Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-00430
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 17, 2024 2:29 AM CDT
Defendant
Daniel Samuel Vasquez (1)
Represented By
Luis Stephen Baez
The Law Office Of Luis Baez, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Anna Elizabeth Swanson
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 10:00 PM CDT
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
Arrest of Daniel Samuel Vasquez, filed. (abb4) [4:24-mj-00333]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
1 1 8 pgs COMPLAINT as to Daniel Samuel Vasquez (1), filed. (abb4) [4:24-mj-00333]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
***Set Hearing as to Daniel Samuel Vasquez: Initial Appearance set for 7/26/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 701 before Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan (abb4) [4:24-mj-00333]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Daniel Samuel Vasquez, filed. (mem4) [4:24-mj-00333]
Related: [-]
INITIAL APPEARANCE Minute Entry for proceedings held on 7/26/2024 before Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan as to Daniel Samuel Vasquez. Defendant first appearance on Complaint. (Defendant informed of rights). Defendant appeared with counsel. Order of Temporary Detention to be entered,. Detention Hearing set for 7/30/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 701 before Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan Appearances: AUSA Byron H. Black for USA; Luis Baez Related [+] for Defendant.(ERO:Yes) (Interpreter: No) (Pretrial Officer: Francesca Sonne) Defendant remanded to custody, filed. (mem4) [4:24-mj-00333]
Related: [-] tained
2 2 Arrest Warrant issued 07/25/2024; Returned Executed on 07/24/2024 as to Daniel Samuel Vasquez. Defendant was arrested in Houston, TX. Document restricted from PACER under privacy policy., filed. (abb4) [4:24-mj-00333]
Related: [-]
3 3 Arrest Warrant issued 07/25/2024; Returned Executed on 07/24/2024 as to Daniel Samuel Vasquez. Defendant was arrested in The Woodlands, TX. Document restricted from PACER under privacy policy., filed. (abb4) [4:24-mj-00333]
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Daniel Samuel Vasquez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) Parties notified. (mem4) [4:24-mj-00333]
Related: [-]
5 5 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Daniel Samuel Vasquez Detention Hearing set for 7/30/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 701 before Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) Parties notified. (mem4) [4:24-mj-00333]
Related: [-]
15 15 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Daniel Samuel Vasquez, filed.
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Luis Stephen Baez appearing for Daniel Samuel Vasquez , filed. (Baez, Luis) [4:24-mj-00333]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan: DETENTION HEARING as to Daniel Samuel Vasquez held on 7/30/2024. Defendant requests a continuance. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 8/1/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 700 before Magistrate Judge Richard W Bennett Appearances: Anna Elizabeth Swanson, Luis Stephen Baez.(ERO:Yes) (Interpreter:No), filed. (mem4) [4:24-mj-00333]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Richard W Bennett: PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION & DETENTION HEARING as to Daniel Samuel Vasquez held on 8/1/2024. Deft WAIVED Preliminary Hearing. The court finds probable cause. Order of Detention Pending Trial to be entered. Appearances: Anna Elizabeth Swanson, Luis Stephen Baez, US Probation: Francesca Sonne.(Digital # 10:04-11:04AM)(ERO:Yes) (Interpreter:No) Deft remanded to Custody, filed. (svj4) [4:24-mj-00333]
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Daniel Samuel Vasquez, filed. (svj4) [4:24-mj-00333]
Related: [-]
9 9 Arrest Warrant issued 7/24/2024; Returned Executed on 7/24/2024 as to Daniel Samuel Vasquez. Defendant was arrested in The Woodlands, TX. Document restricted from PACER under privacy policy., filed. (fmc2) [4:24-mj-00333]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
8 8 3 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING Trial as to Daniel Samuel Vasquez ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard W Bennett) Parties notified. (svj4) [4:24-mj-00333]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
10 10 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Daniel Samuel Vasquez, filed. (cjs4) [4:24-mj-00333]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
11 11 4 pgs INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Daniel Samuel Vasquez (1) count(s) 1, 2, filed. (abb4)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment Indictment
12 12 1 pgs US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Daniel Samuel Vasquez, filed. (abb4)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs ORDER for Issuance of Notice of Indictment as to Daniel Samuel Vasquez (Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard W Bennett) Parties notified. (abb4)
Related: [-]