New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Margo K Brodie
Referred: Peggy Kuo
Case #: 1:24-mc-03260
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2024
Terminated:Dec 06, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, December 06, 2024
order Order Dismissing Case Fri 12/06 11:03 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (WV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
15 15 10 pgs order Order on Motion to Quash Tue 12/03 1:46 PM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: As set forth in the annexed Memorandum Decision and Order, non-party Jelani Wray's1 Motion to Quash a Subpoena ad testificandum is DENIED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 12/3/2024. (RO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
14 14 misc Letter Wed 10/16 9:51 AM
Letter From Christopher T. Cook To The Hon. Peggy Kuo, Dated 10/16/24 Re: Notice Of Transfer Of Motion To Quash Subpoena And Request For Ruling. Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Cook, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
order Order Reassigning Case Fri 08/23 10:11 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo for all further proceedings. Judge Eric N. Vitaliano no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 8/23/2024. (SDM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
13 13 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (DEACTIVATED EVENT - DO NOT USE) Tue 08/20 10:43 AM
Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 4:24-mc-00391. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation Tue 08/20 11:00 AM
Notice of Related Case: The Case may be related to 21-cv-5523(MKB-PK) (KD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
12 12 5 pgs MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Movant Jelani Wray's1 Motion to Quash is TRANSFERRED. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 8/15/2024. (ea) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
11 11 BRIEF by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Amendment to10 Supplement,9 Response (PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO JELANI WRAY'S OPPOSITION TO TRANSFER OF MOTION TO QUASH), , filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Related document:10 Supplement, filed by Jelani Wray,9 Response filed by Jelani Wray.(Cook, Christopher) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index Of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
10 10 Supplement by Jelani Wray. to9 Response. (Cover sheet states "This is the correct version with all attached exhibits".)(nr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - 2/9/2024 News Article,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Serious Assaults on Inmates Graph,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Sheriff's Return of Service,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Letter to Chief Judge Brann date 7/8/2024
Thursday, July 25, 2024
9 9 RESPONSE by Jelani Wray to6 Order.(nr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit - 2/9/2024 News Article,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Serious Assaults on Inmates Graph
Friday, June 28, 2024
8 8 ORDER granting7 Motion to Extend Time. Wray shall respond as directed in the Court's 6/7/2024 Order by 7/28/2024. If Wray does not consent to the transfer of his Motion, Plaintiffs State Farm Mutual Insurance Company and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company may file a brief addressing the issue of transfer within fourteen days of the filing of Wray's response with the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 6/28/2024. (ea) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
7 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to 6/7/2024 Order by Jelani Wray.(nr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - 6/17/2024 Inmate Bulletin
Friday, June 07, 2024
6 6 5 pgs MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Movant Jelani Wray shall advise the Court no later than 6/28/2024 whether he is willing to consent to the transfer of his Motion to the Eastern District of New York. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 6/7/2024. (ea) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
5 5 REPLY BRIEF re1 MOTION to Quash filed by Jelani Wray.(nr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
4 4 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re1 MOTION to Quash filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Cook, Christopher) Modified on 5/22/2024 (ea). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts of Second Amended Complaint from New York Action,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts of Wray Sentencing Hearing Transcript from Rose Case,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Pre-Sentencing Submission for Wray from Rose Case,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts of Wire Tap Affidavits from Rose Case,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts of Wire Tap Affidavits from Rose Case,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Subpoena and Affidavit of Service for Deposition of March 21, 2024,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - Subpoena and Affidavit of Service for Deposition of April 11, 2024,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - Excerpts of Wray Allocution Transcript from Rose Case
Monday, May 13, 2024
3 3 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Christopher Thomas Cook. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 5/13/2024. (ea) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/20/2024.])
Related: [-]
2 2 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Christopher Thomas Cook on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company Attorney Christopher Cook is seeking special admission Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6636544., filed by on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Cook, Christopher) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
1 1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Jelani Wray.(nr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 8/20/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter from Attorney Cook,
Att: 2 Subpoena