South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:24-cv-04486
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 11, 2025 3:52 AM EST
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
Kiddie PLC
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Coporation Trust Company 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
Buck Eye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Defendant
ABC Corporations 1-50
Defendant
3M Company
Plaintiff
Mary Kasky
Represented By
Stephen T Sullivan, Jr.
Keefe Law Firm LLC
contact info
John E Keefe, Jr
Keefe Bartels Clark
contact info
Plaintiff
Philip Kasky
Represented By
Stephen T Sullivan, Jr.
Keefe Law Firm LLC
contact info
John E Keefe, Jr
Keefe Bartels Clark
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, August 16, 2024
3 3 misc MDL Member Case Opened Fri 08/16 1:04 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 08/15/2024), Philip Kasky & Mary Kasky v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-04486-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: District of New Jersey (wmil)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 08/16 1:02 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (wmil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
1 1 41 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 08/16 1:01 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11938058.), filed by Philip Kasky, Mary Kasky. Service due by 11/13/2024 (wmil)
Related: [-]