Georgia Northern District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-00612
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2024
Terminated:Jul 19, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 18, 2024 3:18 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Norman L. Barnett
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Karl Andre Dieudonne (1)
Terminated: 07/19/2024
Represented By
Joseph Austin
Federal Defender Program, Inc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/18/2024 3:50 AM EDT
Friday, July 19, 2024
Arrest (Rule 5(c)(3)) of Karl Andre Dieudonne (jkb)
Related: [-]
Magistrate Case Closed. Defendant Karl Andre Dieudonne terminated. (jkb)
Related: [-]
1 1 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Karl Andre Dieudonne. (jkb)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard: Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings, Defendant waives Preliminary Hearing, Waiver filed, Bond Hearing, Bond set at 10,000 as to Karl Andre Dieudonne (1) held on 7/19/2024. Denying1 Governments Motion for Detention as to Karl Andre Dieudonne (1). (Tape #FTR) (jkb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Warrant,
Att: 2 Indictment
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Joseph Austin as to Karl Andre Dieudonne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 7/19/2024. (jkb)
Related: [-]
4 4 WAIVER of Rule 5 & 5.1 Hearings by Karl Andre Dieudonne (jkb)
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Karl Andre Dieudonne (jkb)
Related: [-]
6 6 Appearance Bond on Rule 5(c)(3) Entered as to Karl Andre Dieudonne in amount of $ 10,000. (jkb)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Karl Andre Dieudonne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 7/19/2024. (jkb)
Related: [-]