Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas M Durkin
Case #: 1:24-cv-07425
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Aug 19, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 15, 2025 2:36 AM CST
In Re
Application of Cargill Financial Services International, Inc. and CFSIT, Inc. for an Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782 to Obtain Discovery for use in Foreign Proceedings
Represented By
Gideon J Duke-Cohan
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling Us LLP
contact info
Bradley Pensyl
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling Us LLP
contact info
Kyle Matthew Brennan
Marwedel, Minichello & Reeb, P.C.
contact info
Shari L. Friedman
Marwedel, Minichello & Reeb, P.C.
contact info
Lauren M Kostman
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling Us LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
CFSIT, Inc.
Terminated: 08/20/2024
Represented By
Kyle Matthew Brennan
Marwedel, Minichello & Reeb, P.C.
contact info
Shari L. Friedman
Marwedel, Minichello & Reeb, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/26/2024 3:48 AM CDT
Monday, August 19, 2024
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 5). (bi, )
Related: [-]
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached[LINK:Consent To] [LINK:form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (bi, )
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs MISCELLANEOUS CASE by All Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for an Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1782 to Obtain Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings Filing fee $ 52, receipt number AILNDC-22377998.(Friedman, Shari)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D
2 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Friedman, Shari)
Related: [-]
3 3 17 pgs MEMORANDUM by CFSIT, Inc., Cargill Financial Services International, Inc. Memorandum of Law (Friedman, Shari)
Related: [-]
4 4 3 pgs DECLARATION regarding memorandum3 Declaration of Pensyl(Friedman, Shari)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9
5 5 29 pgs DECLARATION regarding memorandum3 Declaration of O'Neil (Friedman, Shari)
Related: [-]
6 6 19 pgs DECLARATION regarding memorandum3 Kyselov Declaration (Friedman, Shari)
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by CFSIT, Inc., Cargill Financial Services International, Inc. (Friedman, Shari)
Related: [-]
8 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs CFSIT, Inc., Cargill Financial Services International, Inc. by Shari L. Friedman (Friedman, Shari)
Related: [-]
9 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs CFSIT, Inc., Cargill Financial Services International, Inc. by Kyle Matthew Brennan (Brennan, Kyle)
Related: [-]