Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Wendy W Berger
Referred: Monte C Richardson
Case #: 3:24-cv-00847
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 19, 2024
Terminated:Dec 23, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 15, 2025 3:40 AM EST
Defendant
Rachel Algee
Defendant
Jessica Hensley
Defendant
State of Florida
Plaintiff
James Fisher
P.O. Box 1942
Jacksonville, FL 32201


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, December 26, 2024
18 18 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 12/26 9:34 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendations Mon 12/23 5:08 PM
ORDERED: The Report and Recommendation (Doc. 15 ) is ADOPTED and CONFIRMED and made a part of this Order. The Complaint (Doc. 1 ) is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate all pending motions and close this case. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 12/20/2024. (CKS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 11/20 1:29 PM
ORDER ruling deferred 3 4 5 6 Plaintiff's Motions. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 11/20/2024. (TAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
15 15 motion Report and Recommendations Mon 11/18 2:48 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 11/18/2024. (TAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
14 14 5 pgs order Order Wed 10/23 3:14 PM
ORDERED: Plaintiff's amended IFP Motion and amended complaint due by 11/11/24. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 10/21/2024. (TAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order to show cause Mon 09/23 1:19 PM
ORDER to show cause as to James Fisher on or before October 7, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 9/23/2024. (JRM)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 09/06 5:25 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 9/6/2024. (JRM)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
10 10 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 08/30 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CKS)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order Fri 08/30 4:31 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective April 1, 2024, and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 8/30/2024. (CKS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
8 8 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 08/21 2:09 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:24-cv-847-WWB-MCR. Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert no longer assigned to the case. Motion(s) REFERRED:3 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically,5 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically,6 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically,2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis,4 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. (MDC)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order Wed 08/21 10:36 AM
ORDER of Recusal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 8/21/2024. (BJR)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
6 6 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 08/19 3:25 PM
MOTION to Remove by James Fisher. (ELM)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 08/19 3:24 PM
MOTION for Warrant by James Fisher. (ELM)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 08/19 3:23 PM
MOTION to Remove by James Fisher. (ELM)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 08/19 3:22 PM
MOTION for Warrant by James Fisher. (ELM)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 08/19 3:20 PM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by James Fisher. (ELM)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/19 3:18 PM
COMPLAINT against Rachel Algee, Jessica Hensley, State of Florida with Jury Demand filed by James Fisher. (No service copies provided)(ELM)
Related: [-]