Arizona District Court
Judge:Michael T Liburdi
Case #: 2:24-cv-02119
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Jul 18, 2024
Terminated:Sep 26, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 14, 2025 1:18 AM MST
Defendant
Brittany Hassen
Represented By
John G Balestriere
Balestriere Fariello
contact info
Defendant
Emma Hopper
Represented By
John G Balestriere
Balestriere Fariello
contact info
Defendant
Mia Lytell
Represented By
John G Balestriere
Balestriere Fariello
contact info
Defendant
Amy Moore
Represented By
John G Balestriere
Balestriere Fariello
contact info
Defendant
Brittany Reyes
Represented By
John G Balestriere
Balestriere Fariello
contact info
Defendant
Natasha Tagai
Represented By
John G Balestriere
Balestriere Fariello
contact info
Plaintiff
Pravati Capital LLC
Represented By
Drew C Ensign
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky & Josefiak Pllc - Phoenix
contact info
Troy Roberts
Pravati Capital
contact info
Benjamin Pierce
contact info
Troy Daniel Roberts
Bianchi & Brandt
contact info
Plaintiff
Pravati Investment Fund III LP
Represented By
Drew C Ensign
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky & Josefiak Pllc - Phoenix
contact info
Troy Roberts
Pravati Capital
contact info
Benjamin Pierce
contact info
Troy Daniel Roberts
Bianchi & Brandt
contact info
Plaintiff
Pravati Investment Fund IV LP
Represented By
Drew C Ensign
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky & Josefiak Pllc - Phoenix
contact info
Troy Roberts
Pravati Capital
contact info
Benjamin Pierce
contact info
Troy Daniel Roberts
Bianchi & Brandt
contact info

GPO Sep 26 2024
ORDER granting 1 Motion to Quash. The subpoena issued to Plaintiffs by the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York, in Moore, et al. v. Rubin EDNY Case No. 1:17-CV-06404-BMC, is QUASHED. Plaintiffs may file a Motion for Attorney's Fees and Nontaxable Costs within 14 days from the date of entry of judgment. The stay imposed on the Order granting Defendant's counsel's Motion to Withdraw (Doc. 25) is LIFTED. The Clerk must mail a copy of this Order to each Defendant/Respondent listed in page 3 of Doc. 24-1. The Clerk must enter judgment for Plaintiffs and close this case. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 9/26/24. (DXD)

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM MST
Friday, December 13, 2024
28 28 misc Mail Returned Fri 12/13 4:28 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Natasha Tagai. Reason for return: Insufficient Address. Document number26 . (DXD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
27 27 order Clerks Judgment Thu 09/26 2:16 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Court's Order filed September 26, 2024, judgment of dismissal for Plaintiff is entered, and the complaint and action are dismissed. (DXD)
Related: [-]
26 26 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Quash Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 09/26 2:11 PM
ORDER granting1 Motion to Quash. The subpoena issued to Plaintiffs by the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York, in Moore, et al. v. Rubin EDNY Case No. 1:17-CV-06404-BMC, is QUASHED. Plaintiffs may file a Motion for Attorney's Fees and Nontaxable Costs within 14 days from the date of entry of judgment. The stay imposed on the Order granting Defendant's counsel's Motion to Withdraw (Doc.25 ) is LIFTED. The Clerk must mail a copy of this Order to each Defendant/Respondent listed in page 3 of Doc.24 -1. The Clerk must enter judgment for Plaintiffs and close this case. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 9/26/24. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 08/23 12:18 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The withdrawal of Defendants' counsel is stayed for 30 days in order for Defendants to obtain new counsel. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 8/23/24. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
24 24 2 pgs motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 08/23 10:24 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Brittany Hassen, Emma Hopper, Mia Lytell, Amy Moore, Brittany Reyes, Natasha Tagai.(KLG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Declaration of John G. Balestriere,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel Wed 08/21 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Drew C Ensign on behalf of Pravati Capital LLC, Pravati Investment Fund III LP, Pravati Investment Fund IV LP. (Ensign, Drew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
22 22 minutes Motion Hearing 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) Order on Motion to Quash Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 08/20 5:26 PM
MINUTE ENTRY in MC 24-00023 PHX-MTL and CV 24-02119 PHX-MTL for proceedings held before Judge Michael T Liburdi: Hearing on Motion to Quash or Alternatively for a Protective Order of Third Party Subpoena1 held on 8/20/2024. Argument is presented. The motion1 is taken under advisement. The parties are directed to file all future pleadings with the new civil case number CV 24-02119 PHX-MTL. APPEARANCES: Benjamin Pierce and Drew Ensign for Plaintiff. John Balestriere for Defendants. (Court Reporter Cathy Taylor.) Hearing held 11:03 AM to 11:35 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR)
Related: [-]
misc Remark (Public) Tue 08/20 11:12 AM
Remark: Miscellaneous case, MC-24-023-PHX-MTL converted to civil case, CV 24-02119 PHX-MTL; hearing held. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Mon 08/19 11:34 AM
ORDER granting Motion to Extend Page Limits (Doc.18 ). FURTHER ORDERED that the page limits for Movants' Reply in Support of Motion be extended to fifteen (15) pages exclusive of exhibits. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 8/19/24. (EJA)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 17, 2024
20 20 *REPLY to Response to Motion re:1 MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order filed by Pravati Investment Fund IV LP, Pravati Captial LLC, Pravati Investment Fund III LP.(Pierce, Benjamin) *Modified to add filers on 8/19/2024 (EJA).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Errata
Friday, August 16, 2024
19 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re:1 MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order filed by Pravati Capital LLC, Pravati Investment Fund III LP, Pravati Investment Fund IV LP.(Pierce, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
18 18 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Extend Page Limits by Pravati Capital LLC, Pravati Investment Fund III LP, Pravati Investment Fund IV LP.(Pierce, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, August 09, 2024
17 17 ORDER granting Movants' Unopposed Motion and Request to Extend (Doc.16 ). FURTHER ORDERED that Movants shall have to and including August 16, 2024 to file their reply to Respondents' response. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 8/9/24. (EJA)
Related: [-]
16 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to14 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, by Pravati Capital LLC, Pravati Investment Fund III LP, Pravati Investment Fund IV LP.(Pierce, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Movants' Motion to Extend Time
Thursday, August 08, 2024
15 15 ORDER setting an in-person oral argument on Movants' Motion to Quash or Alternatively for a Protective Order of Third Party Subpoena for Tuesday, August 20, 2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Michael T Liburdi. Counsel must appear in person at the hearing. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 8/8/24. (EJA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
14 14 27 pgs RESPONSE in Opposition re:1 MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order and Cross Motion to Compel filed by Brittany Hassen, Emma Hopper, Mia Lytell, Amy Moore, Brittany Reyes, Natasha Tagai.(Balestriere, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Declaration of John G. Balestriere,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, Article,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, Article,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, EDNY Fees and Costs Motion,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, 2018 Rubin Financing Agreement,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, Email from Mora,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit F, Pravati SOP,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit G, Emails 05-09 to 05-20,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit H, BF PFFCL,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit I, Final Award,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit J, BF Motion to Vacate,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit K, Subpoena,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit L, Certificate of Service,
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit M, EDNY Affidavit of Darren Mays,
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit N, Transcript excerpt
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for John G Balestriere on behalf of Defendants Brittany Hassen, Emma Hopper, Mia Lytell, Amy Moore, Brittany Reyes, Natasha Tagai. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
13 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Pierce on behalf of Pravati Capital LLC, Pravati Investment Fund III LP, Pravati Investment Fund IV LP. (Pierce, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
12 12 *NOTICE of Service re: Corporate Disclosure filed by Pravati Investment Fund IV LP. (Pierce, Benjamin) *Modified to correct event type and text on 7/31/2024 (EJA).
Related: [-]
11 11 *NOTICE of Service re: Corporate Disclosure filed by Pravati Investment Fund III LP. (Pierce, Benjamin) *Modified to correct event type and text on 7/31/2024 (EJA).
Related: [-]
10 10 *NOTICE of Service re: Corporate Disclosure filed by Pravati Capital LLC. (Pierce, Benjamin) *Modified to correct event type and text on 7/31/2024 (EJA).
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
9 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pravati Investment Fund IV LP. (Pierce, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
8 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pravati Investment Fund III LP. (Pierce, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
7 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pravati Capital LLC. (Pierce, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
6 6 NOTICE of Service re:1 Motion to Quash filed by Pravati Capital LLC, Pravati Investment Fund III LP, Pravati Investment Fund IV LP. (Pierce, Benjamin) *Modified to correct event type and text on 7/31/2024 (EJA).
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
5 5 Additional Attachments to Main Document re:1 MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order Proposed Order by Plaintiffs Pravati Capital LLC, Pravati Investment Fund III LP, Pravati Investment Fund IV LP. (Pierce, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
4 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order filed by Pravati Investment Fund IV LP, Pravati Investment Fund III LP, Pravati Capital LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required . This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Pravati Capital LLC, Pravati Investment Fund III LP, Pravati Investment Fund IV LP. (REK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
2 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23263182. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi for a ruling on the MOTION to Quash or Alternatively for a Protective Order of Third Party Subpoena. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: MC 24-00023 PHX-MTL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs Miscellaneous Case Opening Regarding: Motions to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum - FRCVP 45 or Alternatively for a Protective Order of Third Party Subpoena. Case Opening Fee Received:$52.00 receipt number AAZDC-23263182 filed by Pravati Investment Fund IV LP, Pravati Capital LLC, Pravati Investment Fund III LP. (submitted by Benjamin Pierce)(REK).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10