Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert W Schroeder, III
Referred: Roy S Payne
Case #: 2:24-cv-00683
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 19, 2024
Terminated:Nov 21, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 15, 2025 2:28 AM CST
Defendant
TP-LINK Technology Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff
InnoMemory, LLC
Represented By
Isaac Phillip Rabicoff
Rabicoff Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, November 21, 2024
8 8 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Thu 11/21 2:05 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (NKL)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 11/21 2:03 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/21/2024. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 11/20 12:31 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by InnoMemory, LLC(Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, August 19, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 08/19 1:15 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to TP-LINK Technology Co., Ltd.. (CH)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Mon 08/19 1:10 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Mon 08/19 1:08 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by InnoMemory, LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 08/19 1:07 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Phillip Rabicoff on behalf of InnoMemory, LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 08/19 1:06 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against TP-LINK Technology Co., Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10305583.), filed by InnoMemory, LLC.(Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 08/19 1:09 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (CH)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Mon 08/19 1:10 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (CH)
Related: [-]