Bravos v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Donald M Middlebrooks |
Referred: | William Matthewman |
Case #: | 9:24-cv-80995 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Aug 19, 2024 |
Terminated: | Feb 19, 2025 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 15, 2025 3:24 AM EST |
Defendant
UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
2211 Congress Street
Portland, ME 04122 |
Represented By
|
Mediator
Jack L. Townsend, Sr.
6408 East Fowler Ave.
Tampa, FL 33617 |
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Bravos
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, February 19, 2025 | ||
20 | 20
![]() ORDER CLOSING CASE: re19 Stipulation of Dismissal. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED and ADJUDGED that: the Clerk of Court shall CLOSE this CASE and DENY all pending motions AS MOOT. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/19/2025. See attached document for full details. (wce) |
|
Friday, February 14, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Tolton, William) |
|
Monday, February 10, 2025 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 02/10 10:40 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part17 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. The Parties have settled and now jointly move for a three-week extension of time, or until March 3, 2024, to file closing documents. The Parties indicate that this is the amount of time needed for a third party vendor to process and deliver the settlement funds. The Court understands that it may be preferable to wait until both sides have fully performed under the terms of the settlement agreement prior to closing the case, however it is unnecessary to delay the filing of appropriate dismissal paperwork, as the Court will retain jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement if asked to do so. The Parties may make such a request via motion prior to the filing of a self-executing stipulation of dismissal, or they may make the request contemporaneous with a conditionally-worded joint stipulation of dismissal. In short, I do not view the grounds cited as good cause to delay closing this case for an additional three weeks. I will grant the motion in part and extend the deadline to submit closing documents to February 17, 2025 . All litigation deadlines will remain in effect in the meantime. Finally, the Parties are advised that if they desire greater flexibility and additional time to wind matters up, they may consent to the jurisdiction of the paired Magistrate Judge. The consent form can be found at Appendix A of the Pretrial Scheduling Order (DE12 ). Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/10/2025. (kid) |
|
Thursday, February 06, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal re 16 Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. Responses due by 2/20/2025.(Tolton, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, February 04, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 02/04 11:00 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING DEADLINE TO FILE CLOSING DOCUMENTS. A Mediation Report was filed (DE15 ), indicating that the Parties have settled this matter in full. The Court congratulates the Parties on reaching an amicable resolution of this case. Pursuant to the instructions set forth in the Pretrial Scheduling Order (DE12 at p.7), closing documents shall be filed within 10 days, or by February 10, 2025. The Parties are advised that the notice of settlement does not stay ongoing litigation, and until a joint stipulation is filed, the Court will expect compliance with all pretrial deadlines. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/4/2025. (kid) |
|
Friday, January 31, 2025 | ||
15 | 15
![]() FINAL MEDIATION REPORT held before Mediator Jack L Townsend Sr. Prepared by: Jack L Townsend Sr. Filed by Jack L. Townsend, Sr. Disposition: Settled in full. Mediation held/partially held via video-conference. (Townsend, Jack) |
|
Monday, November 04, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Joint NOTICE of Filing Discovery Plan by Jennifer Bravos (Coffman, William) |
|
Thursday, October 31, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Jack L. Townsend, Sr as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 1/22/2025 @ 1:30 p.m.. (Coffman, William) |
|
Monday, October 28, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Amended Pleadings due by 11/4/2024., All Discovery due by 2/6/2025., Joinder of Parties due by 11/4/2024., In Limine Motions due by 2/20/2025., Motions due by 2/20/2025., Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/24/2025.), and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 10/28/2024. See attached document for full details. (ls) |
|
11 | 11
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Mon 10/28 11:24 AM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman: The Scheduling Conference was held via Zoom Video Teleconference on 10/28/204. The Court discussed whether parties would be added, the trial period, pretrial deadlines, motions to continue, sealing of documents, consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction, mediation or settlement conferences, requirements if a settlement is reached, the Local Rules, discovery, and good faith conferral. Written scheduling order and order of referral to mediation will be issued. Total time in court: 19 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): William Sydney Coffman, William Jeremiah Tolton, III. (Digital Zoom Video Recording 11:00 am) (no00) |
|
Friday, October 25, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Fri 10/25 5:33 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER RE-SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: As stated in open court on October 25, 2024, the Scheduling Conference in this case is re-set for October 28, 2024 at 11:00 AM in the West Palm Beach Division before U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman to take place via Zoom Video Teleconference (VTC). To log in through ZoomGov Meeting, use Meeting ID: 160 540 3826 and Passcode: 246129. All counsel shall appear by both audio and video. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 10/25/2024. (no00) |
|
9 | 9
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 10/25 1:35 PM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman: The hearing was held via Zoom Video Teleconference. Status Conference re: scheduling conference held on 10/25/2024. Only Defendant's Counsel appeared via ZOOM VTC. Plaintiff's counsel appeared by telephone. The Court reset the matter due to Plaintiff's nonappearance on Zoom VTC. Both Plaintiff's counsel and Defendant's counsel are to appear on time and on Zoom by audio and video. (Scheduling Conference reset for 10/28/2024 at 11:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman.). Total time in court: 04 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): William Sydney Coffman, William Jeremiah Tolton, III. (Digital 11:34:29) (swr) |
|
Thursday, October 17, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 10/17 9:54 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/25/2024 at 11:30 AM in the West Palm Beach Division before U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman to take place via Zoom Video Teleconference (VTC). Any motions to modify the existing trial date should be filed two (2) business days prior to the Scheduling Conference. Motions to modify the trial date must specifically state the basis for the request, including detailed factual support, and must provide a compelling reason. The parties are further advised that the Court is strongly disinclined to modify the trial date based upon the scheduling "tracks" contained within the Local Rules and/or based upon vague references to the complexities of the case. To log in through ZoomGov Meeting, use Meeting ID: 160 540 3826 and Passcode: 246129. All counsel shall appear by both audio and video. Because of the expedited nature of the conference, the parties are relieved of Local Rule 16.1(b)'s conference report requirement. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 10/17/2024. (no00) |
|
Thursday, September 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ' 636 (b)(1)(A) and the Magistrate Judge Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned cause is hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge William Matthewman to conduct a Scheduling Conference, pursuant to Local Rule 16.1.B, for the purpose of setting pre-trial deadline dates, for determining possible consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge for trial, and for the purpose of setting any settlement conferences in lieu of or in addition to mediation if the parties so request with notices (NEFs for Events only) for all filings in case. Calendar Call set for 4/16/2025 1:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Jury Trial set for 4/21/2025 9:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 9/26/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce) |
|
Thursday, September 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Tolton, William) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Unum Group (d/b/a Unum Group Corporation in the State of Florida for UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Tolton, William) |
|
4 | 4
![]() ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. Attorney William Jeremiah Tolton, III added to party UNUM Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft). (Tolton, William) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (wce) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 08/19 11:45 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17767096, filed by Jennifer Bravos.(Coffman, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |