Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Leigh Martin May
Case #: 1:24-cv-03616
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 12, 2025 3:48 AM EST
Defendant
Avery Bragg
Represented By
Kayci Nicole Timmons
J. Scott Key, LLC
contact info
Joseph Scott Key
J. Scott Key, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Patrick Charles
Represented By
Kayci Nicole Timmons
J. Scott Key, LLC
contact info
Joseph Scott Key
J. Scott Key, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Shannon Mckesey
Represented By
Kayci Nicole Timmons
J. Scott Key, LLC
contact info
Joseph Scott Key
J. Scott Key, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Keith Meadows
Represented By
Kayci Nicole Timmons
J. Scott Key, LLC
contact info
Joseph Scott Key
J. Scott Key, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jubal Rogers
Represented By
Kayci Nicole Timmons
J. Scott Key, LLC
contact info
Joseph Scott Key
J. Scott Key, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Keelan Beasley Osborne
Represented By
Jennifer Watts
Law Office Of Jennifer Watts
contact info


Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
28 28 misc Withdrawal of Motion Wed 05/07 1:58 PM
Withdrawal of Motion27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Avery Bragg, Shannon Mckesey, Jubal Rogers, Patrick Charles, Keith Meadows filed by Avery Bragg, Patrick Charles, Shannon Mckesey, Keith Meadows, Jubal Rogers. (Key, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
27 27 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 05/06 4:13 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Avery Bragg, Patrick Charles, Shannon Mckesey, Keith Meadows, Jubal Rogers.(Key, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Rule 37(a)(1) Letter
Friday, April 25, 2025
26 26 discov Certificate of Service Fri 04/25 12:05 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' INTERROGATORIES AND RPDS by Keelan Beasley Osborne.(Watts, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
25 25 discov Certificate of Service Fri 03/21 3:44 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendants's First Interrogatories / Request for Production by Avery Bragg, Patrick Charles, Shannon Mckesey, Keith Meadows, Jubal Rogers.(Key, Joseph)
Related: [-]
24 24 discov Certificate of Service Fri 03/21 3:42 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Response to Plaintiff's Interrogatories by Avery Bragg, Patrick Charles, Shannon Mckesey, Keith Meadows, Jubal Rogers.(Key, Joseph)
Related: [-]
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 03/21 2:30 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a Motion for additional interrogatories such thatDefendants would provide complete answers to the Interrogatories already served (Doc. No.22 ). To the extent that these specific interrogatories may exceed the limit, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's22 motion such that Defendants' objections to these interrogatories as exceeding the limit is overruled. Defendants are ORDERED to respond to these additional interrogatories within 21 days of the date of this Order. If Defendants have additional objections, they can make them at this time. As to the22 unopposed motion to extend the discovery period 60 days from the date of this order, that relief is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/21/2025. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
22 22 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 03/20 5:37 PM
MOTION that the relief sought by the plaintiff in Document 20-1 be granted in part and denied in part20 Certificate of Service, motion to extend discovery and for additional interrogatories by Avery Bragg, Patrick Charles, Shannon Mckesey, Keith Meadows, Jubal Rogers. (Key, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
21 21 discov Certificate of Service Tue 03/18 4:11 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendants's Discovery Responses by Avery Bragg, Patrick Charles, Shannon Mckesey, Keith Meadows, Jubal Rogers.(Key, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
20 20 discov Certificate of Service Tue 03/11 3:46 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS TOCOMPLY WITH LOCAL RULES by Keelan Beasley Osborne.(Watts, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order MOTION,
Att: 2 Exhibit Interrogatories Plaintiff Served Upon Defendant Meadows on January 23, 2025
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 02/12 12:59 PM
ORDER. The motion to dismiss, Dkt. No.15 , is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/11/2025. (cpp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 02/05 10:04 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION to Dismiss to comply with local rules filed by Keelan Beasley Osborne. (Watts, Jennifer) Modified on 2/5/2025 to remove duplicate wording and all capital text (cpp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
17 17 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 01/30 5:11 PM
Second Certificate of Interested Persons by Keelan Beasley Osborne. (Watts, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 01/30 5:07 PM
First Certificate of Interested Persons by Keelan Beasley Osborne. (Watts, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
15 15 motion Dismiss Thu 01/23 2:57 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Keith Meadows, Shannon Mckesey, Jubal Rogers, Patrick Charles, Avery Bragg. (Key, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 01/14 3:58 PM
Submission of13 Order to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (bnp)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 11, 2025
14 14 discov Initial Disclosures Sat 01/11 12:14 AM
First Initial Disclosures by Keelan Beasley Osborne.(Watts, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 12/26 9:37 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery is extended so that it shall end 90 days from the entry of this Order. Additionally, Defendants have called to the Court's attention Plaintiff's failure to make initial disclosures, which were due in mid-September. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a certificate of service of the initial disclosures upon Defendants within 14 days of the entry of this Order or SHOW CAUSE why the case should not be dismissed pursuant to Rule 41.3 of the Local Rules of this Court. It also appears that Plaintiff has failed to respond to the Court's Order to file her overdue certificate of interested persons. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED to file the certificate of interested persons within 14 days of the entry of this Order or SHOW CAUSE why the case should not be dismissed pursuant to Rule 41.3 of the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 12/26/2024. (jbu)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
12 12 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 12/23 4:08 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Keith Meadows, Shannon Mckesey, Jubal Rogers, Patrick Charles, Avery Bragg. (Key, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order Mon 11/04 11:35 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:8 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 11/04/2024. (tht)
Related: [-]
10 10 discov Initial Disclosures Mon 11/04 8:40 AM
Initial Disclosures by Avery Bragg, Patrick Charles, Shannon Mckesey, Keith Meadows, Jubal Rogers.(Key, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
9 9 discov Initial Disclosures Fri 11/01 4:33 PM
Initial Disclosures by Avery Bragg, Patrick Charles, Shannon Mckesey, Keith Meadows, Jubal Rogers.(Key, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
8 8 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Fri 10/18 2:17 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Avery Bragg, Patrick Charles, Shannon Mckesey, Keith Meadows, Jubal Rogers. (Timmons, Kayci)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/18 2:10 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Avery Bragg, Patrick Charles, Shannon Mckesey, Keith Meadows, Jubal Rogers. (Timmons, Kayci)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/18 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kayci Nicole Timmons on behalf of Avery Bragg, Patrick Charles, Shannon Mckesey, Keith Meadows, Jubal Rogers (Timmons, Kayci)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 10/17 4:58 PM
ORDER: Counsel are hereby ORDERED to file the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan required by Local Rule 16.2 within 14 days of entry of this Order or SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to LR 41.3. Counsel are also ORDERED to file their respective certificate of interested persons within 14 days of this order. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/17/2024. (tht)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Filing Fri 08/16 12:13 PM
NOTICE Of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by Avery Bragg, Patrick Charles, Shannon Mckesey, Keith Meadows, Jubal Rogers(Key, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 30+ pgs order Order Fri 08/16 11:45 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 8/16/2024. (bnp)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 08/16 11:36 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13653969) filed by Jubal Rogers, Avery Bragg, Keith Meadows, Patrick Charles, Shannon Mckesey.(djs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet
Thursday, August 15, 2024
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Tue 08/20 4:15 PM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Avery Bragg, Patrick Charles, Shannon Mckesey, Keith Meadows, Jubal Rogers. Discovery ends on 1/13/2025. (Originally filed in the Superior Court of Fulton County on 8/14/2024). (rlh)
Related: [-]