California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando M Olguin
Referred: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Case #: 2:24-cv-07055
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Aug 20, 2024
Terminated:Sep 27, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 16, 2025 2:47 AM PST
Defendant
Diana's Mexican Food Products, Inc.
Defendant
La Jolla Tortilleria, Inc
Represented By
Arthur Corona
Corona Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Jesus Garcia
Represented By
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Kevin Hyunjong Hong
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
15 15 order Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106) - optional html form Tue 10/01 11:31 AM
ORDER STRIKING by Judge Fernando M. Olguin Re: APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation14 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): (1) Case is closed; voluntarily dismissed by plaintiff on 9/27/2024. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
14 14 motion Stay Case and Early Mediation (ADR-21) Mon 09/30 10:57 AM
First APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant La Jolla Tortilleria, Inc. (Attorney Arthur Corona added to party La Jolla Tortilleria, Inc(pty:dft)) (Corona, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Application for Stay and Early Mediation
Friday, September 27, 2024
13 13 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 09/27 4:13 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Jesus Garcia. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 09/23 3:10 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jesus Garcia, upon Defendant Diana's Mexican Food Products, Inc. served on 9/20/2024, answer due 10/11/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon SAMUEL R MAGANA, AS AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 09/20 9:19 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jesus Garcia, upon Defendant La Jolla Tortilleria, Inc served on 9/18/2024, answer due 10/9/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon DANIEL E TORRES, AS AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS - Liliana Torres, Authorized in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 08/30 2:12 PM
STANDING ORDER RE: DISABILITY CASES by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
9 9 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 08/22 3:17 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 08/22 2:56 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Diana's Mexican Food Products, Inc., La Jolla Tortilleria, Inc. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 08/22 2:55 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 08/22 2:54 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 08/22 2:54 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (sh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
4 4 notice Summons Request Tue 08/20 1:54 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Jesus Garcia. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 08/20 1:53 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 08/20 1:53 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jesus Garcia. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 08/20 1:52 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38059369 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Jesus Garcia(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]