New York Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-00472
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2024
Terminated:Jul 23, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 18, 2024 3:16 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Rebecca Urquiola
United States Attorney'S Office Edny
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Gregory Pitt (1)
Terminated: 07/23/2024
Represented By
Jeffrey Steven Dahlberg
Federal Defenders Of New York
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/18/2024 3:45 AM EDT
Friday, July 19, 2024
Arrest (Rule 40) of Gregory Pitt (DW)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom:Arraignment as to Gregory Pitt (1) Count Complaint held on 7/19/2024, Attorney Appointment Hearing as to Gregory Pitt held on 7/19/2024, Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Gregory Pitt held on 7/19/2024. AUSA Rebecca Urquiola present. Probation officer Joseph Barlow present. Defendant present with FDNY Jeff Dahlberg. Government agent sworn on the record. Defendant arraigned on a removal complaint to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Defendant waived identity hearing. The government opposed bail for reasons stated on the record. Defense presented a ROR bail application to the court. The court granted the bail application. Defendant released on a ROR bond. Defendant advised of bond obligations and signed bond. Defendant to report to court in the EDNY on 7/23/24 at 2:00pm in courtroom 2A for an update for his court appearance in the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (FTR Log #3:50-4:33 7/19/2024.) (DW)
Related: [-]
1 1 RULE 40 AFFIDAVIT by USA as to Gregory Pitt by Affiant Rule 5 Affidavit/ Removal to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (DW)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Gregory Pitt (1) $ ROR. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 7/19/2024. (DW)
Related: [-]
3 3 WAIVER of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing by Gregory Pitt. (DW)
Related: [-]