California Northern District Court
Judge:Laurel Beeler
Case #: 3:24-cv-05372
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Aug 19, 2024
Terminated:Oct 21, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court for the City and County of Marin, CV0003663
Last checked: Saturday Feb 15, 2025 12:24 AM PST
Defendant
Hugh Alexander
Represented By
Eric Patrick Enson
Crowell & Moring LLP
contact info
Daniel Allen Sasse
Crowell & Moring LLP
contact info
Melissa Nguyen
Crowell & Moring LLP
contact info
Defendant
Neil Kornswiet
Represented By
Eric Patrick Enson
Crowell & Moring LLP
contact info
Daniel Allen Sasse
Crowell & Moring LLP
contact info
Melissa Nguyen
Crowell & Moring LLP
contact info
Defendant
Optium Capital LLC
Represented By
Eric Patrick Enson
Crowell & Moring LLP
contact info
Daniel Allen Sasse
Crowell & Moring LLP
contact info
Melissa Nguyen
Crowell & Moring LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tony Raleigh
Represented By
Eric Patrick Enson
Crowell & Moring LLP
contact info
Daniel Allen Sasse
Crowell & Moring LLP
contact info
Melissa Nguyen
Crowell & Moring LLP
contact info
Defendant
David Sloan
Represented By
Eric Patrick Enson
Crowell & Moring LLP
contact info
Daniel Allen Sasse
Crowell & Moring LLP
contact info
Melissa Nguyen
Crowell & Moring LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Cascade Settlement Services LLC
Represented By
Russell E Taylor
Nassiri & Jung LLP
contact info
Kassra Powell Nassiri
Nassiri & Jung LLP
contact info

GPO Oct 31 2024
AMENDED ORDER REMANDING CASE (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 10/31/2024)

Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, November 01, 2024
39 39 misc Received Document Fri 11/01 10:50 AM
Received Document: Marin Superior Court's Acknowledgment of Receipt of35 Clerk's Notice Re Remand. (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
38 38 9 pgs order Order Thu 10/31 4:59 PM
AMENDED ORDER REMANDING CASE (Beeler, Laurel)
Related: [-]
37 37 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Thu 10/31 4:58 PM
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Amend/Correct Thu 10/31 3:25 PM
MOTION to Correct and Clarify34 Order, Terminate Motions filed by Hugh Alexander, Neil Kornswiet, Optium Capital LLC, Tony Raleigh, David Sloan. Responses due by 11/14/2024. Replies due by 11/21/2024.(Sasse, Daniel) Modified on 10/31/2024 (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
35 35 utility Remark Tue 10/22 10:59 AM
Clerk's Notice: Case Remanded to Superior Court of California, County of Marin Per Order of the Court at Docket34 . (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
34 34 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 10/21 1:37 PM
ORDER REMANDING CASE. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/21/2024. (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
33 33 misc Transcript Fri 10/11 10:05 AM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/10/24, before Judge LAUREL BEELER. Court Reporter/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: 12:15 - 12:44. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 11/1/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/9/2025. (Jauregui, Tara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
32 32 misc Transcript Order Thu 10/10 5:21 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/10/2024 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler by Cascade Settlement Services LLC, for Recorded Proceeding - San Francisco. (Nassiri, Kassra)
Related: [-]
31 31 minutes Motion Hearing 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 10/10 5:15 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Motions Hearing held on 10/10/2024. Matters are argued, submitted, and taken under submission. Court to issue order. Total Time in Court: 29 minutes. Digital Recording Time: 12:15 - 12:44. Plaintiff's Attorneys: Kassra Nassiri and Russell E Taylor. Defendants' Attorney: Daniel Allen Sasse. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/10/2024)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Transcript Order Thu 10/10 1:38 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/10/2024 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler by Hugh Alexander, Neil Kornswiet, Optium Capital LLC, Tony Raleigh, David Sloan, for Recorded Proceeding - San Francisco. (Sasse, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
29 29 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Wed 10/09 12:40 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING TIME: Motions Hearing8 MOTION to Remand and17 MOTION to Transfer Case or in the Alternative, Stay Action set for 10/10/2024 at 9:30 AM is reset to 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
28 28 misc Response ( Non Motion ) Fri 10/04 1:38 PM
Letter Response re26 Objection to New Evidence Submitted on Reply re17 MOTION to Transfer Case or in the Alternative Stay Action by Hugh Alexander, Neil Kornswiet, Optium Capital LLC, Tony Raleigh, David Sloan. (Sasse, Daniel) Modified on 10/4/2024 (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
27 27 oth_sup Statement of Recent Decision Wed 10/02 5:17 PM
STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byCascade Settlement Services LLC. Related [+] (Nassiri, Kassra)
Related: [-] 8 ,17
26 26 misc Objection Wed 10/02 5:12 PM
OBJECTIONS to re24 Reply to Opposition/Response, by Cascade Settlement Services LLC. (Nassiri, Kassra)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Letter Wed 10/02 1:05 PM
Letter from Defendants re E.D.N.Y. Hearing Transcript . (Sasse, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
24 24 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Thu 09/26 3:31 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byHugh Alexander, Neil Kornswiet, Optium Capital LLC, Tony Raleigh, David Sloan.(Sasse, Daniel)
Related: [-] 17 MOTION to Transfer Case or in the Alternative, Stay Action
Att: 1 Declaration of Daniel A. Sasse,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F
Thursday, September 19, 2024
23 23 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Thu 09/19 8:08 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byCascade Settlement Services LLC.(Nassiri, Kassra)
Related: [-] 17 MOTION to Transfer Case or in the Alternative, Stay Action
Att: 1 Declaration of Russell Taylor,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E
Thursday, September 12, 2024
22 22 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings Thu 09/12 6:14 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING: Motion Hearing8 MOTION to Remand previously set for 9/26/2024 is reset to 10/10/2024 to 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
21 21 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Thu 09/12 3:20 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byCascade Settlement Services LLC. (Nassiri, Kassra)
Related: [-] 8 MOTION to Remand
Friday, September 06, 2024
20 20 misc Objection Fri 09/06 5:46 PM
OBJECTIONS to re10 Notice (Other), of Pendency by Cascade Settlement Services LLC.(Nassiri, Kassra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Kassra P. Nassiri,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh. A to Declaration of Kassra P. Nassiri
Thursday, September 05, 2024
19 19 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Thu 09/05 9:34 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byHugh Alexander, Neil Kornswiet, Optium Capital LLC, Tony Raleigh, David Sloan.(Sasse, Daniel)
Related: [-] 8 MOTION to Remand
Att: 1 Declaration of Daniel A. Sasse,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D
18 18 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Thu 09/05 9:27 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byHugh Alexander, Neil Kornswiet, Optium Capital LLC, Tony Raleigh, David Sloan.(Sasse, Daniel)
Related: [-] 8 MOTION to Remand
Att: 1 Declaration of Daniel A. Sasse,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D
17 17 motion Transfer Case Thu 09/05 9:24 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case or in the Alternative, Stay Action filed by Hugh Alexander, Neil Kornswiet, Optium Capital LLC, Tony Raleigh, David Sloan. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2024 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 9/19/2024. Replies due by 9/26/2024.(Sasse, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Daniel A. Sasse,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
16 16 19 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Wed 09/04 10:00 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Cascade Settlement Services LLC.(Nassiri, Kassra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit comparison of amended pleading and last pleading
Friday, August 30, 2024
15 15 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 08/30 4:38 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hugh Alexander, Neil Kornswiet, Optium Capital LLC, Tony Raleigh, David Sloan.. (Sasse, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
14 14 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 08/29 10:47 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cascade Settlement Services LLC (Nassiri, Kassra)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 08/29 10:45 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Cascade Settlement Services LLC (Nassiri, Kassra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
12 12 service Certificate/Proof of Service Wed 08/28 1:38 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cascade Settlement Services LLC (Nassiri, Kassra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
11 11 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 08/27 11:00 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cascade Settlement Services LLC.. (Nassiri, Kassra)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Fri 08/23 2:24 PM
NOTICE by Hugh Alexander, Neil Kornswiet, Optium Capital LLC, Tony Raleigh, David Sloan of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceeding(Sasse, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Fri 08/23 8:48 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 8/30/2024 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings No NEF Fri 08/23 8:45 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to8 MOTION to Remand . (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
8 8 motion Remand Thu 08/22 8:20 PM
MOTION to Remand filed by Cascade Settlement Services LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2024 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 9/5/2024. Replies due by 9/12/2024.(Nassiri, Kassra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Decl. of John Chilcott,
Att: 2 Declaration Decl. of Russell Taylor,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. A to Decl. of Russell Taylor,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. B to Decl. of Russell Taylor,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. C to Decl. of Russell Taylor,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. D to Decl. of Russell Taylor,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. E to Decl. of Russell Taylor,
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex. F to Decl. of Russell Taylor,
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex.G to Decl. of Russell Taylor,
Att: 10 Proposed Order
7 7 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 08/22 12:46 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Hugh Alexander, Neil Kornswiet, Optium Capital LLC, Tony Raleigh, David Sloan (Sasse, Daniel)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 08/22 12:45 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hugh Alexander, Neil Kornswiet, Optium Capital LLC, Tony Raleigh, David Sloan (Sasse, Daniel)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 08/22 11:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Melissa Nguyen on behalf of Hugh Alexander, Neil Kornswiet, Optium Capital LLC, Tony Raleigh, David Sloan (Nguyen, Melissa)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 08/22 11:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Eric Patrick Enson on behalf of Hugh Alexander, Neil Kornswiet, Optium Capital LLC, Tony Raleigh, David Sloan (Enson, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 08/21 11:24 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/14/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2024, 11:00 AM in San Francisco - via Zoom. (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 08/19 2:34 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/3/2024. (kxo, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 08/19 10:42 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California for the City and County of Marin. Their case number is CV0003663. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19741132). Filed by DAVID SLOAN, OPTIUM CAPITAL LLC, TONY RALEIGH, NEIL KORNSWIET, HUGH ALEXANDER.(Sasse, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Daniel A. Sasse,
Att: 2 47 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet