Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Christopher C Conner
Case #: 1:24-cv-01392
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Aug 19, 2024
Terminated:Dec 11, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 15, 2025 3:58 AM EST
Defendant
Jason Dumas
Defendant
Dwayne Ratliff
Defendant
Wireless Guardian Inc.
Defendant
Southeastern Wireless Solutions LLC
Plaintiff
Safeguard Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher P. Schueller
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Terry A. Shulsky, Jr.
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Justin G. Weber
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
James Cunningham
Terminated: 12/11/2024
Represented By
Brian W. Stolarz
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Colin J. Callahan
Flannery Georgalis
contact info
Defendant
Cunningham and McGinley Consultants LLC
Terminated: 12/11/2024
Represented By
Christopher D. Carusone
Cohen Seglias Pallas Greenhall & Furman PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
30 30 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 12/11 4:06 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Case Without Prejudice by Safeguard Solutions, Inc.. (Shulsky, Terry)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Wed 12/11 4:15 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case CLOSED pursuant to stipulation30 of dismissal. (mw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
29 29 misc Stipulation Wed 12/11 10:49 AM
JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Safeguard Solutions, Inc., Cunningham and McGinley Consultants LLC, James Cunningham. (ma)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Tue 12/10 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D. Carusone on behalf of Cunningham and McGinley Consultants LLC (Carusone, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 11/26 4:16 PM
ORDER granting26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Justin G. Weber terminated. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/26/2024 (mw)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 11/26 3:32 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Safeguard Solutions, Inc..(Weber, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
25 25 23 pgs respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Tue 11/19 9:23 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by James Cunningham.(Stolarz, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Proposed Order
misc Docket Annotation Tue 11/19 8:27 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file the brief in support for document 24 as a separate docket entry. (mw)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
24 24 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 11/18 4:49 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by James Cunningham.(Stolarz, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, October 21, 2024
23 23 service Summons Issued Mon 10/21 2:08 PM
Summons Issued as to Cunningham and McGinley Consultants LLC, Southeastern Wireless Solutions LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (ll)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 8 pgs Summons Packet
Friday, October 18, 2024
22 22 76 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Fri 10/18 4:19 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against James Cunningham, Jason Dumas, Dwayne Ratliff, Wireless Guardian Inc., Cunningham and McGinley Consultants LLC, Southeastern Wireless Solutions LLC, filed by Safeguard Solutions, Inc..(Weber, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) E,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) F,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) G,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) H,
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) I,
Att: 10 41 pgs Exhibit(s) J
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 10/16 2:48 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - Defendants Wireless Guardian Inc., Dwayne Ratliff, and James Cunningham a/k/a Jimmy Cunningham shall have thirty (30) days to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the filing of an Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Safeguard in the above-captioned matter. The page limit for any briefs in support of their motions to dismiss the Amended Complaint shall be extended to no more than 6,500 words. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/16/2024 (mw)
Related: [-]
20 20 4 pgs order Special Admissions Form Approved Wed 10/16 2:21 PM
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Brian W. Stolarz. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/16/2024. (mw)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 10/16 12:57 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,,, and Expansion of Word Count by Safeguard Solutions, Inc..(Weber, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
18 18 misc Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/15 5:14 PM
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Brian W. Stolarz on behalf of James Cunningham Attorney Brian Stolarz is seeking special admission Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6786592.. (Stolarz, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Vacate Wed 09/25 9:51 AM
ORDER granting16 Joint MOTION to Vacate14 Clerk's Entry of Default,15 Clerk's Entry of Default without Prejudice as to Defendants, Wireless Guardian, Inc., and Dwayne Ratcliff . Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/25/2024 (mw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
16 16 3 pgs motion Vacate Tue 09/24 4:51 PM
Joint MOTION to Vacate14 Clerk's Entry of Default,15 Clerk's Entry of Default without Prejudice as to Defendants, Wireless Guardian, Inc., and Dwayne Ratcliff by Safeguard Solutions, Inc..(Shulsky, Terry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Exhibit A
Thursday, September 19, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 09/19 4:50 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Wireless Guardian Inc. (ma)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 09/19 4:42 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Dwayne Ratliff (ma)
Related: [-]
13 13 3 pgs motion Entry of Default Thu 09/19 4:24 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant, Wireless Guardian, Inc. by Safeguard Solutions, Inc..(Shulsky, Terry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
12 12 motion Entry of Default Thu 09/19 4:18 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant, Dwayne Ratliff by Safeguard Solutions, Inc..(Shulsky, Terry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, September 16, 2024
11 11 order Verbal Order on Motion(s) Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 09/16 3:19 PM
VERBAL ORDER - It is ORDERED that the motion10 is GRANTED and movant shall have until October 18, 2024, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/16/2024. (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.) (mw)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 09/16 3:08 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,,, by James Cunningham.(Callahan, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
9 9 1 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/10 9:01 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeguard Solutions, Inc.. James Cunningham served on 8/28/2024, answer due 9/18/2024. (Schueller, Christopher)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/10 8:58 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeguard Solutions, Inc.. Wireless Guardian Inc. served on 8/28/2024, answer due 9/18/2024. (Schueller, Christopher)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/10 8:55 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeguard Solutions, Inc.. Dwayne Ratliff served on 8/28/2024, answer due 9/18/2024. (Schueller, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
6 6 4 pgs order Special Admissions Form Approved Thu 08/29 9:11 AM
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Christopher Schueller. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 8/29/2024. (mw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
5 5 2 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 08/28 2:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safeguard Solutions, Inc.. (Shulsky, Terry)
Related: [-]
4 4 3 pgs misc Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice Wed 08/28 2:06 PM
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Christopher P. Schueller on behalf of Safeguard Solutions, Inc. Attorney Christopher P. Schueller is seeking special admission Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6741154..(Schueller, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Listing of Christopher P. Schueller's Admissions
Monday, August 19, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Order Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Mon 08/19 3:10 PM
ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 8/19/2024. (mw)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs service Summons Issued Mon 08/19 1:33 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (ibr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Summons Packet
1 1 26 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 08/19 1:32 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405, Receipt Number APAMDC-6729776), filed by Safeguard Solutions, Inc.. (ibr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 35 pgs Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement,
Att: 3 12 pgs Exhibit B - Master Services Agreement,
Att: 4 29 pgs Exhibit C - Wireless Guardian Purchases Summary,
Att: 5 32 pgs Exhibit D - Statements of Revenue Summary,
Att: 6 24 pgs Exhibit E - Weekly Meetings Summary,
Att: 7 6 pgs Exhibit F - Letter from the CEO,
Att: 8 2 pgs Exhibit G - Wireless Guardian Executive Memo - Statement from the Board of Directors,
Att: 9 2 pgs Exhibit H - Wireless Guardian Executive Memo - Letter on the Status of the Chairman,
Att: 10 3 pgs Exhibit I - Wireless Guardian Executive Memo - Statement from the CEO,
Att: 11 11 pgs Exhibit J - Safeguard Solutions Financials
misc Docket Annotation Mon 08/19 1:34 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Schueller can find information regarding either general or special admission at https://www.pamd.uscourts.gov/forms/petition-admission-practice. (ibr)
Related: [-]