070-7384
Represented By
REX K DAINES
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Jeanne E Huffman
Jeanne E. Huffman, Trustee LLC Pob 1674
Pendleton, OR 97801
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee, Portland
1220 SW 3rd Ave., Rm. 315
Portland, OR 97204


Docket last updated: 08/16/2024 4:05 PM PDT
Friday, August 16, 2024
1 1 45 pgs caseupld Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload Fri 08/16 3:48 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition, Fee Amount $338 REX K DAINES on behalf of Oregon Door Consultants LLC. (DAINES, REX)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) Fri 08/16 3:52 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors and Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Huffman, Jeanne E with 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/19/2024 at 09:30AM via Zoom - Huffman: Meeting ID 274 061 7945, Passcode 1480958043, Phone 1-458-757-1422.. (DAINES, REX)
Related: [-]