Maryland District Court
Judge:Julie Rebecca Rubin
Case #: 1:24-cv-02392
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, February 13, 2025
9 9 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 02/18 10:15 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Antwan Curtis(bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Resident Account Summary,
Att: 2 Envelope
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 02/18 10:00 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bernhard, Jane or John Doe, Obsu, Rosenberg, filed by Antwan Curtis.(bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Maryland Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services Medical Assignment,
Att: 2 Envelope
Monday, December 09, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document Mon 12/09 8:38 AM
ORDER granting6 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Document. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 12/9/2024. (c/m p 12/9/2024 bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 11/18 12:03 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint by Antwan Curtis(bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, October 11, 2024
5 5 5 pgs order Order Fri 10/11 1:42 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint as directed above within 28 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 10/11/2024. (c/m p 10/11/2024 bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
4 4 misc New Case Notification Letter Fri 08/16 3:05 PM
New Case Notification Letter sent to Antwan Curtis. (c/m to P 8/16/24 - av4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 08/16 2:57 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Antwan Curtis (av4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/16 2:53 PM
COMPLAINT against All responsible staff & officers, Barnett, C.M.C.F., Obsu, Rosenberg, filed by Antwan Curtis. (av4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope