Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Case #: 1:24-cv-00957
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Aug 20, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 16, 2025 5:29 AM CST
Defendant
Core Benefit Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Collin K. Brodrick
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Alen Arpana Samuel
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Weaver Technologies, LLC
Represented By
Collin K. Brodrick
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Alen Arpana Samuel
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Deonica Culberson
Represented By
Paul M Botros
Morgan & Morgan, P A
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 03/27 2:00 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Alan D Albright for all proceedings. Judge Robert Pitman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (bot2)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
17 17 order Scheduling Order Mon 03/10 4:51 PM
AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER: Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 1/31/2025, Jury Trial set for 3/16/2026 09:30 AM before Judge Robert Pitman, ADR Report Deadline due by 10/31/2025, Amended Pleadings due by 3/14/2025, Discovery due by 10/17/2025, Joinder of Parties due by 3/14/2025, Motions due by 11/14/2025, Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
Related: [-]
16 16 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Mon 03/10 3:33 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Hightower: Initial Pretrial Conference held by Telephone on 3/10/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter WebEx.)(pg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
15 15 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Tue 03/04 1:50 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Weaver Technologies, LLC. (Brodrick, Collin)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order Setting/Resetting Initial Pretrial Conference Fri 02/14 1:42 PM
ORDER Setting Initial Pretrial Conference. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2025 10:00 AM before Judge Susan Hightower. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (pg)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 02/05 12:15 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert Pitman for all proceedings. Judge Docket II - Austin no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (bot1)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
12 12 misc Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Fri 01/31 3:49 PM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Core Benefit Solutions, LLC. (Brodrick, Collin)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Fri 01/31 3:47 PM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Weaver Technologies, LLC. (Brodrick, Collin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
10 10 motion Entry of Scheduling Order Wed 01/22 4:18 PM
Joint MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order Deadlines by Weaver Technologies, LLC.(Brodrick, Collin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
9 9 misc Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Wed 01/22 10:51 AM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Deonica Culberson. (Botros, Paul)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Wed 01/22 10:44 AM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Deonica Culberson. (Botros, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Wed 01/08 3:13 PM
Order for parties to submit a Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due on or before 1/22/2025. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/25 2:08 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint . Attorney Collin K. Brodrick added to party Weaver Technologies, LLC(pty:dft) by Weaver Technologies, LLC.(Brodrick, Collin)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/25 2:07 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint . Attorney Collin K. Brodrick added to party Core Benefit Solutions, LLC(pty:dft) by Core Benefit Solutions, LLC.(Brodrick, Collin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 08/20 3:24 PM
Summons Issued as to Core Benefit Solutions, LLC, Weaver Technologies, LLC. (kp)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 08/20 3:10 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by DEONICA CULBERSON. CORRECTED REQUEST (Botros, Paul)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 08/20 2:34 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by DEONICA CULBERSON. (Botros, Paul)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/20 2:31 PM
COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19125056), filed by DEONICA CULBERSON.(Botros, Paul) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/20/2024 to flatten document) (kp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 08/20 3:23 PM
Case assigned to Judge Docket II - Austin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Tue 08/20 3:23 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Tue 08/20 3:23 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Deonica Culberson. (kp)
Related: [-]