Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Gregory A Presnell
Referred: Embry J Kidd
Case #: 6:24-cv-01510
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Aug 19, 2024
Terminated:Mar 18, 2025
Case in other court:Volusia County, Florida, 2024 12287 CIDL
Last checked: Saturday Feb 15, 2025 3:40 AM EST
Defendant
Reoven Ainesais
Represented By
Steven Douglas Reardon
Fordharrison LLP
contact info
David M. Gobeo, II
Fordharrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
NDR Arlington, LLC
Represented By
Steven Douglas Reardon
Fordharrison LLP
contact info
David M. Gobeo, II
Fordharrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
NDR Capital Group, LLC
Represented By
Steven Douglas Reardon
Fordharrison LLP
contact info
David M. Gobeo, II
Fordharrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
NDR Investments, LLC
Represented By
Steven Douglas Reardon
Fordharrison LLP
contact info
David M. Gobeo, II
Fordharrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
NDR Marion, LLC
Represented By
Steven Douglas Reardon
Fordharrison LLP
contact info
David M. Gobeo, II
Fordharrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
NDR Pahokee, LLC
Represented By
Steven Douglas Reardon
Fordharrison LLP
contact info
David M. Gobeo, II
Fordharrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
NDR Palmetto, LLC
Represented By
Steven Douglas Reardon
Fordharrison LLP
contact info
David M. Gobeo, II
Fordharrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
NDR Real Estate, LLC
Represented By
Steven Douglas Reardon
Fordharrison LLP
contact info
David M. Gobeo, II
Fordharrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Itzchak D. Yosef
Represented By
Steven Douglas Reardon
Fordharrison LLP
contact info
David M. Gobeo, II
Fordharrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
NDR Daytona, LLC
FordHarrison, LLP 515 North Flagler Drive Suite 350
West Palm Beach, FL 33401
Represented By
Steven Douglas Reardon
Fordharrison LLP
contact info
David M. Gobeo, II
Fordharrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
NDR Group, LLC
Represented By
Peter Bober
Bober & Bober, P.A.
contact info
David M. Gobeo, II
Fordharrison LLP
contact info
Mediator
Ryan Scott Callen
The Kullman Firm 2915 Kerry Parkway Suite 101
Tallahassee, FL 32309
Represented By
Ryan Scott Callen
The Kullman Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Joshua Lindner
Represented By
Peter Bober
Bober & Bober, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Taiisha Mendez
Represented By
Peter Bober
Bober & Bober, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
41 41 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 03/18 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RPB)
Related: [-]
40 40 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 03/18 3:02 PM
ORDER granting 39 Motion for Settlement (FLSA) and Motion to Dismiss. The settlement is APPROVED and this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/18/2025. (AKC)
Related: [-]
39 39 motion Settlement Dismiss Tue 03/18 12:28 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval , Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case With Prejudice by All Plaintiffs.(Bober, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Settlement Agreement)
Monday, February 24, 2025
38 38 2 pgs order Order Mon 02/24 2:06 PM
ORDER directing the parties to file their settlement agreement and motion for approval by 3/28/25 - 37 Notice of settlement filed by Joshua Lindner, Taiisha Mendez. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/24/2025. (AKC)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 22, 2025
37 37 notice Notice of settlement Sat 02/22 12:18 PM
NOTICE of settlement by Joshua Lindner, Taiisha Mendez (Bober, Peter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
36 36 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/02 3:15 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 6:24-cv-1510-GAP-UAM. Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd no longer assigned to the case. (TNP)
Related: [-]
35 35 answer Answer to amended complaint Thu 01/02 12:42 PM
Defendants' ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 34 Amended Complaint by NDR Investments, LLC, Reoven Ainesais, Itzchak D. Yosef, NDR Group, LLC, NDR Pahokee, LLC, NDR Capital Group, LLC, NDR Daytona, LLC, NDR Marion, LLC, NDR Palmetto, LLC, NDR Arlington, LLC, NDR Real Estate, LLC.(Gobeo, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
34 34 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 12/20 7:48 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs.(Bober, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
33 33 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Wed 12/18 2:35 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 02/26/2025 at 10:00 a.m. before Scott Callen.(Bober, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
32 32 order Order on Motion for Joinder Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Fri 12/13 2:02 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 31 Motion to Amend the Complaint. Plaintiffs may have until and through December 20, 2024, to file their amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 12/13/2024. (Kidd, Embry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
31 31 motion Joinder Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Thu 12/12 9:52 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Plaintiff to Amend re1 Notice of Removal Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Bober, Peter) Modified on 12/12/2024 to edit docket text (JDR)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
30 30 utility Case Referred to Mediation Mon 12/02 2:31 PM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Lead counsel shall contact opposing Counsel and mediator, schedule mediation conference and file a Notice with the court within 14 days advising the court of the scheduled mediation date. (AKC)
Related: [-]
29 29 order Case Management Scheduling Order Mon 12/02 2:30 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 1/31/2025. Discovery due by 5/23/2025 Dispositive motions due by 7/1/2025 Pretrial statement due by 10/1/2025 All other motions due by 10/15/2025 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 2/11/2025 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 3/4/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2025 at 01:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell Jury Trial set for the trial term which commences on 12/1/2025 at 09:15 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. Conduct mediation hearing by 8/15/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/2/2024. (AKC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
28 28 misc Case Management Report Wed 11/27 3:55 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Bober, Peter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
27 27 2 pgs order Order Thu 11/14 10:39 AM
ORDER directing the parties to file their Joint Case Management Report by 12/6/24 - re 26 Status report filed by Joshua Lindner, Taiisha Mendez. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 11/14/2024. (AKC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
26 26 misc Status report Wed 11/13 9:27 AM
Joint STATUS report Regarding Settlement by Joshua Lindner, Taiisha Mendez. (Bober, Peter) Modified text on 11/13/2024 (BD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
25 25 2 pgs order Order Tue 11/12 2:14 PM
ORDER re 24 Status report filed by Joshua Lindner, Taiisha Mendez. The court will not will not grant Defendants' request for a settlement conference before a Magistrate Judge if Plaintiffs do not concur in the request. The parties are directed to confer and file a sec joint status report that complies with the Court's Scheduling Order 5 . Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 11/12/2024. (AKC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
24 24 misc Status report Thu 11/07 11:11 PM
STATUS report Regarding Settlement by Joshua Lindner, Taiisha Mendez. (Bober, Peter)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
23 23 order Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically / Video Thu 10/24 10:02 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 22 Motion to Conduct Settlement Conference by Video. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 10/24/2024. (Kidd, Embry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
22 22 motion Appear Telephonically / Video Wed 10/23 4:39 PM
Joint MOTION for Peter Bober, Steven Reardon to appear by video by All Plaintiffs. (Bober, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/18 9:05 AM
Defendants' Amended ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Reoven Ainesais, NDR Arlington, LLC, NDR Capital Group, LLC, NDR DAYTONA, LLC, NDR Investments, LLC, NDR Marion, LLC, NDR Pahokee, LLC, NDR Palmetto, LLC, NDR Real Estate, LLC, Itzchak D. Yosef.(Gobeo, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
20 20 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Wed 10/16 3:28 PM
ORDER granting 18 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend Answer and Affirmative Defenses and Supporting Memorandum of Law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 10/16/2024. (TJR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
19 19 respoth Answer to court interrogatories Wed 10/02 9:21 AM
ANSWER to court interrogatories re:5 Case Management Scheduling Order by Joshua Lindner, Taiisha Mendez.(Bober, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Taiisha Mendez' Answers to Court Interrogatories),
Att: 2 Exhibit B (Joshua Lindner's Answers to Court Interrogatories)
Monday, September 30, 2024
18 18 motion Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Mon 09/30 3:22 PM
MOTION to Amend8 Answer to Complaint by All Defendants.(Gobeo, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, September 19, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Hearing / Conference Thu 09/19 1:42 PM
ORDER denying 15 Motion for Settlement Conference before Magistrate. Defendants may refile their motion after they have adequately responded to Plaintiffs initial discovery requests and provided Plaintiffs concur in the request. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/19/2024. (AKC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
16 16 respm Response to motion Wed 09/18 3:40 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re15 MOTION for Settlement Conference Before Magistrate Judge filed by Joshua Lindner, Taiisha Mendez. (Bober, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
15 15 motion Hearing / Conference Mon 09/16 2:57 PM
MOTION for Settlement Conference Before Magistrate Judge by Reoven Ainesais, NDR Arlington, LLC, NDR Capital Group, LLC, NDR DAYTONA, LLC, NDR Investments, LLC, NDR Marion, LLC, NDR Pahokee, LLC, NDR Palmetto, LLC, NDR Real Estate, LLC, Itzchak D. Yosef. (Gobeo, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program Mon 09/09 10:17 AM
ENTERED IN ERROR (JOR) Modified on 9/9/2024 (JOR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of a Related Action Wed 09/04 11:32 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Reoven Ainesais, NDR Arlington, LLC, NDR Capital Group, LLC, NDR DAYTONA, LLC, NDR Investments, LLC, NDR Marion, LLC, NDR Pahokee, LLC, NDR Palmetto, LLC, NDR Real Estate, LLC, Itzchak D. Yosef. Related case(s): No (Gobeo, David)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Wed 09/04 11:29 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Reoven Ainesais, NDR Arlington, LLC, NDR Capital Group, LLC, NDR DAYTONA, LLC, NDR Investments, LLC, NDR Marion, LLC, NDR Pahokee, LLC, NDR Palmetto, LLC, NDR Real Estate, LLC, Itzchak D. Yosef identifying Corporate Parent NDR Real Estate, LLC for NDR Arlington, LLC, NDR Capital Group, LLC, NDR DAYTONA, LLC, NDR Investments, LLC, NDR Marion, LLC, NDR Pahokee, LLC, NDR Palmetto, LLC, NDR Real Estate, LLC.. (Gobeo, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 08/27 12:59 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Steven Douglas Reardon on behalf of Reoven Ainesais, NDR Arlington, LLC, NDR Capital Group, LLC, NDR DAYTONA, LLC, NDR Investments, LLC, NDR Marion, LLC, NDR Pahokee, LLC, NDR Palmetto, LLC, NDR Real Estate, LLC, Itzchak D. Yosef. Lead Counsel: Steven Reardon. Related [+]
Related: [-] ardon, Steven
10 10 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 08/27 12:20 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Peter Bober on behalf of Joshua Lindner, Taiisha Mendez. Lead Counsel: Peter Bober. (Bober, Peter)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 08/27 11:47 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL David M. Gobeo, II of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LD)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/26 11:33 AM
Defendants' ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Reoven Ainesais, NDR Arlington, LLC, NDR Capital Group, LLC, NDR DAYTONA, LLC, NDR Investments, LLC, NDR Marion, LLC, NDR Pahokee, LLC, NDR Palmetto, LLC, NDR Real Estate, LLC, Itzchak D. Yosef.(Gobeo, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 08/22 11:24 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Joshua Lindner, Taiisha Mendez. Related case(s): No (Bober, Peter)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 08/22 11:22 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re4 Interested Persons Order by Joshua Lindner, Taiisha Mendez. (Bober, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
5 5 order Case Management Scheduling Order Wed 08/21 5:50 PM
FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER: By 9/11/2024 parties shall serve copies upon each other as stated in the order; By 10/30/2024 parties are to meet and confer; Answer to court interrogatories due by 10/2/2024; Settlement Report due by 11/19/2024. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/21/2024. (AKC)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Interested Persons Order Wed 08/21 5:48 PM
INITIAL CASE ORDER (FLSA) for both Plaintiffs and Defendants. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement and notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/21/2024. (AKC)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order Wed 08/21 1:27 PM
ORDER recognizing typographical error in Defendants' 1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 8/21/2024. (LDM)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 08/19 3:44 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:24-cv-1510-GAP-EJK. (AA)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 08/19 2:53 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Volusia County Circuit Court, case number 2024 12287 CIDL filed in State Court on 07/05/2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-22423095 filed by All Defendants.(Gobeo, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT A,
Att: 2 State Court Other Documents B,
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet