Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:J P Boulee
Referred: Regina D Cannon
Case #: 1:24-cv-03618
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 12, 2025 3:49 AM EST
Defendant
Werner Enterprises, Inc
Represented By
Benjamin M. Rachelson
Adams And Reese LLP
contact info
Benjamin W. Bard
Adams And Reese LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tamara Nolan
P. O. Box 95
Morrow, GA 30260


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
20 20 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Wed 04/30 2:48 PM
ORDER for Service of19 Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 4/30/2025. (gww)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Report and Recommendation Wed 04/30 2:46 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Werner Enterprises, Inc. The Court RECOMMENDS that Defendant's second motion to dismiss, Doc.16 , be GRANTED. Specifically, the undersigned RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff's claims for hostile work environment and retaliation be GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE but that her claim for sex discrimination be GRANTED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 4/30/2025. (gww)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 04/30 2:47 PM
ORDER denying as moot11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 4/30/2025. (gww)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 04/30 2:49 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Tamara Nolan re20 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation,19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Werner Enterprises, Inc. (gww)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Mon 12/16 11:09 AM
Submission of16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Mon 12/02 10:11 AM
Submission of11 MOTION to Dismiss to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 11/27 1:50 PM
ORDER: The motion is GRANTED and this case is hereby STAYED pending the District Judges ruling on Defendants motion to dismiss. The undersigned will enter an order or recommendation, as appropriate, on the motion to dismiss in due course. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 11/27/2024. (gww)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 11/27 1:51 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Tamara Nolan re18 Order on Motion to Stay. (gww)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
17 17 motion Stay Tue 11/26 12:10 PM
Second MOTION to Stay with Brief In Support by Werner Enterprises, Inc.(Bard, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
16 16 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 11/26 12:04 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Werner Enterprises, Inc.(Bard, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support
Thursday, November 14, 2024
15 15 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 11/15 2:44 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tamara Nolan.(djs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 11/15 2:39 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Werner Enterprises, Inc filed by Tamara Nolan.(djs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 11/05 1:45 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Stay. The motion is GRANTED and this case is hereby STAYED pending the District Judges ruling on Defendants motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 11/5/2024. (gww)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 11/05 1:47 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Tamara Nolan re13 Order on Motion to Stay. (gww)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
12 12 motion Stay Mon 11/04 5:10 PM
MOTION to Stay with Brief In Support by Werner Enterprises, Inc.(Bard, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
11 11 motion Dismiss Mon 11/04 5:02 PM
MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Werner Enterprises, Inc.(Bard, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Mon 11/04 2:18 PM
Clerk's Notation re10 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement: Read and approved by District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
10 10 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/25 11:50 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Werner Enterprises, Inc. (Bard, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Fri 10/11 9:14 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:8 APPLICATION for Admission of Benjamin W. Bard Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13784446). Attorney Benjamin W. Bard added appearing on behalf of Werner Enterprises, Inc. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (jas)
Related: [-]
order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/11 9:26 AM
ORDER granting8 Application for Admission of Benjamin W. Bard Pro Hac Vice. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on October 11, 2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 10/10 3:12 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Werner Enterprises, Inc. Werner Enterprises, Inc waiver mailed on 9/5/2024, answer due 11/4/2024. (Rachelson, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/10 2:58 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Benjamin W. Bard Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13784446).by Werner Enterprises, Inc.(Rachelson, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, September 05, 2024
7 7 service Request for Waiver of Service Thu 09/05 9:07 AM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service (2 Notices of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, 1 Copy of the Complaint, 1 Copy of the Service Order, 1 copy of the Initial Disclosures form, and 1 Self-Addressed Stamped Envelope) mailed to Werner Enterprises, Inc. on 9/5/2024. If waiver not returned by 10/10/2024, prepare personal service package. (gww)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
6 6 utility Remark Thu 09/05 8:50 AM
Received USM 285 form and proposed summons as to defendant Werner Enterprises, Inc. (gww)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Completed USM285 Form
5 5 discov Initial Disclosures Thu 09/05 8:45 AM
Initial Disclosures by Tamara Nolan.(gww)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
4 4 cmp Complaint Mon 08/19 10:19 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Tamara Nolan.(gww)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
3 3 3 pgs order Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 08/19 10:17 AM
ORDER granting1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is thus ORDERED that Plaintiff's action is ALLOWED TO PROCEED as any other civil action. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff the USM 285 form, summons form, and the initial disclosures form. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to complete these forms and return them to the Clerk of Court within TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS from the entry date of this Order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to the undersigned if Plaintiff fails to comply. Plaintiff is also REQUIRED to keep the Court and Defendants advised of his/her current address at all times throughout this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 8/19/2024. (gww)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Notice to Pro Se Parties Mon 08/19 10:10 AM
NOTICE to Pro Se Parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 8/19/2024. (gww)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 08/19 11:21 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Tamara Nolan re3 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,2 Notice to Pro Se Parties, USM 285 form, Summons Form, and Initial Disclosures Form. (gww)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 08/16 9:29 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tamara Nolan.(djs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Fri 08/16 9:32 AM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (djs)
Related: [-]