Nevada District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-00717
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2024
Terminated:Sep 13, 2024
Last checked: Friday Sep 20, 2024 10:57 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
David C Kiebler
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Kai Livingston Packer (1)
Terminated: 09/13/2024
Represented By
Laura Angeline Barrera
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Heidi A Ojeda
Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/17/2024 1:11 AM PDT
Thursday, August 15, 2024
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (BCI)
Related: [-]