Kentucky Western District Court
Judge:Greg N Stivers
Case #: 3:24-cv-00473
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2024
Terminated:Oct 15, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 12, 2025 4:03 AM EST
Defendant
Pinnacle Treatment Centers KY-I, LLC
Represented By
Martha G. Vazquez
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Megan R. U'Sellis
Fisher & Phillips Llp - Louisville
contact info
Plaintiff
Kandace Barkham
Represented By
Bradley S. Zoppoth
The Zoppoth Law Firm
contact info
Mitchell Esterle
The Zoppoth Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 10/23 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Pinnacle Treatment Centers KY-I, LLC (U'Sellis, Megan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
11 11 order Order - TEXT ONLY Order Dismissing Case Tue 10/15 1:14 PM
TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 10/15/2024: The Court having been advised that settlement has been reached on all matters in this case; IT IS ORDERED this case is Dismissed without prejudice and stricken from the active docket. The parties shall tender an agreed order dismissing this case with prejudice within forty-five (45) days of entry of this Order. The Court will entertain a motion to redocket this action upon application to this Court within forty-five (45) days from entry of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel of Record (TJD)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 10/11 12:47 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Kandace Barkham (Esterle, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Proposed Agreed Order Mon 09/30 11:23 AM
AGREED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 9/30/2024 granting8 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendant Pinnacle's Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint is due 10/11/2024. cc: Counsel (KDY)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
8 8 motion Proposed Agreed Order Fri 09/27 2:53 PM
Proposed Agreed Order re1 Complaint by Pinnacle Treatment Centers KY-I, LLC. (U'Sellis, Megan) Modified on 9/27/2024 (TJD)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Proposed Agreed Order Fri 09/13 3:49 PM
AGREED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 9/13/2024 granting6 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendant Pinnacle's Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint is due SEPTEMBER 27, 2024. cc: Counsel (DeW)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Proposed Agreed Order Fri 09/13 1:36 PM
Proposed Agreed Order by Pinnacle Treatment Centers KY-I, LLC. (U'Sellis, Megan)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) Fri 09/13 1:35 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) by Pinnacle Treatment Centers KY-I, LLC. (U'Sellis, Megan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) Tue 08/20 9:07 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) by Kandace Barkham. (Esterle, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 08/19 10:49 AM
Summons Issued as to Pinnacle Treatment Centers KY-I, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
2 2 utility Case Assignment Mon 08/19 10:48 AM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (MNM)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/19 10:47 AM
COMPLAINT against Pinnacle Treatment Centers KY-I, LLC, filing fee $405, receipt number AKYWDC-4088878, filed by Kandace Barkham. (MNM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons Tendered