Oklahoma Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Paul R Thomas
Case #: 4:24-bk-11060
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2024

Debtor
Oklahoma Forge, LLC d/b/a Oklahoma Forge, Inc.
5259 S 49th West Ave
Tulsa, OK 74107-8808
Represented By
Oklahoma Forge, LLC d/b/a Oklahoma Forge, Inc.
contact info
Last checked: never
Petitioning Creditor
Ellwood Quality Steels Company, Petitioning Creditor
700 Moravia Street
New Castle, PA 16101
Represented By
Stephen J. Moriarty
Fellers Snider
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Ellwood National Steel Company, Petitioning Creditor
1 Front Street
Irvine, PA 16329
Represented By
Stephen J. Moriarty
Fellers Snider
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Lehigh Specialty Melting Inc., Petitioning Creditor
107 Gertrude St.
Latrobe, PA 15650
Represented By
Stephen J. Moriarty
Fellers Snider
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
PO Box 3044
Tulsa, OK 74101

GPO May 13 2025
Memorandum Opinion regarding Motion for Order Authorizing Sale (Clear of Liens) and Motion for Order Authorizing Distribution of Funds (CT). Modified on 5/13/2025 (CC).

Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 7:02 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
362 362 misc Certificate of Service Wed 05/21 3:35 PM
Supplemental Certificate of Service Related [+] Reason for filing amendment or correction: signature block required . Certificate of Service attached. Filed by Stephen J. Moriarty on behalf of Ellwood Group, Inc., Ellwood National Steel Company, Ellwood Quality Steels Company. (Moriarty, Stephen)
Related: [-] 360 Certificate of Service
Att: 1 05-20-25 Matrix
361 361 court Memorandum of Document Deficiency (Signature Issues) Wed 05/21 10:31 AM
Memorandum of Document Deficiency to Stephen John Moriarty, regarding document number360 . Local Rule 9011-4(A) and 9004-1(C) applies to all documents signed by an attorney. Accordingly, the electronic signature (e.g., "s/Jane Doe") or a scanned signature must be on the document and the attorney's full name, state bar number, address, email address, telephone number, facsimile number (if applicable), and name of party or parties represented shall be shown on documents beneath the signature line. A corrected pleading should be submitted. Correction due by 5/22/2025. Related [+]. (MA)
Related: [-] 360 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
360 360 misc Certificate of Service Tue 05/20 2:32 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Certificate of Service attached. Filed by Stephen John Moriarty on behalf of Ellwood Group, Inc., Ellwood National Steel Company, Ellwood Quality Steels Company. (Moriarty, Stephen)
Related: [-] 359 Order Setting Status Hearing
Att: 1 05-20-25 Matrix
359 359 TextOrderM Order Setting Status Hearing Tue 05/20 11:30 AM
Order Setting Telephonic Status Hearing. Telephonic Status hearing to be held on 5/28/2025 at 11:00 AM regarding the Motion of Ellwood National Steel Company, Ellwood Quality Steels Company, and Ellwood Group, Inc for Entry of an Order Allowing Administrative Expense Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 503(B)(3)(D) and 503(B)(4) and Notice for Opportunity for Hearing; Objection by Debtor; Joinder to Debtor's Objection by Store Master Funding XIV, LLC; Objection by United States Trustee. Parties desiring to participate in this hearing shall DIAL-IN to the hearing using the toll-free dial-in number of 650-479-3207 and the Access Code of 2314 059 5439 . BY THE COURT: Chief Judge Paul R. Thomas Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. Related [+]. This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached. (text-only order). (CR)
Related: [-] 302 Request for Payment of Administrative Claim,315 Objection,322 Joinder,342 Objection
358 358 12 pgs misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Tue 05/20 11:25 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 04/30/2025 Filed by Mark A. Craige on behalf of Oklahoma Forge, LLC d/b/a Oklahoma Forge, Inc.. (Craige, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 15 pgs Exhibit Attachment
Friday, May 16, 2025
357 357 misc Certificate of Service Fri 05/16 5:05 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Alexander Sokolosky on behalf of Oklahoma Forge, LLC d/b/a Oklahoma Forge, Inc.. (Sokolosky, Alexander)
Related: [-] 356 Order on Motion To Sell Free and Clear of Liens, Order on Motion for Distribution of Funds
Att: 1 Matrix
356 356 36 pgs order Distribution of Funds Fri 05/16 3:27 PM
Order (1) Authorizing Sale of Substantially all of the Debtor's Assets Free and Clear of all Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Other Interests, (2) Approving Distribution of Sale Proceeds, and (3) Granting Related Relief. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. Related [+] (CR)
Related: [-] 317 Motion for Order Authorizing Sale (Clear of Liens), Motion for Order Authorizing Distribution of Funds
355 355 notice Notice Fri 05/16 9:50 AM
Notice of Revised Order Filed by Alexander Sokolosky on behalf of Oklahoma Forge, LLC d/b/a Oklahoma Forge, Inc.. Related [+]. (Sokolosky, Alexander)
Related: [-] 317 Motion for Order Authorizing Sale (Clear of Liens), Motion for Order Authorizing Distribution of Funds