Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:Brett H Ludwig
Case #: 2:24-cv-01043
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause42:4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Case Filed:Aug 19, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 15, 2025 2:55 AM CST
Defendant
Administrator Shailen Bhatt
Represented By
Tara Lewis
Doj-Enrd
contact info
Gregory Martin Cumming
contact info
Karyn L Rotker
Legal Action Of Wisconsin
contact info
Frances Bishop Morris
Doj-Enrd
contact info
Defendant
Secretary Pete Buttigieg
Represented By
Tara Lewis
Doj-Enrd
contact info
Gregory Martin Cumming
contact info
Karyn L Rotker
Legal Action Of Wisconsin
contact info
Frances Bishop Morris
Doj-Enrd
contact info
Defendant
Federal Highway Administration
Represented By
Tara Lewis
Doj-Enrd
contact info
Gregory Martin Cumming
contact info
Karyn L Rotker
Legal Action Of Wisconsin
contact info
Frances Bishop Morris
Doj-Enrd
contact info
Defendant
Div Administrator Glenn Fulkerson
Represented By
Tara Lewis
Doj-Enrd
contact info
Gregory Martin Cumming
contact info
Karyn L Rotker
Legal Action Of Wisconsin
contact info
Frances Bishop Morris
Doj-Enrd
contact info
Defendant
US Department of Transportation
Represented By
Tara Lewis
Doj-Enrd
contact info
Gregory Martin Cumming
contact info
Karyn L Rotker
Legal Action Of Wisconsin
contact info
J Qortney Mcleod
United States Department Of Justice (ed-Wi)
contact info
Frances Bishop Morris
Doj-Enrd
contact info
Defendant
Kristina Boardman
Represented By
Karyn L Rotker
Legal Action Of Wisconsin
contact info
Daniel B Peters
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Sandra L Tarver
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Sierra Club Wisconsin Chapter
Represented By
Dennis M Grzezinski
Law Office Of Dennis M Grzezinski
contact info
Daniel P Gustafson
Midwest Environmental Advocates
contact info
Karyn L Rotker
Legal Action Of Wisconsin
contact info
Plaintiff
1000 Friends of Wisconsin Inc
Represented By
Dennis M Grzezinski
Law Office Of Dennis M Grzezinski
contact info
Daniel P Gustafson
Midwest Environmental Advocates
contact info
Karyn L Rotker
Legal Action Of Wisconsin
contact info
Plaintiff
Milwaukee Inner City Congregations Allied for Hope
Represented By
Monica L Cail
Legal Action Of Wisconsin Inc
contact info
Karyn L Rotker
Legal Action Of Wisconsin
contact info
Plaintiff
Milwaukee Riverkeeper
Represented By
Dennis M Grzezinski
Law Office Of Dennis M Grzezinski
contact info
Daniel P Gustafson
Midwest Environmental Advocates
contact info
Karyn L Rotker
Legal Action Of Wisconsin
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Craig Thompson
Terminated: 10/28/2024
Represented By
Karyn L Rotker
Legal Action Of Wisconsin
contact info
Daniel B Peters
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info
Sandra L Tarver
Wisconsin Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
37 37 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/30 6:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha G Peltz on behalf of US Department of Transportation, Pete Buttigieg, Federal Highway Administration, Shailen Bhatt, Glenn Fulkerson. Attorney(s) appearing: Samantha G. Peltz (Peltz, Samantha)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice of Withdrawal by Attorney Wed 04/30 7:23 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal by Frances Bishop Morris on behalf of US Department of Transportation, Pete Buttigieg, Federal Highway Administration, Shailen Bhatt, Glenn Fulkerson.Attorney Frances B. Morris to be termed. (Morris, Frances)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Attorney - Notice Parties Wed 04/30 9:11 AM
Attorney Frances Bishop Morris terminated (vkb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
35 35 misc Electronic Exhibit(s) Mon 04/14 1:25 PM
Administrative Record re34 Notice filed by Defendants (NOT AVAILABLE ON PACER; Record contained on flash drive stored in clerk's office and is electronically stored ) (vkb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
34 34 notice Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal) Fri 04/11 2:25 PM
NOTICE by All Defendants of Administrative Record Filing(Morris, Frances)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Certifying Administrative Record,
Att: 2 Administrative Record Index
Thursday, March 06, 2025
33 33 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion to File Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 03/06 3:36 PM
ORDER signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 3/6/25 that the Defendants' Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order28 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' Motion to File a Sur-Reply31 is GRANTED. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Proposed Document Thu 03/06 10:43 AM
PROPOSED PROPOSED PLAINTIFFS' SUR-REPLY ON MOTION TO AMEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by All Plaintiffs. (Grzezinski, Dennis)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion File Leave to File Document Thu 03/06 10:38 AM
MOTION to File , MOTION for Leave to File A Sur-Reply by All Plaintiffs. (Grzezinski, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
30 30 respm Reply Brief in Support of Motion Wed 03/05 1:22 PM
REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re28 MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order of Jan. 15, 2025 . (Morris, Frances)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
29 29 respm Response to Motion Tue 03/04 1:34 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re28 MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order of Jan. 15, 2025 .(Grzezinski, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Dennis Grzezinski
misc Notice of Electronic Filing Error Tue 03/04 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re29 Response to Motion filed by Plaintiffs and28 MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order of Jan. 15, 2025 filed by Defendants; Declarations should be filed using the event "Declaration" and not filed as attachments to other documents. These documents do not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (vkb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
28 28 motion Amend/Correct Mon 03/03 2:04 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order of Jan. 15, 2025 by All Defendants.(Morris, Frances)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of L. Swann,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Wed 01/15 3:01 PM
ORDER signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 1/15/25 granting26 Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Electronic Filing Error Wed 01/15 9:53 AM
NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re26 MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order of 12/4/24 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by 1000 Friends of Wisconsin Inc, Pete Buttigieg, Glenn Fulkerson, Milwaukee Inner City Congregations Allied for Hope, Craig Thompson, Sierra Club Wisconsin Chapter, Federal Highway Administration, Kristina Boardman, US Department of Transportation, Shailen Bhatt, Milwaukee Riverkeeper; the Declaration attaached to this document should have been filed as a separate entry. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (vkb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
26 26 motion Amend/Correct Tue 01/14 2:25 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order of 12/4/24 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order by All Parties.(Rotker, Karyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Declaration of Atty Dennis Grzezinski in Support of Motion
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/10 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Frances Bishop Morris on behalf of US Department of Transportation, Pete Buttigieg, Federal Highway Administration, Shailen Bhatt, Glenn Fulkerson. Attorney(s) appearing: Frances Morris (Morris, Frances)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Wed 12/04 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing. The telephonic scheduling conference set for 12/10/24 at 1:30 p.m. is CANCELLED. (cc: all counsel) (jad)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Scheduling Order Wed 12/04 11:22 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 12/4/24. Copy of administrative record to plaintiffs by 3/7/25. Opening brief in support of claims due 4/21/25. Response briefs due 5/21/25. Optional reply brief due 6/4/25. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
22 22 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Plan Tue 12/03 3:04 PM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Parties. (Rotker, Karyn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
utility Terminate Attorney - Notice Parties Tue 11/12 9:03 AM
Attorney Tara Lewis terminated (vkb)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Withdrawal by Attorney Fri 11/08 4:54 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal by Tara Lewis on behalf of US Department of Transportation, Pete Buttigieg, Federal Highway Administration, Shailen Bhatt, Glenn Fulkerson.Attorney Tara M. Lewis to be termed. (Lewis, Tara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 10/29 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: The Court will conduct a telephone scheduling conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and Civil L.R. 16(a), on December 10, 2024 at 1:30 p.m. Counsel must call the Court conference line at 1-669-254-5252, enter Meeting ID 160 9600 2659 # and Passcode 243805 before the scheduled hearing time. A formal written Rule 26(f) report must be filed no later than seven days before the scheduling conference. (cc: all counsel) (jad)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/28 2:38 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Craig Thompson.(Tarver, Sandra)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/25 12:31 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Shailen Bhatt, Pete Buttigieg, Federal Highway Administration, Glenn Fulkerson, US Department of Transportation.(Lewis, Tara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/10 2:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Lewis on behalf of Shailen Bhatt, Pete Buttigieg, Federal Highway Administration, Glenn Fulkerson, US Department of Transportation. Attorney(s) appearing: Tara M. Lewis (Lewis, Tara)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/04 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Martin Cumming on behalf of Shailen Bhatt, Pete Buttigieg, Federal Highway Administration, Glenn Fulkerson, US Department of Transportation. Attorney(s) appearing: Gregory M. Cumming (Cumming, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 10/03 9:12 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Brett H Ludwig. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (rcm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
15 15 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 10/02 12:19 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by US Department of Transportation. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Mcleod, J)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/02 12:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by J Qortney Mcleod on behalf of US Department of Transportation. Attorney(s) appearing: AUSA Qortney McLeod (Mcleod, J)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 09/11 1:49 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to Complaint by Craig Thompson. (Tarver, Sandra)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 09/11 4:12 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 9/11/2024 granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Craig Thompson answer due 10/28/2024. (cc: all counsel)(llc)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
12 12 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Fri 09/06 1:23 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Craig Thompson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Peters, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
notice Notice by Clerk to Counsel Re Consent to Magistrate Thu 09/05 8:49 AM
NOTICE from the clerk to Defendant Craig Thompson requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available[LINK:here] . (rcm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/04 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra L Tarver on behalf of Craig Thompson. Attorney(s) appearing: Sandra L. Tarver (Tarver, Sandra)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/04 1:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel B Peters on behalf of Craig Thompson. Attorney(s) appearing: Daniel B. Peters (Peters, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
9 9 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Tue 09/03 2:41 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Milwaukee Inner City Congregations Allied for Hope. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document (Cail, Monica)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Tue 09/03 2:25 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by 1000 Friends of Wisconsin Inc, Milwaukee Inner City Congregations Allied for Hope, Milwaukee Riverkeeper, Sierra Club Wisconsin Chapter. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Grzezinski, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
misc Case Opening Modification Tue 08/20 9:46 AM
Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The disclosure statements should be filed as separate documents and not as attachments to the initiating document. These documents do not need to be re-filed. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the[LINK:attorney case opening instructions] , the[LINK:summons instructions] and the[LINK:party name guidelines found in the user manual] for further guidance (rcm)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Tue 08/20 9:47 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (rcm)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
7 7 misc Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 08/19 2:12 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs for Craig Thompson (Grzezinski, Dennis)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 08/19 2:06 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs for United States Department of Transportation (Grzezinski, Dennis)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 08/19 2:01 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs Glenn Fulkerson (Grzezinski, Dennis)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 08/19 2:00 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs for Federal Highway Administration (Grzezinski, Dennis)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 08/19 1:58 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs for Pete Buttigieg (Grzezinski, Dennis)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 08/19 1:41 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs for Shailen Bhatt (Grzezinski, Dennis)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/19 11:54 AM
COMPLAINT by Milwaukee Inner City Congregations Allied for Hope and Milwaukee Riverkeeperr against All Defendants by Sierra Club Wisconsin Chapter, 1000 Friends of Wisconsin Inc. ( Filing Fee PAID $405 receipt number AWIEDC-4749470)(Grzezinski, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Grzezinski,
Att: 4 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Gustafson,
Att: 5 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Rotker
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Mon 08/19 11:59 AM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available[LINK:here.] (mew)
Related: [-]