Arizona District Court
Judge:Susan M Brnovich
Case #: 2:24-cv-02073
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2024
Terminated:Oct 10, 2024
Last checked: Monday Feb 10, 2025 1:17 AM MST
Defendant
State Farm
Represented By
Robert Thomas Aquinas Sullivan
Broening Oberg Woods & Wilson Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Defendant
United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Plaintiff
Gene Edward Scott, II
4839 S Darrow Dr., #G258
Tempe, AZ 85282


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM MST
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 10/22 11:38 AM
ORDER denying Plaintiff's second Motion (Doc.15 ) as moot and denying the first motion (Doc.14 ) for lack of merit. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 10/21/24. (EJA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
15 15 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 10/21 12:21 PM
MOTION to Waive Fees by Gene Edward Scott, II. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
14 14 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 10/11 3:29 PM
Ex Parte MOTION Requesting Final Documents From Case and to Submit Plaintiff's Response to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss by Gene Edward Scott, II. (EJA)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Thu 10/10 8:33 AM
ORDER denying Plaintiff's motions (Docs5 &12 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting State Farm's Motion to Dismiss (Doc.6 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate this case. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 10/10/2024. (ESG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
12 12 motion Summary Judgment Fri 10/04 11:39 AM
Ex Parte MOTION for Summary Judgment by Gene Edward Scott, II. (EJA)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Tue 10/01 11:41 AM
NOTICE (Motion) to Admit that Plaintiff's Complaint has been Served by Gene Edward Scott, II. (EJA)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
10 10 misc Statement Tue 09/24 12:52 PM
Ex Parte Witnesses' STATEMENT and Medical Statements by Plaintiff Gene Edward Scott, II. (EJA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order Thu 09/19 3:28 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff shall file with the Clerk of the Court and serve on opposing counsel a responsive memorandum to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc.6 ) no later than September 30, 2024. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion shall be deemed ready for decision without oral argument on the day following the date set for filing a reply unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 9/19/2024. (ESG)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 09/19 3:25 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's2 Application (Motion) for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 9/19/2024. (ESG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement Tue 09/17 3:09 PM
Disclosure Statement by State Farm. (Sullivan, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
6 6 motion Dismiss Party Thu 09/12 4:50 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Party State Farm by State Farm.(Sullivan, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, August 26, 2024
5 5 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 08/28 10:58 AM
MOTION for Judgment Award by Gene Edward Scott, II. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
4 4 misc Notice to Self-Represented Litigant Fri 08/16 11:55 AM
NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (EJA)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc New Case Opened Fri 08/16 11:53 AM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-02073 PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (EJA)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 08/16 11:52 AM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Gene Edward Scott, II. (2 pages) (EJA)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/16 11:49 AM
Ex Parte COMPLAINT filed by Gene Edward Scott, II.(EJA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope