Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:24-cv-04521
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2024
Terminated:Nov 15, 2024
Case in other court:Illinois Northern, 1:24-cv-05506
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 11, 2025 3:56 AM EST
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Defendant
LN Curtis & Sons
Defendant
Lakeland Industries Inc
Defendant
Lion Apparel Inc
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
Defendant
MSA Safety Incorporated
Defendant
MSA Safety Sales LLC
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
Defendant
Milliken & Company
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
Defendant
Narcote Holding Corporation
Defendant
Narcote LLC
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Co Inc
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies Inc
Defendant
StedFast USA, Inc.
800 Mountain View Dr.
Piney Flats, TN 37686
Defendant
TenCate Protective Fabrics USA
6501Mall Blvd.
Union City, GA 30291
Defendant
The Chemours Company
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
as successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
Defendant
Veridian Limited
Defendant
W L Gore & Associates Inc
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group Inc
Defendant
Kidde Fire Fighting Inc
Defendant
3M Company
Represented By
Daniel Leslie Ring
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment Co
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment CO
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256
Defendant
Globe Holding Company LLC
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
Represented By
James L Stengel
Orrick Herrington And Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Paige Pavone
Orrick Herrington And Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
Defendant
Innotex Corporation
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
Plaintiff
Mary Cottini
Represented By
Kenneth Thomas Lumb
Corboy And Demetrio
contact info
Mitchell Wald Bild
Corboy & Demetrio, P.C.
contact info
William T Gibbs
Corboy And Demetrio
contact info
Plaintiff
Raymond Cottini
Represented By
Kenneth Thomas Lumb
Corboy And Demetrio
contact info
Mitchell Wald Bild
Corboy & Demetrio, P.C.
contact info
William T Gibbs
Corboy And Demetrio
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, November 15, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 11/15 2:32 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mary Cottini, Raymond CottiniAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:24-cv-04521-RMG(Gibbs, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
24 24 service Certificate of Service Tue 11/05 3:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Raymond Cottini on all defendants(Lumb, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service on defendant Globe Holding Company, LLC,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service on defendant Lakeland Industries, Inc.,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service on defendant MSA Safety Incorporated
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
23 23 misc Status Report Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/27 11:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/27 6:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
19 19 service Certificate of Service Wed 08/21 10:14 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Raymond Cottini on all defendants(Lumb, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service on defendant AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc.,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service on defendant Allstar Fire Equipment Co.,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service on defendant Amerex Corporation,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service on defendant Archroma U.S., Inc.,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service on defendant Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service on defendant Carrier Global Corporation,
Att: 7 Certificate of Service on defendant CB Garment, Inc., d/b/a Crewboss,
Att: 8 Certificate of Service on defendant Chemguard, Inc.,
Att: 9 Certificate of Service on defendant Chemicals, Inc.,
Att: 10 Certificate of Service on defendant Clariant Corporation,
Att: 11 Certificate of Service on defendant Corveta, Inc.,
Att: 12 Certificate of Service on defendant Daikin America, Inc.,
Att: 13 Certificate of Service on defendant Deepwater Chemicals, Inc.,
Att: 14 Certificate of Service on defendant Dynax Corporation,
Att: 15 Certificate of Service on defendant E.I. Du Pont de Nemours & Co., Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise,
Att: 16 Certificate of Service on defendant Fire Service Plus, Inc.,
Att: 17 Certificate of Service on defendant Fire-Dex, LLC,
Att: 18 Certificate of Service on defendant Globe Holding Company, LLC,
Att: 19 Certificate of Service on defendant Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC,
Att: 20 Certificate of Service on defendant Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc.,
Att: 21 Certificate of Service on defendant Innotex Corporation,
Att: 22 Certificate of Service on defendant Johnson Controls, Inc.,
Att: 23 Certificate of Service on defendant Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., (f/k/a Chubb National Foam, Inc., f/k/a National Foam, Inc.),
Att: 24 Certificate of Service on defendant Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., (f/k/a Fenwal, Inc), Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to National Foam, Inc.,
Att: 25 Certificate of Service on defendant Lakeland Industries, Inc.,
Att: 26 Certificate of Service on defendant Lion Apparel, Inc.,
Att: 27 Certificate of Service on defendant Lion Group, Inc.,
Att: 28 Certificate of Service on defendant L.N. Curtis & Sons,
Att: 29 Certificate of Service on defendant Mallory Safety and Supply, LLC,
Att: 30 Certificate of Service on defendant Milliken & Company,
Att: 31 Certificate of Service on defendant Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC,
Att: 32 Certificate of Service on defendant MSA Safety Incorporated,
Att: 33 Certificate of Service on defendant MSA Safety Sales, LLC,
Att: 34 Certificate of Service on defendant Municipal Emergency Services, Inc.,
Att: 35 Certificate of Service on defendant Narcote Holding Corporation (f/k/a Stedfast, Inc., and/or Stedfast USA, Inc.),
Att: 36 Certificate of Service on defendant Narcote, LLC (f/k/a Stedfast, Inc., and/or Stedfast USA, Inc.),
Att: 37 Certificate of Service on defendant Nation Ford Chemical Company,
Att: 38 Certificate of Service on defendant National Foam, Inc.,
Att: 39 Certificate of Service on defendant PBI Performance Products, Inc.,
Att: 40 Certificate of Service on defendant Perimeter Solutions, LP,
Att: 41 Certificate of Service on defendant Ricochet Manufacturing Co., Inc.,
Att: 42 Certificate of Service on defendant Safety Components Fabric Technologies, Inc.,
Att: 43 Certificate of Service on defendant Stedfast USA, Inc.,
Att: 44 Certificate of Service on defendant Tencate Protective Fabrics USA, d/b/a Southern Mills, Inc.,
Att: 45 Certificate of Service on defendant The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise,
Att: 46 Certificate of Service on defendant The Chemours Company, Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise,
Att: 47 Certificate of Service on defendant Tyco Fire Products, L.P. as Successor-In-Interest to The Ansul Company,
Att: 48 Certificate of Service on defendant United Technologies Corporation,
Att: 49 Certificate of Service on defendant UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. (f/k/a GE Interlogix, Inc.), Individually as as Successor-In-Interest to National Foam, Inc.,
Att: 50 Certificate of Service on defendant Veridian Limited d/b/a Veridian Fire Protective Gear,
Att: 51 Certificate of Service on defendant Witmer Public Safety Group, Inc., d/b/a "The Fire Store",
Att: 52 Certificate of Service on defendant W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc.,
Att: 53 Certificate of Service on defendant Arkema, Inc.,
Att: 54 Certificate of Service on defendant Chemdesign Products, Inc.,
Att: 55 Certificate of Service on defendant Kidde PLC, Inc., (f/k/a Williams US Inc., f/k/a Williams Holdins, Inc.), Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to National Foam, Inc.
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
18 18 service Summons Issued Tue 08/20 11:21 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
17 17 misc MDL Member Case Opened Mon 08/19 10:48 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Illinois Northern, 1:24-cv-05506, Cottini et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-04521 (jbin)
Related: [-]
16 16 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Mon 08/19 10:44 AM
Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:24-cv-05506. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
15 15 TRANSFERRED to the USDC of South Carolina the electronic record. (aee, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/19/2024.]
Related: [-]
14 14 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to United States District Court South Carolina. (aee, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/19/2024.]
Related: [-]
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2873 Conditional Transfer Order filed 08/15/2024. (aee, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/19/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
13 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins: The initial status hearing set for August 28, 202412 is stricken and no initial status report need be filed by August 21, 2024. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/19/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
12 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins: In person initial status hearing set for August 28, 2024 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2119. Initial Status Report shall be filed by August 21, 2024. The report should comply with the requirements set forth in the Initial Status Report standing order, which can be found at Judge Jenkins's web page @ (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov, "District Judges", to "Judge Lindsay Jenkins", to "Initial Status Hearings" under Case Management Procedures"). The parties must follow all the standing orders for Judge Jenkins and all Local Rules, which can be found at the same web page. At the Initial Status hearing, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; and (3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/19/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
11 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey I Cummings: Case reassigned to the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins for all further proceedings pursuant to IOP 13(f)(1). Mailed notice (ph, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/19/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Reassignment
10 10 AMENDED MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey I Cummings: The Court hereby recuses itself from this case pursuant to 42 U.S.C. §455(b)(4). Reassignment order to follow. Judge Jeffrey I. Cummings no longer assigned to the case. Mailed notice (cc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/19/2024.]
Related: [-]
9 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey I Cummings: The Court hereby recuses itself from this case pursuant to 42 U.S.C. §455(b)(4). Reassignment order to follow. Judge Jeffrey I. Cummings no longer referred to the case. Mailed notice (cc, )[Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/19/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
8 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Mary Cottini, Raymond Cottini by Mitchell Wald Bild (Bild, Mitchell) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/19/2024.]
Related: [-]
7 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Mary Cottini, Raymond Cottini by Kenneth Thomas Lumb (Lumb, Kenneth) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/19/2024.]
Related: [-]
6 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Mary Cottini, Raymond Cottini by William T Gibbs (Gibbs, William) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/19/2024.]
Related: [-]
5 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (rc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/19/2024.]
Related: [-]
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jeffrey I Cummings. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (mcp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/19/2024.]
Related: [-]
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached[LINK:Consent To] [LINK:form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (rc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/19/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
4 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant 3M Company by Daniel Leslie Ring (Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/19/2024.]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by 3M Company (Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/19/2024.]
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/19/2024.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2024-L-5913) filed by 3M Company Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-22196088.(Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 8/19/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint