Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-03080
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2024
Terminated:Aug 15, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 18, 2024 2:26 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patricia Aguayo
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Sara Esther Peralta-Rodriguez (1)
Terminated: 08/15/2024
Represented By
Michael F. Gorman
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/18/2024 3:02 AM CDT
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
Arrest of Sara Esther Peralta-Rodriguez (em)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: No Bond Set as to Sara Esther Peralta-Rodriguez by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (em)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres as to Sara Esther Peralta-Rodriguez. (em)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Sara Esther Peralta-Rodriguez. (em)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Duty Pub. Defender-El Paso for Sara Esther Peralta-Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (em)
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Miguel A. Torres:Initial Appearance as to Sara Esther Peralta-Rodriguez held on 7/19/2024; Interpreter: E. Gallegos (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Sara Esther Peralta-Rodriguez (Court Reporter ERO.) (em)
Related: [-]