Member Case
Lead case is: 3:24-bk-00139

Alaska Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Gary Spraker
Case #: 3:24-bk-00141
Case Filed:Aug 19, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Marine Fishing International, LLC
3 Lake Bellevue Dr Ste 201
Bellevue, WA 98005-2440
Represented By
Thomas A. Buford, III
Bush Kornfeld LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
700 Stewart Street, Suite 5103
Seattle, WA 98101


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, April 10, 2025
24 24 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (For Non-Small Bus & Non-Sub V) (UST Form 11-MOR) Thu 04/10 8:40 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 02/28/2025 for the Month Ending: 02/28/2025 Filed by Lesley D Bohleber on behalf of Marine Fishing International, LLC.(Bohleber, Lesley)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (For Non-Small Bus & Non-Sub V) (UST Form 11-MOR) Thu 04/10 8:38 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-00141 for the Month Ending: 01/31/2025 Filed by Lesley D Bohleber on behalf of Marine Fishing International, LLC.(Bohleber, Lesley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
22 22 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (For Non-Small Bus & Non-Sub V) (UST Form 11-MOR) Tue 01/21 3:41 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-00141 for the Month Ending: 12/31/2024 Filed by Lesley D Bohleber on behalf of Marine Fishing International, LLC.(Bohleber, Lesley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
21 21 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (For Non-Small Bus & Non-Sub V) (UST Form 11-MOR) Thu 12/19 4:16 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-00141 for the Month Ending: 11/30/2024 Filed by Lesley D Bohleber on behalf of Marine Fishing International, LLC.(Bohleber, Lesley)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
20 20 claims Request for Notice by Creditor Mon 12/16 7:56 AM
Request for Notice by American Express National Bank. (Butler, Larry)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
19 19 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (For Non-Small Bus & Non-Sub V) (UST Form 11-MOR) Mon 11/25 8:53 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-00141 for the Month Ending: 10/31/2024 Filed by Lesley D Bohleber on behalf of Marine Fishing International, LLC.(Bohleber, Lesley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
trustee 341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters) Tue 11/12 7:49 AM
TEXT ENTRY for '341 Meeting of Creditors Held on November 8, 2024 . Matter has been CONCLUDED. Trustee's comments (if any): Related [+]. (Gustafson, Cori)
Related: [-] DE#7 Meeting of Creditors Ch 11
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
18 18 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (For Non-Small Bus & Non-Sub V) (UST Form 11-MOR) Tue 10/22 8:50 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-00141 for the Month Ending: 09/30/2024 Filed by Lesley D Bohleber on behalf of Marine Fishing International, LLC.(Bohleber, Lesley)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
17 17 10 pgs misc Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee) Fri 09/27 9:00 AM
Amended Schedules: A/B and F, Fee Amount $34., Summary of Assets and Liabilities ., Declaration Regarding Debtor's Schedules . Related [+]. Filed by Thomas A. Buford III on behalf of Marine Fishing International, LLC.(Buford, Thomas) Modified on 9/27/2024 to clean up duplicative docket text. (Loyd, Jeromy)
Related: [-] DE#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Fri 09/27 9:03 AM
Receipt of Amended Schedules D E/F([LINK 24-00141 ) [misc,amdschfa] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A2187671. Fee amount 34.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#17
Monday, September 23, 2024
16 16 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (For Non-Small Bus & Non-Sub V) (UST Form 11-MOR) Mon 09/23 4:30 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-00141 for the Month Ending: 08/31/2024 Filed by Lesley D Bohleber on behalf of Marine Fishing International, LLC.(Bohleber, Lesley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
utility Terminate Deadline Thu 09/05 9:03 AM
Utility Event to Terminate Deadline(s) Re: Disclosure of Attorney Compensation, which was filed in the LEAD case 24-00139 In re: Whittier Seafood LLC. (JL)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
15 15 13 pgs misc Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207) Fri 08/30 3:17 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs . Related [+]. Filed by Thomas A. Buford III on behalf of Marine Fishing International, LLC.(Buford, Thomas)
Related: [-] DE#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thursday, August 29, 2024
14 14 court Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37) Fri 08/30 1:31 PM
AK LBF 37B - Declaration Re: Electronic Filing by debtor(s) and counsel. (LD)
Related: [-]
utility Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag Thu 08/29 3:25 PM
ExParteMtn flag removed - order entered at ECF No. 5. Related [+].(SV)
Related: [-] DE#3 Motion for Joint Administration, Emergency/Ex parte Motion Referral,5 Order on Motion for Joint Administration
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Wed 08/28 9:42 AM
Certificate of Service of Ex Parte Order Directing Joint Administration . Related [+]. Filed by Thomas A. Buford III on behalf of Marine Fishing International, LLC.(Buford, Thomas)
Related: [-] DE#5 Order on Motion for Joint Administration
Thursday, August 22, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 08/23 3:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 19. Notice Date 08/22/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] DE#7 Meeting of Creditors Ch 11
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors Fri 08/23 3:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 20. Notice Date 08/22/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] DE#7 Meeting of Creditors Ch 11
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion Fri 08/23 3:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 19. Notice Date 08/22/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] DE#6 Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 08/21 8:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/21/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] DE#5 Order on Motion for Joint Administration
8 8 3 pgs misc Declaration Wed 08/21 11:58 AM
Amended Declaration of Aleksey Kozlov in Support of Joint Administration. Related [+]. Filed by Thomas A. Buford III on behalf of Marine Fishing International, LLC.(Buford, Thomas)
Related: [-] DE#4 Declaration
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
7 7 trustee Meeting of Creditors Ch 11 (Corporation / Partnership) (BNC Notice) Tue 08/20 8:15 AM
Court's Notice Regarding Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Filing, Notice of Meeting of Creditors,and Setting of Dates. (Parties may appear telephonically) 341 Meeting set for 9/25/2024 at 10:00 AM at Trustee Telephonic 341 Meeting. Proof of Claim due by 12/24/2024. Objections to Dischargeability due by 11/25/2024. (Gustafson, Cori)
Related: [-]
6 6 trustee Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) Tue 08/20 8:14 AM
Notice of Filing Deadlines and of US Trustee's Standing Motion to Dismiss for Non-Compliance (if deadlines are not met). Request(s) by creditors to receive special notice should be made within 14 days. (Gustafson, Cori)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
5 5 order Joint Administration Mon 08/19 4:00 PM
Ex Parte Order Directing Joint Administration. Related [+] (JL)
Related: [-] 3
4 4 misc Declaration Mon 08/19 1:39 PM
Declaration of Aleksey Kozlov in Support of Motion for Joint Administration. Related [+]. Filed by Thomas A. Buford III on behalf of Marine Fishing International, LLC.(Buford, Thomas)
Related: [-] DE#3 Motion for Joint Administration
3 3 motion Joint Administration Mon 08/19 1:37 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Joint Administration Lead Case 24-00139 with 24-00140 24-00141 24-00142 24-00143 24-00144 Filed by Thomas A. Buford III on behalf of Marine Fishing International, LLC.(Buford, Thomas)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Entry of Appearance Mon 08/19 12:53 PM
*** Notice of Appearance. Filed by Kathryn Evans on behalf of Office of the U.S. Trustee.(Evans, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
1 1 26 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (Active Event) Mon 08/19 11:51 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Thomas A. Buford III on behalf of Marine Fishing International, LLC Disclosure of Attorney Compensation due by 09/3/2024. Employee Income Record/Pay Advice due by 09/3/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due by 09/3/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 09/3/2024. (Buford, Thomas)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Mon 08/19 11:54 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-00141 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A2178806. Fee amount 1738.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
utility Terminate Deadline Mon 08/19 3:14 PM
Utility Event to Terminate Deadline(s) Re: Employee Income/ Pay Advice deadline was set at case opening. This is a corporation, pay advices are not required. Related [+].(JL)
Related: [-] DE#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
utility Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) Mon 08/19 3:15 PM
Utility Event to Update deadline related to schedules and statements, Income Expense Report due by 9/3/2024. Related [+].(JL)
Related: [-] DE#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
utility Emergency/Ex parte Motion Referral Mon 08/19 3:15 PM
Matter referred to chambers for the filing of an emergency/ex parte motion. Related [+].(JL)
Related: [-] DE#3 Motion for Joint Administration
utility Petition Review Completed Mon 08/19 3:16 PM
Petition Review Completed. Related [+].(JL)
Related: [-] DE#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
utility SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete Mon 08/19 3:17 PM
EINs have been reviewed with the petition and Official Form 121 when required.(JL)
Related: [-]
utility QC Remark (generic) Mon 08/19 4:36 PM
** Jointly Administered SUBORDINATE CASE ** As per order at DE# 5 this case has been jointly administered with cases 24-00139 GS, 24-00140 GS, 24-00142 GS, 24-00143 GS, 24-00144 GS. All future pleadings are to be filed in the LEAD case which is 24-00139 GS. Proofs of Claims shall be filed in the individual cases as they apply Related [+].(JL)
Related: [-] DE#5 Order on Motion for Joint Administration