Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Karen Gren Scholer
Case #: 3:24-cv-02129
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Aug 20, 2024
Terminated:Feb 11, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 16, 2025 5:18 AM CST
Defendant
Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By
Andrew Nicholas Bernardini
Mcguire Woods LLP
contact info
Grant Michael Figari
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Mediator
ADR Provider
Represented By
Jay Clark Zeleskey
Zeleskey Mediations
contact info
Plaintiff
Jerry Forward
Represented By
Blake Robert Bauer
Fields Law Firm
contact info
Jonathan Alexander Heeps
Law Office Of Jonathan A Heeps
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
Terminated: 11/06/2024
Represented By
Forrest Mathew Seger, III
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Emma Connolly Jenevein
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
Terminated: 12/16/2024


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
29 29 misc Stipulation Tue 02/11 4:53 PM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re Nationstar Mortgage LLC by Jerry Forward. (Bauer, Blake)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
utility Terminate Civil Case (Optional) Wed 02/12 9:20 AM
Civil Case Terminated per29 Stipulation of Dismissal. (kcr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
28 28 order Order Thu 01/16 4:28 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The remaining parties have announced that this case has been resolved. The current trial setting and scheduling order are vacated and all pending motions and/or hearings are terminated. The remaining parties are to file dismissal documents by March 17, 2025 . (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 1/16/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
27 27 notice Notice (Other) Wed 01/15 10:35 AM
NOTICE of settlement reached with Nationstar Mortgage LLC filed by Jerry Forward (Bauer, Blake)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/16 3:00 PM
NOTICE of Dismissal re Trans Union LLC filed by Jerry Forward (Bauer, Blake)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
25 25 order Scheduling Order Wed 11/13 12:27 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for three-week docket beginning on 11/24/2025 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. Motions due by 7/28/2025. Discovery due by 7/18/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2025 01:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/13/2024) (kcr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order For ADR Wed 11/13 8:32 AM
MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints Jay Clark Zeleskey as mediator. The parties are to complete mediation 90 days before trial.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/12/2024) (kcr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Wed 11/06 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Dismissal re Equifax Information Services LLC filed by Jerry Forward (Bauer, Blake)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
22 22 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 11/04 10:19 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that21 Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC's Unopposed Motion for Second Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, to and including November 18, 2024 , is GRANTED . (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/4/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 11/01 1:53 PM
Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Unopposed) filed by Equifax Information Services LLC (Seger, Forrest)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
20 20 misc Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order Tue 10/22 4:30 PM
Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Jerry Forward. (Bauer, Blake)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order Tue 10/22 12:08 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Plaintiff Jerry Forward and Defendant Trans Union LLC have announced that they have reached a settlement as to Plaintiff's claims against Trans Union. Plaintiff and Trans Union are to file dismissal documents by December 20, 2024 . (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/22/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/21 11:07 AM
NOTICE of settlement reached with Trans Union LLC filed by Jerry Forward (Bauer, Blake)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 10/21 10:26 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that14 Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, to and including November 4, 2024 , is GRANTED . (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/21/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
16 16 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 10/18 2:43 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Seger, Forrest)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 10/18 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emma Connolly Jenevein on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Jenevein, Emma)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 10/18 2:38 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Equifax Information Services LLCAttorney Forrest Mathew Seger, III added to party Equifax Information Services LLC(pty:dft) (Seger, Forrest)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, September 30, 2024
13 13 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Mon 09/30 8:19 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Bernardini, Andrew)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/30 8:18 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Bernardini, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 09/05 11:29 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that10 Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, to and including October 15, 2024 , is GRANTED . (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/5/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 09/04 7:19 AM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLCAttorney Andrew Nicholas Bernardini added to party Nationstar Mortgage LLC(pty:dft) (Bernardini, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 09/04 7:18 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Grant Michael Figari on behalf of Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Figari, Grant)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Tue 09/03 7:07 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nationstar Mortgage LLC ; served on 8/23/2024. (Bauer, Blake)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
7 7 service Waiver of Service Returned Thu 08/22 1:56 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Equifax Information Services LLC. Waiver sent on 8/21/2024. (Bauer, Blake)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Returned Thu 08/22 9:05 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Trans Union LLC. Waiver sent on 8/21/2024. (Bauer, Blake)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 08/20 9:23 PM
Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Trans Union LLC. (axm)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Electronic Standing Order - Specific Requirements for Judge Scholer Tue 08/20 9:22 PM
ELECTRONIC STANDING ORDER: Counsel are required to review and comply with the Court's Judge Specific Requirements, which can be found here:[LINK:Judge Requirements] . The Court updates its Requirements periodically. Also, counsel are required to review and comply with the Northern District of Texas's Local Civil Rules, which can be found here:[LINK:Civil Rules] . In particular, the Court directs counsel to review Rules 3.1, 7.4, and 81.2, regarding certificates of interested persons, and Rule 83.10, regarding local counsel. Counsel are expected to review the Requirements and Local Rules before contacting the Court with questions. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/20/2024) (axm)
Related: [-]
3 3 qcref Scholer Tue 08/20 9:21 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Tue 08/20 1:42 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jerry Forward. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Bauer, Blake)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/20 1:41 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Jerry Forward. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14853520) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Bauer, Blake)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) D,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) E,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) F,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) G